Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
26.09.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.10.2008 [2008/44] |
04.06.2008 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
11.04.2008 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
01.03.2008 | Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
19.10.2007 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
19.10.2007 | First examination report | |
22.06.2007 | Change - extension states | published on 25.07.2007 [2007/30] |
15.06.2007 | Change - applicant | published on 18.07.2007 [2007/29] |
08.06.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 11.07.2007 [2007/28] |
24.04.2007 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
26.01.2007 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 28.02.2007 [2007/09] |
26.01.2007 | Request for examination filed | published on 28.02.2007 [2007/09] |
19.01.2007 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
24.11.2006 | Amendment by applicant | |
23.11.2006 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
22.11.2006 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
05.11.2005 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
28.10.2005 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
03.09.2005 | PCT data prior to European publication |