EP1784432 - CATALYST COMPRISING CHROMIUM AND ZIRCONIUM FOR THE POLYMERIZATION AND/OR COPOLYMERIZATION OF OLEFINS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.04.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.12.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 10.01.2018 [2018/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Basell Polyolefine GmbH Brühler Strasse 60 50389 Wesseling / DE | [2015/22] |
Former [2007/20] | For all designated states Basell Polyolefine GmbH Brühler Strasse 60 50389 Wesseling / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MIHAN, Shahram Am Eichwald 18 65812 Bad Soden / DE | 02 /
HAUFE, Andreas Horst-Schork-Strasse 178 67069 Ludwigshafen / DE | 03 /
KÖLLE, Peter Ringelnatzgasse 24 a 50996 Köln-Rodenkirchen / DE | 04 /
WULFF-DÖRING, Joachim Hanns-Fey-Strasse 4 67227 Frankenthal / DE | 05 /
TREFFKORN, Ingo Bussardstrasse 8a 67373 Dudenhofen / DE | 06 /
FUNK, Guido Dürerstrasse 5 67549 Worms / DE | [2007/27] |
Former [2007/20] | 01 /
MIHAN, Shahram Am Eichwald 18 65812 Bad Soden / DE | ||
02 /
HAUFE, Andreas Horst-Schork-Strasse 178 67069 Ludwigshafen / DE | |||
03 /
KÖLLE, Peter Kirschblütenweg 7 50996 Köln-Rodenkirchen / DE | |||
04 /
WULFF-DÖRING, Joachim Hanns-Fey-Strasse 4 67227 Frankenthal / DE | |||
05 /
TREFFKORN, Ingo Bussardstrasse 8a 67373 Dudenhofen / DE | |||
06 /
FUNK, Guido Dürerstrasse 5 67549 Worms / DE | Representative(s) | Giberti, Stefano Basell Poliolefine Italia S.r.l. Intellectual Property P.le Privato Donegani 12 44100 Ferrara / IT | [2015/22] |
Former [2013/46] | Giberti, Stefano Basell Poliolefine Italia S.r.l. Intellectual Property P.le Privato Donegani 12 44100 Ferrara / IT | Application number, filing date | 05753967.8 | 09.06.2005 | [2007/20] | WO2005EP52681 | Priority number, date | DE20041028765 | 16.06.2004 Original published format: DE102004028765 | US20040590663P | 23.07.2004 Original published format: US 590663 P | [2007/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005123793 | Date: | 29.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1784432 | Date: | 16.05.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.12.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1784432 | Date: | 27.05.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C08F10/02, C08F4/18, C08F4/24, C08F210/16 | [2014/40] | CPC: |
C08F10/00 (EP,KR,US);
C08F4/69 (KR);
C08F4/695 (KR);
C08F4/76 (KR);
C08F210/16 (EP,US);
C08F2410/04 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08F10/00, C08F4/18 (EP,US);
C08F10/00, C08F4/24 (US,EP);
C08F210/16, C08F210/14, C08F2500/04, C08F2500/17, C08F2500/12 (US,EP);
C08F210/16, C08F210/14, C08F2500/12, C08F2500/18, C08F2500/04, C08F2500/13 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [2007/20] | C08F10/02, C08F4/78, C08F4/22 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/22] |
Former [2007/20] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | CHROM UND ZIRCONIUM ENTHALTENDER KATALYSATOR FÜR DIE POLYMERISATION UND/ODER COPOLYMERISATION VON OLEFINEN | [2007/20] | English: | CATALYST COMPRISING CHROMIUM AND ZIRCONIUM FOR THE POLYMERIZATION AND/OR COPOLYMERIZATION OF OLEFINS | [2007/20] | French: | CATALYSEUR COMPRENANT DU CHROME ET DU ZINC POUR LA POLYMERISATION ET/OU LA COPOLYMERISATION D'OLEFINES | [2007/20] | Entry into regional phase | 06.12.2006 | National basic fee paid | 06.12.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.12.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.12.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.12.2006 | Examination requested [2007/20] | 05.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.11.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.04.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.10.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.10.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.02.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.09.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.01.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.10.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.02.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 09.02.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.02.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.09.2008 | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.06.2005 | AT | 27.05.2015 | BE | 27.05.2015 | CY | 27.05.2015 | CZ | 27.05.2015 | DK | 27.05.2015 | EE | 27.05.2015 | IT | 27.05.2015 | LT | 27.05.2015 | MC | 27.05.2015 | NL | 27.05.2015 | PL | 27.05.2015 | RO | 27.05.2015 | SE | 27.05.2015 | SI | 27.05.2015 | SK | 27.05.2015 | TR | 27.05.2015 | IE | 09.06.2015 | LU | 09.06.2015 | CH | 30.06.2015 | LI | 30.06.2015 | FR | 27.07.2015 | BG | 27.08.2015 | GB | 27.08.2015 | GR | 28.08.2015 | IS | 27.09.2015 | PT | 28.09.2015 | [2018/02] |
Former [2017/40] | HU | 09.06.2005 | |
AT | 27.05.2015 | ||
BE | 27.05.2015 | ||
CY | 27.05.2015 | ||
CZ | 27.05.2015 | ||
DK | 27.05.2015 | ||
EE | 27.05.2015 | ||
IT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LT | 27.05.2015 | ||
MC | 27.05.2015 | ||
NL | 27.05.2015 | ||
PL | 27.05.2015 | ||
RO | 27.05.2015 | ||
SE | 27.05.2015 | ||
SI | 27.05.2015 | ||
SK | 27.05.2015 | ||
TR | 27.05.2015 | ||
IE | 09.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
FR | 27.07.2015 | ||
BG | 27.08.2015 | ||
GB | 27.08.2015 | ||
GR | 28.08.2015 | ||
IS | 27.09.2015 | ||
PT | 28.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 27.05.2015 | |
BE | 27.05.2015 | ||
CZ | 27.05.2015 | ||
DK | 27.05.2015 | ||
EE | 27.05.2015 | ||
IT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LT | 27.05.2015 | ||
MC | 27.05.2015 | ||
PL | 27.05.2015 | ||
RO | 27.05.2015 | ||
SI | 27.05.2015 | ||
SK | 27.05.2015 | ||
IE | 09.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
FR | 27.07.2015 | ||
BG | 27.08.2015 | ||
GB | 27.08.2015 | ||
GR | 28.08.2015 | ||
IS | 27.09.2015 | ||
PT | 28.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/34] | AT | 27.05.2015 | |
CZ | 27.05.2015 | ||
DK | 27.05.2015 | ||
EE | 27.05.2015 | ||
IT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LT | 27.05.2015 | ||
MC | 27.05.2015 | ||
PL | 27.05.2015 | ||
RO | 27.05.2015 | ||
SI | 27.05.2015 | ||
SK | 27.05.2015 | ||
IE | 09.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
BG | 27.08.2015 | ||
GB | 27.08.2015 | ||
GR | 28.08.2015 | ||
IS | 27.09.2015 | ||
PT | 28.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 27.05.2015 | |
CZ | 27.05.2015 | ||
DK | 27.05.2015 | ||
EE | 27.05.2015 | ||
IT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LT | 27.05.2015 | ||
MC | 27.05.2015 | ||
PL | 27.05.2015 | ||
RO | 27.05.2015 | ||
SI | 27.05.2015 | ||
SK | 27.05.2015 | ||
IE | 09.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
BG | 27.08.2015 | ||
GR | 28.08.2015 | ||
IS | 27.09.2015 | ||
PT | 28.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 27.05.2015 | |
CZ | 27.05.2015 | ||
DK | 27.05.2015 | ||
EE | 27.05.2015 | ||
IT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LT | 27.05.2015 | ||
MC | 27.05.2015 | ||
PL | 27.05.2015 | ||
RO | 27.05.2015 | ||
SK | 27.05.2015 | ||
IE | 09.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
BG | 27.08.2015 | ||
GR | 28.08.2015 | ||
IS | 27.09.2015 | ||
PT | 28.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 27.05.2015 | |
CZ | 27.05.2015 | ||
DK | 27.05.2015 | ||
EE | 27.05.2015 | ||
IT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LT | 27.05.2015 | ||
MC | 27.05.2015 | ||
PL | 27.05.2015 | ||
RO | 27.05.2015 | ||
SK | 27.05.2015 | ||
IE | 09.06.2015 | ||
BG | 27.08.2015 | ||
GR | 28.08.2015 | ||
IS | 27.09.2015 | ||
PT | 28.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/13] | AT | 27.05.2015 | |
CZ | 27.05.2015 | ||
DK | 27.05.2015 | ||
EE | 27.05.2015 | ||
IT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LT | 27.05.2015 | ||
MC | 27.05.2015 | ||
PL | 27.05.2015 | ||
RO | 27.05.2015 | ||
SK | 27.05.2015 | ||
BG | 27.08.2015 | ||
GR | 28.08.2015 | ||
IS | 27.09.2015 | ||
PT | 28.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | AT | 27.05.2015 | |
CZ | 27.05.2015 | ||
DK | 27.05.2015 | ||
EE | 27.05.2015 | ||
IT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LT | 27.05.2015 | ||
PL | 27.05.2015 | ||
RO | 27.05.2015 | ||
SK | 27.05.2015 | ||
BG | 27.08.2015 | ||
GR | 28.08.2015 | ||
IS | 27.09.2015 | ||
PT | 28.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | AT | 27.05.2015 | |
DK | 27.05.2015 | ||
EE | 27.05.2015 | ||
IT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LT | 27.05.2015 | ||
BG | 27.08.2015 | ||
GR | 28.08.2015 | ||
IS | 27.09.2015 | ||
PT | 28.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/08] | AT | 27.05.2015 | |
DK | 27.05.2015 | ||
IT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LT | 27.05.2015 | ||
BG | 27.08.2015 | ||
GR | 28.08.2015 | ||
IS | 27.09.2015 | ||
PT | 28.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 27.05.2015 | |
DK | 27.05.2015 | ||
LT | 27.05.2015 | ||
BG | 27.08.2015 | ||
GR | 28.08.2015 | ||
IS | 27.09.2015 | ||
PT | 28.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/51] | AT | 27.05.2015 | |
LT | 27.05.2015 | ||
BG | 27.08.2015 | ||
GR | 28.08.2015 | ||
IS | 27.09.2015 | ||
PT | 28.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | LT | 27.05.2015 | |
BG | 27.08.2015 | ||
GR | 28.08.2015 | ||
IS | 27.09.2015 | ||
PT | 28.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | LT | 27.05.2015 | |
GR | 28.08.2015 | ||
PT | 28.09.2015 | Cited in | International search | [X]US3165504 (HOGAN JOHN P) [X] 1-5,11,14-20 * example - * * column 2, line 28 - line 30 * * column 3, line 7 - line 8 *; | [X]US4454242 (IKEGAMI TADASHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-4,8-12,14-20 * column 8, line 47 - line 61 * * column 3, line 28 - line 30 *; | [A]JPS5915407 ; | [X]US4128500 (HWANG YU-TANG, et al) [X] 1-4,7-9,11,14-20 * column 2, line 45 - line 53 * * column 3, line 31 - line 35 * * column 3, line 61 - line 68 * * example - * * claim - *; | [X]WO9217511 (QUANTUM CHEM CORP [US]) [X] 1-5,7-9,11,14-20 * page 12, line 27 - line 29 * * page 14, line 3 - line 14 * * page 24, line 24 - line 32 * * page 45; example xii * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19840509), vol. 008, no. 098, Database accession no. (C - 221), & JP59015407 A 19840126 (ASAHI KASEI KOGYO KK) [A] 1-20 * abstract * | by applicant | US5032651 | US4128500 | BE861275 | US4284527 | EP0166157 | DE3635710 | DE2540279 | WO9748743 | EP0229368 | US5026795 | US4182810 | US3242150 | US3248179 | - ADVANCES IN CATALYSIS, vol. 33, page 62 | - ADVANCES IN CATALYSIS, vol. 33, page 48 |