EP1774405 - SYSTEM FOR MEASURING THE IMAGE QUALITY OF AN OPTICAL IMAGING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.06.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.07.2015 [2015/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Carl Zeiss SMT GmbH Rudolf-Eber-Strasse 2 73447 Oberkochen / DE | [2011/10] |
Former [2007/16] | For all designated states Carl Zeiss SMT AG Rudolf-Eber-Strasse 2 73447 Oberkochen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MENGEL, Markus Täle 27 89522 Heidenheim / DE | 02 /
WEGMANN, Ulrich Erlenweg 5 89551 Königsbronn / DE | 03 /
EHRMANN, Albrecht Gewandweg 22 73432 Aalen / DE | 04 /
EMER, Wolfgang Hannah-Arendt-Strasse 6 73431 Aalen / DE | 05 /
CLEMENT, Reiner Reuttierstrasse 5 73340 Amstetten / DE | 06 /
MATHIJSSEN, Ludo Becherlehenstrasse 40 73527 Schwäbisch Gmünd / DE | [2007/23] |
Former [2007/16] | 01 /
MENGEL, Markus Täle 27 89522 Heidenheim / DE | ||
02 /
WEGMANN, Ulrich Erlenweg 5 89551 Königsbronn / DE | |||
03 /
EHRMANN, Albrecht An der Eichhalde 2 89551 Königsbronn / DE | |||
04 /
EMER, Wolfgang Hannah-Arendt-Strasse 6 73431 Aalen / DE | |||
05 /
CLEMENT, Reiner Reuttierstrasse 5 73340 Amstetten / DE | |||
06 /
MATHIJSSEN, Ludo Siechenberg 1 73529 Schwäbisch Gmünd / DE | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Ruff, Wilhelm, Beier, Dauster & Partner mbB Postfach 10 40 36 70035 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/32] | Patentanwälte Ruff, Wilhelm, Beier, Dauster & Partner Postfach 10 40 36 70035 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2008/41] | Patentanwälte Ruff, Wilhelm, Beier, Dauster & Partner Postfach 10 40 36 70035 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2007/16] | Patentanwälte Ruff, Wilhelm, Beier, Dauster & Partner Postfach 10 40 36 70035 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 05754724.2 | 02.06.2005 | [2007/16] | WO2005EP05918 | Priority number, date | US20040576803P | 04.06.2004 Original published format: US 576803 P | [2007/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005119368 | Date: | 15.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/50] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1774405 | Date: | 18.04.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.12.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1774405 | Date: | 06.08.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.05.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G03F7/20 | [2007/16] | CPC: |
G03F7/70341 (EP,US);
G03F7/20 (KR);
G01M11/0257 (US);
G01M11/0214 (US);
G01M11/0271 (US);
G03F7/70591 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, NL [2007/37] |
Former [2007/16] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR MESSUNG DER BILDQUALITÄT EINES OPTISCHEN BILDGEBUNGSSYSTEMS | [2007/16] | English: | SYSTEM FOR MEASURING THE IMAGE QUALITY OF AN OPTICAL IMAGING SYSTEM | [2007/16] | French: | SYSTEME PERMETTANT DE MESURER LA QUALITE D'UNE IMAGE D'UN SYSTEME D'IMAGERIE OPTIQUE | [2007/16] | Entry into regional phase | 22.12.2006 | National basic fee paid | 22.12.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.12.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.12.2006 | Examination requested [2007/16] | 22.03.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.05.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.11.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.03.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.06.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 26.06.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.06.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.05.2012 | Opposition(s) | 07.05.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]WO9900689 (NORTHERN EDGE ASSOCIATES INC [CA], et al) [X] 1,3-21,25-30 * abstract * * figures 1-3 * * page 1, line 5 - line 19 * * page 7, line 14 - page 8, line 40 * * page 11, line 24 - page 12, line 4 * * page 14, line 1 - line 17 * * page 20, line 18 - page 21, line 11 * [A] 2,22-24,31; | [X]EP1420300 (ASML NETHERLANDS BV [NL]) [X] 1,25,31 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0029] * * paragraph [0037] *; | [XA]EP1416327 (ASML NETHERLANDS BV [NL]) [X] 1,25 * abstract * * figures 1-6 * * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0023] * * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0041] * [A] 1; | [DA]US5973773 (KOBAYASHI NAOYUKI [JP]) [DA] 1,25,31 * abstract * * figure 1 * * column 1, line 12 - line 13 * * column 2, line 31 - line 67 *; | [A]JP2002071513 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20020703), vol. 2002, no. 07, & JP2002071513 A 20020308 (NIKON CORP) [A] 1,25,31 * abstract * * figure 1 * | Examination | EP0418054 | EP0107331 | by applicant | US5769954 | US5973773 | EP0418054 | EP0107331 | DE10261775 | - M.SWITKES; M.ROTHSCHILD, "Immersion Lithography at 157 nm", J.VAC.SCI. TECHNOL. B, (200111), vol. 19, no. 6, page 1FT |