EP2113072 - DISTRIBUTED MODE SYSTEM FOR REAL TME ACOUSTIC EMISSION MONITORING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.09.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.09.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.11.2017 [2017/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Texas Research International, Inc. 9063 Bee Caves Road Austin, TX 78733-6201 / US | [2009/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AUSTIN, Russell K. 6807 Bayridge Terrace Austin, TX 78759 / US | 02 /
COUGHLIN, Chris 3014 West William Cannon Drive 627 Austin, TX 78745 / US | [2009/45] | Representative(s) | CSY London Helios Court 1 Bishop Square Hatfield Hertfordshire AL10 9NE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/44] | Faulkner, Thomas John, et al Cleveland 40-43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JQ / GB | ||
Former [2009/48] | Hector, Annabel Mary Cleveland 40-43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JQ / GB | ||
Former [2009/45] | Hector, Annabel Mary fJ Cleveland 40-43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 05755502.1 | 01.06.2005 | [2009/45] | WO2005US19243 | Priority number, date | US20040862096 | 04.06.2004 Original published format: US 862096 | [2009/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005121722 | Date: | 22.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2113072 | Date: | 04.11.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.12.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 22.12.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.03.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G01H1/00, G01N29/14, G01N29/24 | [2014/14] | CPC: |
G01H1/00 (EP,US);
G01H1/16 (EP,US);
G01N29/14 (EP,US);
G01N29/2475 (EP,US);
G01N29/2481 (EP,US);
G01N2291/0289 (EP,US);
G01N2291/2694 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2009/45] | G01H1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/45] | Title | German: | VERTEILTES MODUSSYSTEM ZUR ECHTZEIT-ÜEBRWACHUNG AKUSTISCHER EMISSIONEN | [2009/45] | English: | DISTRIBUTED MODE SYSTEM FOR REAL TME ACOUSTIC EMISSION MONITORING | [2009/45] | French: | SYSTEME EN MODE DISTRIBUE POUR UNE SURVEILLANCE D'EMISSION ACOUSTIQUE EN TEMPS REEL | [2009/45] | Entry into regional phase | 23.11.2006 | National basic fee paid | 23.11.2006 | Search fee paid | 23.11.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.11.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.11.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.11.2006 | Examination requested [2009/45] | 04.12.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.06.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.11.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.05.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/44] | 16.06.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/44] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.12.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 26.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 29.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2017 | 13   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5293555 (ANTHONY MICHAEL [US]) [Y] 1-25 * column 1, lines 5-14 * * column 2, line 9 - column 3, line 50 * * figures 1-6 *; | [Y] - LESZEK GOLASKI ET AL, "DIAGNOSTICS OF REINFORCED CONCRETE BRIDGES BY ACOUSTIC EMISSION", JOURNAL OF ACOUSTIC EMISSION, (20021231), vol. 20, ISSN 0730-0050, pages 83 - 98, XP055103564 [Y] 1-25 * abstract * * page 85, paragraph 4 - page 87, paragraph 2 * * figures 1-3,11 * | [Y] - ANINDYA GHOSHAL ET AL, "Concepts and Development of Bio-Inspired Distributed Embedded Wired/Wireless Sensor Array Architectures for Acoustic Wave Sensing in Integrated Aerospace Vehicles", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 4TH 2003 INTERNATIONAL WORKSHOP ON STRUCTURAL HEALTH MONITORING, (20030917), pages 1 - 9, XP055103601 [Y] 4,5,20,21 * abstract * * page 4, paragraph 2 * | [Y] - MUNNS T E ET AL, "Structural health monitoring: degradation mechanisms and system requirements", DIGITAL AVIONICS SYSTEMS CONFERENCES, 2000. PROCEEDINGS. DASC. THE 19T H 7-13 OCTOBER 2000, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20001007), vol. 2, ISBN 978-0-7803-6395-3, pages 1 - 8, XP010522766 [Y] 6,7,22-25 * page 1, column left, paragraph 1 * * page 6, column right, paragraphs 2,3 * | International search | [X]US6399939 (SUNDARESAN MANNUR J [US], et al); | [X]US6192759 (SCHOESS JEFFREY N [US]); | [X]US5675506 (SAVIC MICHAEL [US]); | [Y]US6531965 (KAISER STEPHEN G [US], et al); | [Y]US2003003872 (BRINKLEY ROGER R [US], et al); | [Y]US5129063 (SAINOLA JOHN P [US], et al); | [Y]US5544308 (GIORDANO GERARD J [US], et al); | [A]US4956999 (BOHANNAN WILLIAM L [US], et al); | [A]US5195046 (GERARDI JOSEPH J [US], et al); | [A]US5293555 (ANTHONY MICHAEL [US]); | [A]US4459851 (CROSTACK HORST A [DE]); | [A]US5383133 (STAPLE ALAN E [GB]) | Examination | - Timothy J. Fowler ET AL, "Crack detection in naval crane shafts using acoustic emission", (19980531), pages 1 - 100, Master thesis at the University of Texas at Austin, USA, URL: https://fsel.engr.utexas.edu/publications/detail.cfm?pubid=420103901, (20141128), XP055155722 | by applicant | US6076405 | US6014896 | - TIMOTHY J FOWLER ET AL., "Crack detection in naval crane shafts using acoustic emission", MASTER THESIS AT THE UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS, (19980531), pages 1 - 100 |