EP1691827 - USE OF PEPTIDES DERIVED FROM THE B BETA CHAIN OF HUMAN FIBRONOGEN FOR THE TREATMENT OF SHOCK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2006/34] | USE OF PEPTIDES DERIVED FROM THE ALPHA OR BETA CHAIN OF HUMAN FIBRONOGEN FOR THE TREATMENT OF SHOCK | ||
[2009/13] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.06.2010 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.06.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.07.2010 [2010/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fibrex Medical Research & Development GmbH Rabensteig 8/3A 1010 Wien / AT | [2006/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PETZELBAUER, Peter Lechthalergasse 49, Haus 17 A-1230 Wien / AT | 02 /
ZACHAROWSKI, Kai Corellistrasse 15 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | [2006/34] | Representative(s) | Schwarz, Albin Schwarz & Partner Patentanwälte Wipplingerstrasse 30 1010 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2006/34] | Schwarz, Albin Kopecky & Schwarz Patentanwälte Wipplingerstrasse 32/22 1010 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 05752350.8 | 24.06.2005 | [2006/34] | WO2005AT00228 | Priority number, date | AT20040001087 | 25.06.2004 Original published format: AT 10872004 | AT20050000040 | 13.01.2005 Original published format: AT 402005 | [2006/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006000007 | Date: | 05.01.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1691827 | Date: | 23.08.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.01.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1691827 | Date: | 19.08.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AT | 05.01.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/36, A61P7/00, A61P9/00 | [2006/34] | CPC: |
A61K38/363 (EP,US);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P7/00 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/34] | Extension states | AL | 15.05.2006 | BA | 15.05.2006 | HR | 15.05.2006 | LV | 15.05.2006 | MK | 15.05.2006 | YU | 15.05.2006 | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON PEPTIDEN, DIE AUS DER B BETA KETTE DES HUMANEN FIBRINOGENS ABGELEITET WURDEN, ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON SCHOCK | [2009/13] | English: | USE OF PEPTIDES DERIVED FROM THE B BETA CHAIN OF HUMAN FIBRONOGEN FOR THE TREATMENT OF SHOCK | [2009/13] | French: | UTILISATION DES PEPTIDES DERIVES DE LA CHAINE B BETA DU FIBRINOGENE HUMAINE POUR LE TRAITEMENT DU CHOC | [2009/13] |
Former [2006/34] | VERWENDUNG VON PEPTIDEN, DIE AUS DER A ALPHA ODER DER B BETA KETTE DES HUMANEN FIBRINOGENS ABGELEITET WURDEN, ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON SCHOCK | ||
Former [2006/34] | USE OF PEPTIDES DERIVED FROM THE ALPHA OR BETA CHAIN OF HUMAN FIBRONOGEN FOR THE TREATMENT OF SHOCK | ||
Former [2006/34] | UTILISATION DES PEPTIDES DERIVES DE LA CHAINE ALPHA OU BETA DU FIBRINOGENE HUMAINE POUR LE TRAITEMENT DU CHOC | Entry into regional phase | 15.05.2006 | National basic fee paid | 15.05.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.05.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.05.2006 | Examination requested [2006/34] | 20.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.10.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 14.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.02.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.03.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.07.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 06.07.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.05.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/30] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 14.12.2007 | Request for further processing filed | 14.12.2007 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 27.12.2007 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]WO9902565 (THERASORB MEDIZINISCHE SYSTEME [DE], et al) [X] 1-4,9 * the whole document * * siehe insbesondere:; page 4, line 14 - page 6, line 8 * * page 7, line 1 - line 24 * [A] 5-8; | [DA]WO0248180 (FIBREX MEDICAL RES & DEV GMBH [AT], et al) [DA] 1-9 * the whole document * * siehe insbesondere:; page 2, line 1 - page 3, line 29 * * page 5, line 17 - page 6, line 14 * * page 17 - page 19; examples 13,14 *; | [A] - ZACHAROWSKI, K. ET AL., "A small molecule derived from fibrinogen, Bbeta15-42, reduces myocardial inflammation and injury via inhibition of the adhesion molecule VE-cadherin", BIOSIS, BIOSCIENCES INFORMATION SERVICE, PHILADELPHIA, PA, US, (2003), Database accession no. 2004:19507, XP002350542 [A] 1-9 * the whole document * | [A] - KNÖBL, P., "Pathophysiologie und Therapie von Sepsis-assoziierten Gerinnungsstörungen", WIENER MEDIZINISCHE WOCHENSCHRIFT, (2002), vol. 152, no. 21-22, pages 559 - 563, XP002350540 [A] 1-9 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1563-258X.2002.02100.x |