EP1774978 - APPLICATION OF HYALURONIC ACID TO SENTINEL LYMPH NODE IDENTIFICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.02.2012 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.03.2012 [2012/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kitayama, Joji Kohinata 4-4-6-605 Bunkyo-ku, Tokyo 1120006 / JP | [2007/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2007/16] | Representative(s) | Keller, Günter, et al Lederer & Keller Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Unsöldstrasse 2 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/42] | Keller, Günter, et al Lederer & Keller Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 16 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/16] | Keller, Günter, et al Lederer, Keller & Riederer Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 16 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05751331.9 | 03.06.2005 | [2007/16] | WO2005JP10635 | Priority number, date | JP20040165508 | 03.06.2004 Original published format: JP 2004165508 | [2007/16] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005117995 | Date: | 15.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1774978 | Date: | 18.04.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.12.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 15.12.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.10.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61K49/00, A61K9/08, A61K47/36 | [2007/16] | CPC: |
A61K47/36 (EP,US);
A61K49/006 (EP,US);
A61K9/0019 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/16] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | APPLIKATION VON HYALURONSÄURE ZUR IDENTIFIZIERUNG VON WÄCHTER-LYMPHKNOTEN | [2007/16] | English: | APPLICATION OF HYALURONIC ACID TO SENTINEL LYMPH NODE IDENTIFICATION | [2007/16] | French: | APPLICATION DE L'ACIDE HYALURONIQUE À L'IDENTIFICATION DES GANGLIONS LYMPATHIQUES SENTINELLES | [2007/16] | Entry into regional phase | 07.12.2006 | Translation filed | 07.12.2006 | National basic fee paid | 07.12.2006 | Search fee paid | 07.12.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.12.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.06.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 07.12.2006 | Examination requested [2007/16] | 29.01.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.04.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.08.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/12] | 05.10.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/12] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.04.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2011 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US5772982 (COWARD RODERICK T [CA]) [X] 1-9 * the whole document * * abstract * [Y] 9,18; | [X]WO9955230 (HYAL PHARMA CORP [CA], et al) [X] 1-7 * page 1, line 1 - page 11, line 32 *; | [X]FR2825924 (BELLITY PHILIPPE [FR]) [X] 1-7* example 1 *; | [XY] - AKIMA K ET AL, "EVALUATION OF ANTITUMOR ACTIVITIES OF HYALURONATE BINDING ANTITUMORDRUGS: SYNTHESIS, CHARACTERIZATION AND ANTITUMOR ACTIVITY", JOURNAL OF DRUG TARGETING, HARWOOD ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS GMBH, DE, (19960101), vol. 4, ISSN 1061-186X, pages 1 - 08, XP002942515 [X] 1-8,10-17,19 * the whole document * * abstract * [Y] 9,18 | International search | [Y]JP2002544243 ; | [Y] - FRASER J.R. ET AL, "Uptake and degradation of hyaluronan in lymphatic tissue.", BIOCHEM.J., (1988), vol. 256, no. 1, pages 153 - 158, XP002990940 | [Y] - REED R.K. ET AL, "Removal rate of (3H)hyaluronan injected subcutaneously in rabbits.", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF PHYSIOLOGY., (1990), vol. 259, no. 2, pages H532 - H535, XP008052807 |