EP1873949 - A CHANNEL SHARING METHOD IN THE CLUSTER MOBILE COMMUNICATION SYSTEM BASED ON CDMA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 30.08.2013 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza, Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2013/40] | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza, Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan, Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | ||
Former [2008/01] | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza, Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan, Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIU, Xuemin@ZTE Plaza, Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | 02 /
YANG, Jiaan@ZTE Plaza, Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2013/40] |
Former [2008/01] | 01 /
LIU, Xuemin ZTE Plaza, Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park, Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | ||
02 /
YANG, Jiaan ZTE Plaza, Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park, Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | Representative(s) | Pellkofer, Dieter Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/02] | Pellkofer, Dieter Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/01] | Gervasi, Gemma Notarbartolo & Gervasi GmbH Bavariaring 21 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05752489.4 | 25.04.2005 | [2008/01] | WO2005CN00572 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006114017 | Date: | 02.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1873949 | Date: | 02.01.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.11.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1873949 | Date: | 28.07.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/30] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP1873949 | Date: | 02.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 02.11.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.06.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04W4/06, H04W84/08, // H04W4/10 | [2010/12] | CPC: |
H04W72/30 (EP,US);
H04W76/45 (EP,US);
H04W84/08 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/28] | H04Q7/28, H04Q7/38, // H04J13/02 | ||
Former IPC [2008/01] | H04J13/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/01] | Title | German: | KANAL-SHARING-VERFAHREN IM CLUSTER-MOBILKOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM AUF DER BASIS VON CDMA | [2008/01] | English: | A CHANNEL SHARING METHOD IN THE CLUSTER MOBILE COMMUNICATION SYSTEM BASED ON CDMA | [2008/01] | French: | PROCEDE DE PARTAGE DE CANAUX DANS UN SYSTEME DE COMMUNICATIONS MOBILES PAR REGROUPEMENT DE TYPE CDMA | [2008/01] | Entry into regional phase | 24.10.2007 | Translation filed | 21.11.2007 | National basic fee paid | 21.11.2007 | Search fee paid | 21.11.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.11.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.11.2007 | Examination requested [2008/01] | 11.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.05.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.03.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.06.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 16.06.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
28.04.2011
30.05.2011
WITHDRAWN Telefonaktiebolaget L M Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE Opponent's representative Schwarz, Markku Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/37] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
28.04.2011
30.05.2011
WITHDRAWN Telefonaktiebolaget L M Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE Opponent's representative Schwarz, Markku Kraus & Weisert Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 D-80539 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/24] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
28.04.2011
Telefonaktiebolaget L M Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE Opponent's representative Schwarz, Markku Kraus & Weisert Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 D-80539 München / DE | 06.07.2011 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 14.11.2011 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 31.07.2012 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 16.10.2012 | 20.08.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 16.10.2012 | Date of oral proceedings | 18.10.2012 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 10.12.2012 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 20.12.2012 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 28.03.2013 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 29.04.2013 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 28.07.2010 | BE | 28.07.2010 | CY | 28.07.2010 | EE | 28.07.2010 | FI | 28.07.2010 | HU | 28.07.2010 | LT | 28.07.2010 | NL | 28.07.2010 | SI | 28.07.2010 | SK | 28.07.2010 | TR | 28.07.2010 | BG | 28.10.2010 | GR | 29.10.2010 | ES | 08.11.2010 | IE | 25.04.2011 | LU | 25.04.2011 | MC | 30.04.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 28.07.2010 | |
BE | 28.07.2010 | ||
CY | 28.07.2010 | ||
EE | 28.07.2010 | ||
FI | 28.07.2010 | ||
LT | 28.07.2010 | ||
NL | 28.07.2010 | ||
SI | 28.07.2010 | ||
SK | 28.07.2010 | ||
TR | 28.07.2010 | ||
BG | 28.10.2010 | ||
GR | 29.10.2010 | ||
ES | 08.11.2010 | ||
IE | 25.04.2011 | ||
LU | 25.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/29] | AT | 28.07.2010 | |
BE | 28.07.2010 | ||
CY | 28.07.2010 | ||
EE | 28.07.2010 | ||
FI | 28.07.2010 | ||
LT | 28.07.2010 | ||
NL | 28.07.2010 | ||
SI | 28.07.2010 | ||
SK | 28.07.2010 | ||
BG | 28.10.2010 | ||
GR | 29.10.2010 | ||
ES | 08.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/23] | AT | 28.07.2010 | |
BE | 28.07.2010 | ||
CY | 28.07.2010 | ||
EE | 28.07.2010 | ||
FI | 28.07.2010 | ||
LT | 28.07.2010 | ||
NL | 28.07.2010 | ||
SI | 28.07.2010 | ||
SK | 28.07.2010 | ||
BG | 28.10.2010 | ||
GR | 29.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/16] | AT | 28.07.2010 | |
BE | 28.07.2010 | ||
CY | 28.07.2010 | ||
FI | 28.07.2010 | ||
LT | 28.07.2010 | ||
NL | 28.07.2010 | ||
SI | 28.07.2010 | ||
BG | 28.10.2010 | ||
GR | 29.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/13] | AT | 28.07.2010 | |
CY | 28.07.2010 | ||
FI | 28.07.2010 | ||
LT | 28.07.2010 | ||
NL | 28.07.2010 | ||
SI | 28.07.2010 | ||
BG | 28.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/11] | AT | 28.07.2010 | |
FI | 28.07.2010 | ||
LT | 28.07.2010 | ||
NL | 28.07.2010 | ||
SI | 28.07.2010 | ||
BG | 28.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/08] | AT | 28.07.2010 | |
LT | 28.07.2010 | ||
NL | 28.07.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1168873 (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [A] 1-5 * paragraphs [0005] , [0007] , [0009] , [0010] * * figures 1,2 *; | [X]WO03009617 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al) [X] 1-5 * page 1, line 23 - page 2, line 12 * * page 5, line 3 - page 7, line 7 * * page 8, line 11 - page 9, line 11 * * figures 2,4 *; | [A]EP1372350 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-5 * paragraphs [0015] - [0017] ** paragraphs [0035] , [0079] *; | [A]WO2004017525 (ZTE SAN DIEGO INC [US], et al) [A] 1-5 * paragraphs [0027] , [0028] , [0033] , [0040] , [0044] * * paragraphs [0048] - [0053] * * figures 2,4,6-9 * | International search | [A]CN1549485 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]); | [A]CN1549484 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]); | [A]CN1567790 (ZTE CORP [CN]); | [A]CN1567783 (ZTE CORP [CN]) |