EP1762562 - AROMATIC AMINE DERIVATIVE AND ORGANIC ELECTROLUMINESCENT ELEMENT USING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 09.07.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.2010 | Withdrawal of application | published on 11.08.2010 [2010/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IDEMITSU KOSAN CO., LTD. 1-1, Marunouchi 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8321 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/11] | For all designated states IDEMITSU KOSAN CO., LTD. 1-1, Marunouchi 3-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8321 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUNAHASHI, Masakazu 1280, Kamiizumi Sodegaura-shi, Chiba 2990293 / JP | [2007/19] |
Former [2007/11] | 01 /
FUNAHASHI, Masakazu 1280, Kamiizumi, Sodegaura-shi, Chiba 2990293 / JP | Representative(s) | Gille Hrabal Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Patentanwälte Brucknerstraße 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/40] | Gille Hrabal Struck Neidlein Prop Roos Patentanwälte Brucknerstrasse 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2007/11] | Gille Hrabal Struck Neidlein Prop Roos Brucknerstrasse 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 05751556.1 | 17.06.2005 | [2007/11] | WO2005JP11105 | Priority number, date | JP20040189368 | 28.06.2004 Original published format: JP 2004189368 | [2007/11] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006001223 | Date: | 05.01.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1762562 | Date: | 14.03.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.01.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/11] | Type: | A8 Corrected patent application | No.: | EP1762562 | Date: | 09.05.2007 | [2007/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 05.01.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.10.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C07C211/58, C09K11/06, H05B33/14, H05B33/22 | [2007/11] | CPC: |
C07C217/92 (EP,US);
C07C211/58 (EP,KR,US);
C07C211/59 (EP,US);
C07C211/61 (EP,US);
C07F7/02 (KR);
C09K11/06 (EP,KR,US);
H05B33/14 (EP,KR,US);
C07C2601/14 (EP,US);
C07C2602/10 (EP,US);
C07C2603/97 (EP,US);
C09K2211/1014 (EP,US);
H10K50/11 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/11] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AROMATISCHES AMINDERIVAT UND ORGANISCHES ELEKTROLUMINESZENTES ELEMENT, BEI DEM DIESES VERWENDET WIRD | [2007/11] | English: | AROMATIC AMINE DERIVATIVE AND ORGANIC ELECTROLUMINESCENT ELEMENT USING THE SAME | [2007/11] | French: | DERIVE D'AMINE AROMATIQUE ET ELEMENT ORGANIQUE ELECTROLUMINESCENT UTILISANT CE DERIVE | [2007/11] | Entry into regional phase | 14.03.2006 | Translation filed | 14.03.2006 | National basic fee paid | 14.03.2006 | Search fee paid | 14.03.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.03.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.03.2006 | Examination requested [2007/11] | 07.07.2010 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2010/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0879868 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1-10* claim -; compounds 30,64,86 * | International search | [X]JPH08305053 (NEC CORP); | [X]JPH11176574 (MITSUI CHEMICALS INC); | [A]JPH11273860 (TOYO INK MFG CO); | [X]JP2001039934 (MITSUI CHEMICALS INC) |