EP1763551 - BIODEGRADABLE COMPOSITE, USE THEREOF AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING A BIODEGRADABLE BLOCK COPOLYESTER-URETHANE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.05.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.05.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.06.2016 [2016/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Universität Ulm Albert-Einstein-Allee 5 89081 Ulm / DE | [2007/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SELIGER, Hartmut Hasenweg 1 89275 Elchingen / DE | 02 /
HÄBERLEIN, Hans Hilpoltsteiner Strasse 57 91154 Roth / DE | [2007/12] | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 11a 80339 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/28] | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 13 80339 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/12] | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 13 80339 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05752756.6 | 07.06.2005 | [2007/12] | WO2005EP06103 | Priority number, date | DE20041027673 | 07.06.2004 Original published format: DE102004027673 | [2007/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005121216 | Date: | 22.12.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/51] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1763551 | Date: | 21.03.2007 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.12.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.03.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C08G71/00 | [2007/12] | CPC: |
C08G18/4283 (EP,US);
C08G18/4202 (EP,US);
C08L75/06 (EP,US);
C08G2230/00 (EP,US);
C08L5/00 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08L75/06, C08L2666/26 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/12] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BIODEGRADABLES VERBUNDSYSTEM UND DESSEN VERWENDUNG SOWIE VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES BIOABBAUBAREN BLOCK-COPOLYESTERURETHANS | [2007/12] | English: | BIODEGRADABLE COMPOSITE, USE THEREOF AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING A BIODEGRADABLE BLOCK COPOLYESTER-URETHANE | [2007/12] | French: | SYSTEME COMPOSITE BIODEGRADABLE, UTILISATION DE CELUI-CI ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'UN URETHANE DE COPOLYESTER SEQUENCE BIODEGRADABLE | [2007/12] | Entry into regional phase | 05.01.2007 | National basic fee paid | 05.01.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.01.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.01.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.01.2007 | Examination requested [2007/12] | 26.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.05.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.05.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.08.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.02.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.06.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.01.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/24] | 28.01.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/24] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.01.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2015 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH0493315 ; | [Y]GB908949 (ICI LTD) [Y] 18-20 * page 4 - page 5; examples 3,4 * * page 1, line 42 - line 51 *; | [Y]FR2840309 (GEMPLUS CARD INT [FR], et al) [Y] 1-17,21-25 * claims 1,5,21,22,24,27,28 *; | [Y] - G. R. SAAD, "Calorimetric and Dielectric Study of the Segmented Biodegradable Poly(ester-urethane)s Based on Bacterial Poly[(R)-3-hydroxbutyrate]", MACROMOLECULAR BIOSCIENCE, Weinheim, (200112), vol. 1, no. 9, pages 387 - 396, XP002355762 [Y] 1-26 * page 388, column 1, paragraph 1 - column 2, paragraph 3; figure 1 * * page 395, column 2, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/1616-5195(20011201)1:9<387::AID-MABI387>3.0.CO;2-4 | [Y] - T. D. HIRT, P. NEUENSCHWANDER, U. W. SUTER, "Synthesis of degradable, biocompatible, and tough block-copolyesterurethanes", MACROMOLECULAR CHEMISTRY AND PHYSICS, Weinheim, (199612), vol. 197, no. 12, pages 4253 - 4268, XP002355763 [Y] 26 * page 4254 - page 4255 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/macp.1996.021971221 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920717), vol. 016, no. 329, Database accession no. (C - 0963), & JP04093315 A 19920326 (DENKI KAGAKU KOGYO KK) [A] 1-26 * abstract * |