EP1774132 - A DRILL BIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.11.2008 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.12.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG, GR | published on 05.01.2011 [2011/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ATLAS COPCO CRAELIUS AB 195 82 Märsta / SE | [2007/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LARBO, Göran Runbovägen 16 S-192 48 Sollentuna / SE | [2007/16] | Representative(s) | Karlsson, Leif Karl Gunnar, et al L.A. Groth & Co. KB Box 6107 102 32 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/27] | Karlsson, Leif Karl Gunnar, et al L.A. Groth & Co. KB Box 6107 102 32 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2007/16] | Karlsson, Leif Karl Gunnar, et al Groth & Co. KB Box 6107 102 32 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 05754928.9 | 22.06.2005 | [2007/16] | WO2005SE00987 | Priority number, date | SE20040001703 | 01.07.2004 Original published format: SE 0401703 | [2007/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006004494 | Date: | 12.01.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1774132 | Date: | 18.04.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.01.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1774132 | Date: | 09.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 12.01.2006 | Classification | IPC: | E21B10/60, E21B10/02 | [2007/16] | CPC: |
E21B10/02 (EP,US);
E21B10/605 (EP,SE,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/16] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BOHRMEISSEL | [2007/16] | English: | A DRILL BIT | [2007/16] | French: | TREPAN | [2007/16] | Entry into regional phase | 01.02.2007 | National basic fee paid | 01.02.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.02.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.02.2007 | Examination requested [2007/16] | 16.07.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.11.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 26.11.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.10.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.01.2008 | BE | 09.01.2008 | BG | 09.01.2008 | CY | 09.01.2008 | CZ | 09.01.2008 | DK | 09.01.2008 | EE | 09.01.2008 | IT | 09.01.2008 | LT | 09.01.2008 | NL | 09.01.2008 | PL | 09.01.2008 | RO | 09.01.2008 | SI | 09.01.2008 | SK | 09.01.2008 | TR | 09.01.2008 | SE | 09.04.2008 | GR | 10.04.2008 | IS | 09.05.2008 | PT | 09.06.2008 | LU | 22.06.2008 | IE | 23.06.2008 | MC | 30.06.2008 | HU | 10.07.2008 | [2011/01] |
Former [2010/39] | AT | 09.01.2008 | |
BE | 09.01.2008 | ||
CY | 09.01.2008 | ||
CZ | 09.01.2008 | ||
DK | 09.01.2008 | ||
EE | 09.01.2008 | ||
IT | 09.01.2008 | ||
LT | 09.01.2008 | ||
NL | 09.01.2008 | ||
PL | 09.01.2008 | ||
RO | 09.01.2008 | ||
SI | 09.01.2008 | ||
SK | 09.01.2008 | ||
TR | 09.01.2008 | ||
SE | 09.04.2008 | ||
IS | 09.05.2008 | ||
PT | 09.06.2008 | ||
LU | 22.06.2008 | ||
IE | 23.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
HU | 10.07.2008 | ||
Former [2010/33] | AT | 09.01.2008 | |
BE | 09.01.2008 | ||
CY | 09.01.2008 | ||
CZ | 09.01.2008 | ||
DK | 09.01.2008 | ||
EE | 09.01.2008 | ||
IT | 09.01.2008 | ||
LT | 09.01.2008 | ||
NL | 09.01.2008 | ||
PL | 09.01.2008 | ||
RO | 09.01.2008 | ||
SI | 09.01.2008 | ||
SK | 09.01.2008 | ||
SE | 09.04.2008 | ||
IS | 09.05.2008 | ||
PT | 09.06.2008 | ||
LU | 22.06.2008 | ||
IE | 23.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/52] | AT | 09.01.2008 | |
BE | 09.01.2008 | ||
CY | 09.01.2008 | ||
CZ | 09.01.2008 | ||
DK | 09.01.2008 | ||
EE | 09.01.2008 | ||
IT | 09.01.2008 | ||
LT | 09.01.2008 | ||
NL | 09.01.2008 | ||
PL | 09.01.2008 | ||
RO | 09.01.2008 | ||
SI | 09.01.2008 | ||
SK | 09.01.2008 | ||
SE | 09.04.2008 | ||
IS | 09.05.2008 | ||
PT | 09.06.2008 | ||
IE | 23.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/27] | AT | 09.01.2008 | |
BE | 09.01.2008 | ||
CZ | 09.01.2008 | ||
DK | 09.01.2008 | ||
EE | 09.01.2008 | ||
LT | 09.01.2008 | ||
NL | 09.01.2008 | ||
PL | 09.01.2008 | ||
RO | 09.01.2008 | ||
SI | 09.01.2008 | ||
SK | 09.01.2008 | ||
SE | 09.04.2008 | ||
IS | 09.05.2008 | ||
PT | 09.06.2008 | ||
IE | 23.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | AT | 09.01.2008 | |
BE | 09.01.2008 | ||
CZ | 09.01.2008 | ||
DK | 09.01.2008 | ||
EE | 09.01.2008 | ||
LT | 09.01.2008 | ||
NL | 09.01.2008 | ||
PL | 09.01.2008 | ||
RO | 09.01.2008 | ||
SI | 09.01.2008 | ||
SK | 09.01.2008 | ||
SE | 09.04.2008 | ||
IS | 09.05.2008 | ||
PT | 09.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/07] | AT | 09.01.2008 | |
BE | 09.01.2008 | ||
CZ | 09.01.2008 | ||
DK | 09.01.2008 | ||
LT | 09.01.2008 | ||
NL | 09.01.2008 | ||
PL | 09.01.2008 | ||
RO | 09.01.2008 | ||
SI | 09.01.2008 | ||
SK | 09.01.2008 | ||
SE | 09.04.2008 | ||
IS | 09.05.2008 | ||
PT | 09.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/50] | AT | 09.01.2008 | |
BE | 09.01.2008 | ||
CZ | 09.01.2008 | ||
DK | 09.01.2008 | ||
LT | 09.01.2008 | ||
NL | 09.01.2008 | ||
PL | 09.01.2008 | ||
RO | 09.01.2008 | ||
SI | 09.01.2008 | ||
SK | 09.01.2008 | ||
SE | 09.04.2008 | ||
IS | 09.05.2008 | ||
PT | 09.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | AT | 09.01.2008 | |
BE | 09.01.2008 | ||
DK | 09.01.2008 | ||
LT | 09.01.2008 | ||
NL | 09.01.2008 | ||
PL | 09.01.2008 | ||
SI | 09.01.2008 | ||
SE | 09.04.2008 | ||
IS | 09.05.2008 | ||
PT | 09.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/43] | AT | 09.01.2008 | |
BE | 09.01.2008 | ||
LT | 09.01.2008 | ||
NL | 09.01.2008 | ||
PL | 09.01.2008 | ||
SI | 09.01.2008 | ||
IS | 09.05.2008 | ||
PT | 09.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/42] | AT | 09.01.2008 | |
LT | 09.01.2008 | ||
NL | 09.01.2008 | ||
PL | 09.01.2008 | ||
SI | 09.01.2008 | ||
IS | 09.05.2008 | ||
PT | 09.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | AT | 09.01.2008 | |
LT | 09.01.2008 | ||
NL | 09.01.2008 | ||
SI | 09.01.2008 | ||
IS | 09.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/36] | LT | 09.01.2008 | |
NL | 09.01.2008 | ||
SI | 09.01.2008 | ||
IS | 09.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/27] | NL | 09.01.2008 | |
SI | 09.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/26] | SI | 09.01.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2996061 (MILLER HAROLD C); | [A]US4189015 (ACKER III III [US], et al); | [A]SU1086112 (SP K B V PROMY OBEDINENIYA SOY [SU], et al) |