EP1761266 - COMPOUNDS, FORMULATIONS, AND METHODS FOR TREATING OR PREVENTING INFLAMMATORY SKIN DISORDERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.03.2014 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.04.2014 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: RO | published on 28.05.2014 [2014/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Galderma Pharma S.A. World Trade Center Avenue Gratta-Paille 1 1000 Lausanne 30 Grey / CH | [2011/10] |
Former [2007/11] | For all designated states Sansrosa Pharmaceutical Development, Inc. 2 Taylor Drive New Brunswick, NJ 08901-1515 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DEJOVIN, Jack A. 2 Taylor Drive New Brunswick, New Jersey 08901-1515 / US | 02 /
ROSSI, Thomas M. 104 Sandy Ridge Mount Airy Rd. Stockton, New Jersey 08559-2009 / US | [2007/11] | Representative(s) | Jansen, Cornelis Marinus, et al V.O. Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2012/17] | Jansen, Cornelis Marinus, et al Vereenigde Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [2008/34] | van Loon, C.J.J., et al Vereenigde Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [2007/11] | van Loon, C.J.J., et al c/o VEREENIGDE Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR The Hague / NL | Application number, filing date | 05754754.9 | 25.05.2005 | [2007/11] | WO2005US18288 | Priority number, date | US20040853585 | 25.05.2004 Original published format: US 853585 | US20040574142P | 25.05.2004 Original published format: US 574142 P | [2007/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005115395 | Date: | 08.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/49] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1761266 | Date: | 14.03.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.12.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1761266 | Date: | 08.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 09.04.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.10.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/498, A61K31/4164, A61P17/00 | [2012/52] | CPC: |
A61K31/137 (EP,CN,KR);
A61K45/06 (CN);
A61K31/4164 (EP,CN,KR);
A61K31/4174 (CN);
A61K31/498 (EP,CN,KR);
A61K9/0014 (CN);
A61K9/06 (CN);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/02 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/4174, A61K2300/00 (CN)
|
Former IPC [2009/45] | A61K31/52, A61K31/44, A61K31/135, A61P17/00, A61P17/10 | ||
Former IPC [2009/25] | A61K9/00, A61K31/74 | ||
Former IPC [2007/11] | A61K31/498, A61K31/4164, A61K31/137 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/11] | Title | German: | VERBINDUNGEN, FORMULIERUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG ODER PRÄVENTION VON ENTZÜNDLICHEN HAUTERKRANKUNGEN | [2007/11] | English: | COMPOUNDS, FORMULATIONS, AND METHODS FOR TREATING OR PREVENTING INFLAMMATORY SKIN DISORDERS | [2007/11] | French: | COMPOSES, PREPARATIONS ET METHODES PERMETTANT DE TRAITER OU DE PREVENIR DES TROUBLES INFLAMMATOIRES CUTANES | [2007/11] | Entry into regional phase | 22.12.2006 | National basic fee paid | 22.12.2006 | Search fee paid | 22.12.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.12.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.12.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 22.12.2006 | Examination requested [2007/11] | 07.04.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.10.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.01.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.03.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.02.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.03.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 25.03.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP12165557.5 / EP2481412 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.04.2011 | Opposition(s) | 11.02.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2014/22] |
Former [2014/11] | RO | 08.05.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4256763 (MCHUGH JOHN E) [X] 1-28 * claims 1,11 *; | [X]US4285967 (GUBERNICK JOSEPH, et al) [X] 1-28 * claim - *; | [X]US5916574 (FRIED KAREN G [US], et al) [X] 1-28 * column 2, line 26 - line 56 *; | [PX]WO2004105703 (SANSROSA PHARMACEUTICAL DEV IN [US]) [PX] 1-28 * example 13 *; | [PX]WO2005002580 (ALLERGAN INC [US], et al) [PX] 1-28* page 17, line 24 - page 18, line 9 *; | [PX]WO2005010025 (SCHERER WARREN J [US]) [PX] 1,4-9,13,20,27,28 * page 4, line 21 - line 32 * * page 6, line 3 - line 21 * * page 6, line 27 - page 7, line 5 *; | [XY] - GUARRERA M ET AL, "FLUSHING IN ROSACEA: A POSSIBLE MECHANISM", ARCHIVES OF DERMATOLOGICAL RESEARCH, SPRINGER, INTERNATIONAL, BERLIN, DE, (19820101), vol. 272, no. 3/04, ISSN 0340-3696, pages 311 - 316, XP008012346 [X] 1,4-9,12,13,20,27,28 * abstract * * page 315, paragraph 1 - paragraph 2 * [Y] 1-28 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF00509061 | [XY] - REBORA A, "THE MANAGEMENT OF ROSACEA", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF CLINICAL DERMATOLOGY, ADIS, US, (20020101), vol. 3, ISSN 1175-0561, pages 489 - 496, XP009034164 [X] 1,4-9,12,13,20,27,28 * abstract * * page 491, column 1, paragraph 2 * [Y] 1-28 | [Y] - BURKE J ET AL, "Preclinical evaluation of brimonidine", SURVEY OF OPHTHALMOLOGY, SURVEY OF OPHTHALMOLOGY INC, XX, vol. 41, ISSN 0039-6257, (19961101), pages S9 - S18, (19961101), XP023437195 [Y] 1-28 * page S9, column 2, paragraph 2 - page S10, column 1, paragraph 3 * * p. S16 col. 1 "TOXICOLOGY" * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0039-6257(96)82027-3 | [Y] - NIELSEN H ET AL, "POSTJUNCTIONAL ALPHA-2-ADRENOCEPTORS MEDIATE VASOCONSTRICTION IN HUMAN SUBCUTANEOUS RESISTANCE VESSELS", BRITISH JOURNAL OF PHARMACOLOGY, (1989), vol. 97, no. 3, ISSN 0007-1188, pages 829 - 834, XP009114426 [Y] 1-28 * abstract * * page 833, column 2, paragraph L * | [X] - LINDGREN B R ET AL, "EFFECTS OF SOME ANTIHYPERTENSIVE DRUGS ON CUTANEOUS BLOOD FLOW AND INFLAMMATORY SKIN RESPONSES FOLLOWING ALLERGEN CHALLENGE IN GUINEA-PIGS", PHARMACOLOGY AND TOXICOLOGY, (1987), vol. 60, no. 5, ISSN 0901-9928, pages 364 - 367, XP002546987 [X] 1-28 * page 366, column 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1600-0773.1987.tb01528.x | International search | [X]US5720962 (IVY JEFFERY WADE [US], et al); | [Y]US6117877 (FOGEL BARRY S [US]) | by applicant | WO2005002580 | EP1638569 | US4256763 | US5916574 | US4285967 | - LINDGREN B. R. ET AL., "Effects of some antihypertensive drugs on cutaneous blood flow and inflammatory skin responses following allergen challenge in guinea-pigs", PHARMACOLOGY AND TOXICOLOGY, (1987), vol. 60, no. 5, doi:doi:10.1111/j.1600-0773.1987.tb01528.x, pages 364 - 367, XP002546987 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1600-0773.1987.tb01528.x |