EP1751444 - CLUTCH DEVICE, IN PARTICULAR DOUBLE CLUTCH DEVICE, WITH A DEVICE FOR AXIALLY POSITIONING THE CLUTCH DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/07] | DEVICE FOR AXIALLY POSITIONING A CLUTCH DEVICE | ||
[2008/36] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.07.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.08.2009 [2009/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BorgWarner, Inc. 3850 Hamlin Road Auburn Hills, MI 48326-2872 / US | [2008/37] |
Former [2007/07] | For all designated states Borgwarner, Inc. 3850 Hamlin Road Auburn Hills, MI 48326-2872 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GOLD, Eckart Philipp-Schwab-Str. 3 68766 Hockenheim / DE | 02 /
HEINRICH, Johannes Frankfurter Hohl 5 61381 Friedrichsdorf / DE | 03 /
HERTEL, Marcus Gärtnerstrasse 85 68169 Mannheim / DE | 04 /
GERLACH, Martin Stahlbühlring 207 68526 Ladenburg / DE | 05 /
NICKLAS, Götz Bischof-Emanuel-Strasse 8 67346 Speyer / DE | 06 /
HAUCK, Hans-Jürgen Altenhausen 15/1 74523 Schwäbisch Hall / DE | 07 /
HENZE, Jens Grosse Strasse 5 37127 Scheden / DE | [2007/18] |
Former [2007/07] | 01 /
GOLD, Eckart Untere Hauptstrasse 27 78766 Hockenheim / DE | ||
02 /
HEINRICH, Johannes Frankfurter Hohl 5 61381 Friedrichsdorf / DE | |||
03 /
HERTEL, Marcus Gärtnerstrasse 85 68169 Mannheim / DE | |||
04 /
GERLACH, Martin Stahlbühlring 207 68526 Ladenburg / DE | |||
05 /
NICKLAS, Götz Bischof-Emanuel-Strasse 8 67346 Speyer / DE | |||
06 /
HAUCK, Hans-Jürgen Altenhausen 15/1 74523 Schwäbisch Hall / DE | |||
07 /
HENZE, Jens Grosse Strasse 5 37127 Scheden / DE | Representative(s) | Westphal, Mussgnug & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Am Riettor 5 78048 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/07] | Patentanwälte Westphal, Mussgnug & Partner Am Riettor 5 78048 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | Application number, filing date | 05752882.0 | 01.06.2005 | [2007/07] | WO2005EP05856 | Priority number, date | EP20040013095 | 03.06.2004 Original published format: EP 04013095 | [2007/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005119080 | Date: | 15.12.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1751444 | Date: | 14.02.2007 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.12.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1751444 | Date: | 03.09.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | F16D25/10, F16D25/12, F16D21/06, F16D25/0638 | [2007/07] | CPC: |
F16D25/12 (EP,KR,US);
F16D25/0638 (EP,KR,US);
F16D21/06 (US);
F16D25/10 (EP,KR);
F16D2021/0607 (EP,US);
F16D2021/0661 (EP,US);
F16D2021/0692 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2007/27] |
Former [2007/07] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KUPPLUNGSEINRICHTUNG , INSBESONDERE DOPPELKUPPLUNGSEINRICHTUNG, MIT EINER EINRICHTUNG ZUR AXIALEN POSITIONIERUNG DER KUPPLUNGSEINRICHTUNG | [2008/36] | English: | CLUTCH DEVICE, IN PARTICULAR DOUBLE CLUTCH DEVICE, WITH A DEVICE FOR AXIALLY POSITIONING THE CLUTCH DEVICE | [2008/36] | French: | SYSTEME D' EMBRAYAGE, EN PARTICULIER SYSTEME D'EMBRAYAGE DOUBLE, AVEC UN DISPOSITIF DE POSITIONNEMENT AXIAL DU SYSTEME D'EMBRAYAGE | [2008/36] |
Former [2007/07] | EINRICHTUNG ZUR AXIALEN POSITIONIERUNG EINER KUPPLUNGSEINRICHTUNG | ||
Former [2007/07] | DEVICE FOR AXIALLY POSITIONING A CLUTCH DEVICE | ||
Former [2007/07] | DISPOSITIF DE POSITIONNEMENT AXIAL D'UN SYSTEME D'EMBRAYAGE | Entry into regional phase | 08.12.2006 | National basic fee paid | 08.12.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.12.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.12.2006 | Examination requested [2007/07] | 04.01.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 09.02.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 30.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.04.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.07.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 16.07.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.06.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]GB465612 (BRISTOL AEROPLANE CO LTD, et al) [X] 1-3,5,6 * page 3, line 82 - line 96 *; | [A]GB812784 (SNOW NABSTEDT GEAR CORP) [A] 1 * page 4, line 10 - line 30; figure - *; | [DA]EP1052421 (BORG WARNER AUTOMOTIVE GMBH [DE]) [DA] 1* figure - * |