EP1749340 - SOLAR INVERTER AND PHOTOVOLTAIC INSTALLATION COMPRISING SEVERAL SOLAR INVERTERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.12.2010 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.12.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.01.2011 [2011/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/06] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BURGER, Roland Hardsteiger Strasse 13 88317 Aichstetten / DE | [2007/06] | Application number, filing date | 05753007.3 | 25.05.2005 | [2007/06] | WO2005EP05678 | Priority number, date | DE20041025924 | 27.05.2004 Original published format: DE102004025924 | [2007/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005117245 | Date: | 08.12.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1749340 | Date: | 07.02.2007 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.12.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H02M7/48, H02J3/38 | [2007/06] | CPC: |
H02M7/493 (EP,KR,US);
H02M7/521 (KR);
H02J3/381 (EP,US);
H02J7/35 (KR);
H02M7/48 (KR);
H02J13/00016 (EP,US);
H02J2300/24 (EP,US);
Y02E10/56 (EP,US);
Y02E40/70 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/06] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SOLARWECHSELRICHTER UND PHOTOVOLTAIKANLAGE MIT MEHREREN SOLARWECHSELRICHTERN | [2007/06] | English: | SOLAR INVERTER AND PHOTOVOLTAIC INSTALLATION COMPRISING SEVERAL SOLAR INVERTERS | [2007/06] | French: | CONVERTISSEUR SOLAIRE ET DISPOSITIF PHOTOVOLTAIQUE COMPORTANT PLUSIEURS CONVERTISSEURS SOLAIRES | [2007/06] | Entry into regional phase | 20.09.2006 | National basic fee paid | 20.09.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.09.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.03.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 20.09.2006 | Examination requested [2007/06] | 11.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.07.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/03] | 26.08.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0718952 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1-13 * abstract * * page 7, line 15 - line 17 * * page 8 * * figures 1,5,8 *; | [A]DE19859732 (ABAC ELEKTRONISCHE KOMMUNIKATI [DE]) [A] 1-13 * abstract ** column 1, line 65 - line 68 *; | [X]US6362540 (HILL BRYAN T [US]) [X] 1-13 * abstract * * Spalte 3, Zeilen 48-5; Spalte, 4 Zeilen 53-61; von Spalte 5, Zeile 58 bis zur Spalte 6, Zeile 7; Spalte 6, Zeilen 49-67* * figures 1-3 *; | [A]US2004024494 (BAYOUMI DEIA SALAH-ELDIN [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * abstract * * paragraphs [0041] , [0050] - [0052] - [0107] * |