EP1747028 - PROCESS FOR EXTRACTING BIOMEDICAL DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.04.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.04.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.05.2009 [2009/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAUSCH & LOMB INCORPORATED One Bausch & Lomb Place Rochester, NY 14604-2701 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2007/05] | For all designated states BAUSCH & LOMB INCORPORATED Bausch & Lomb Patent Law Department One Bausch & Lomb Place Rochester, NY 14604-2701 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STAFFORD, Ulick 5 The Laurels, Clonard Road Wexford / IE | 02 /
RASTOGI, Sanjay 411 Pelham Road Rochester, NY 14610 / US | 03 /
NANDU, Mahendra 15 Sutton Point Pittsford, NY 14534 / US | 04 /
APPLETON, William 521 Hoffman Road Rochester, NY 14622 / US | [2007/05] | Representative(s) | Maiwald, Walter, et al Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/05] | Maiwald, Walter, et al Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05750382.3 | 17.05.2005 | [2007/05] | WO2005US17371 | Priority number, date | US20040573495P | 21.05.2004 Original published format: US 573495 P | US20040624124P | 01.11.2004 Original published format: US 624124 P | [2007/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005113028 | Date: | 01.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1747028 | Date: | 31.01.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.12.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61L12/04, A61L12/14, A61L27/18, B29C71/00, B29D11/00, C08J7/02, G02B1/04 | [2007/05] | CPC: |
C08J7/02 (EP,US);
A61L27/18 (EP,US);
B01D11/0215 (EP,US);
B01D11/0284 (EP,US);
B01D11/0288 (EP,US);
B29C71/00 (EP,US);
B29C71/0009 (EP,US);
B29D11/00038 (EP,US);
B29C2071/0027 (EP,US);
B29L2011/0041 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61L27/18, C08L83/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/05] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PROCÉDÉ POUR EXTRAIRE DES DISPOSITIFS BIOMÉDICAUX | [2007/05] | English: | PROCESS FOR EXTRACTING BIOMEDICAL DEVICES | [2007/05] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR EXTRAIRE DES DISPOSITIFS BIOMÉDICAUX | [2007/05] | Entry into regional phase | 09.11.2006 | National basic fee paid | 09.11.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.11.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.01.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 09.11.2006 | Examination requested [2007/05] | 14.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.07.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.12.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/22] | 12.01.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2009/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2008 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4749496 (REISCHL ARTUR [DE]) [A] 1,16,18 * column 1, lines 56-68 * * column 2, lines 53-60 *; | [A]WO0102881 (BAUSCH & LOMB [US]) [A] 1,16,18 * page 5, paragraph 2 * * claim - *; | [XD]WO0123066 (BAUSCH & LOMB [US]) [XD] 1-18 * page 2, paragraph 2 * * page 5, paragraph 2 * * claim - *; | [A]WO0145868 (BAUSCH & LOMB [US]) [A] 1,16,18 * page 1 * * page 3 *; | [A]US2003116873 (AYYAGARI MADHU [US], et al) [A] 1,16,18* paragraph [0012]; claim - *; | [XD]WO03082367 (BAUSCH & LOMB [US]) [XD] 1-18 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2004031275 (BAUSCH & LOMB [US]) [A] 1,16,18 * page 1, paragraph 1 * * page 3 * * page 4, paragraph 1 * * claim - * |