03.12.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.01.2011 [2011/01] |
27.08.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.09.2010 [2010/39] |
16.07.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.08.2010 [2010/33] |
20.11.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.12.2009 [2009/52] |
29.05.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.07.2009 [2009/27] |
29.05.2009 |
Change - representative |
published on 01.07.2009 [2009/27] |
24.04.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.05.2009 [2009/22] |
09.01.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.02.2009 [2009/07] |
28.11.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.12.2008 [2009/01] |
14.11.2008 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 17.12.2008 [2008/51] |
13.11.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.12.2008 [2008/50] |
10.10.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.11.2008 [2008/46] |
19.09.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.10.2008 [2008/43] |
12.09.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.10.2008 [2008/42] |
22.08.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.09.2008 [2008/39] |
01.08.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.09.2008 [2008/36] |
30.05.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.07.2008 [2008/27] |
23.05.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.06.2008 [2008/26] |
07.12.2007 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] |
04.12.2007 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
04.12.2007 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
07.07.2007 |
Change - extension states |
published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] |
04.07.2007 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
28.06.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.03.2007 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 18.04.2007 [2007/16] |
16.03.2007 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 18.04.2007 [2007/16] |
13.03.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.02.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.02.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.02.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
10.02.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.09.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|