EP1765672 - DISPENSING SMALL QUANTITIES OF POWDER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.10.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.10.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.12.2009 [2009/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pfizer Limited Ramsgate Road Sandwich, Kent CT13 9N5 / GB | [2007/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MACMICHAEL, Bruce Cambridge Research Centre Pfizer Ltd. Compass House Vision Park Chivers Way Histon Cambridge CB4 7ZR / GB | 02 /
OPIE, Will Guilleaume Werk GmbH Gartenstrasse 7-17 53229 Bonn / DE | 03 /
POLEY, John Cambridge Research Center Pfizer Ltd Regus H.e 1010 Cambourne Business Park Cambourne Cambridge CB3 6DP / GB | [2007/13] | Representative(s) | Hadjadj, Laurent, et al ATTENTION: ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/21] | Hadjadj, Laurent, et al Pfizer Limited European Patent Department Ramsgate Road Sandwich, Kent CT13 9NJ / GB | ||
Former [2009/20] | Hadjadj, Laurent, et al Pfizer Limited European Patent Department Ramsgate Road Sandwich, Kent CT13 9NJ / FR | ||
Former [2007/13] | Hadjadj, Laurent Pfizer European Patent Department 23-25, Avenue du Docteur Lannelongue 75668 Paris Cedex 14 / FR | Application number, filing date | 05755418.0 | 28.06.2005 | [2007/13] | WO2005GB02521 | Priority number, date | GB20040014813 | 01.07.2004 Original published format: GB 0414813 | [2007/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006003377 | Date: | 12.01.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1765672 | Date: | 28.03.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.01.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.01.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B65B1/08, B65B1/22, B65B1/24, A61J3/07, G01G13/06, B65B1/32 | [2007/13] | CPC: |
B65B1/08 (EP,US);
A61J3/02 (KR);
A61J3/00 (KR);
A61J3/07 (KR);
B65B1/22 (EP,US);
B65B1/24 (EP,US);
B65B1/32 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/13] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ABGABE GERINGER PULVERMENGEN | [2007/13] | English: | DISPENSING SMALL QUANTITIES OF POWDER | [2007/13] | French: | DISTRIBUTION DE PETITES QUANTITÉS DE POUDRE | [2007/13] | Entry into regional phase | 01.02.2007 | National basic fee paid | 01.02.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.02.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.01.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 11.01.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.02.2007 | Examination requested [2007/13] | 08.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.06.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/49] | 14.07.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2009 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DY]WO0133176 (POWDERJECT RES LTD [GB], et al) [DY] 1-4,9,12,13,24-27,31,34 * the whole document *; | [Y]GB460073 (HAROLD ALFRED WILSON) [Y] 1-4,24-27 * figure 2; claim 1 *; | [Y]WO9705018 (GLAXO GROUP LTD [GB], et al) [Y] 9,31 * figure 1; claim 11 *; | [Y]US2004003866 (ROCCHIO MICHEAL J [US], et al) [Y] 12,13,34 * abstract *; | [A]WO2004004627 (IMA SPA [IT], et al) [A] 14-16,35,36 * abstract *; | [PX]WO2005014397 (MERIDICA LTD [GB], et al) [PX] 1-5,9,24-28,31 * the whole document * | by applicant | WO0133176 |