EP1807013 - COMPOSITE MATERIAL BRAIDED INSULATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.11.2015 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.05.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 22.06.2016 [2016/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Boston Scientific Limited Clarendon House 2 Church Street Hamilton HM11 / BM | [2014/52] |
Former [2007/29] | For all designated states Boston Scientific Limited P.O. Box 1317 Seaston House Hastings Christ Church Barbados, West Indies / BB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOUNG, Kimbolt 330 Newtonville Avenue Newtonville, MA 02460 / US | 02 /
HUBBS, Gerald M. 4302 Saratoga Hill Louisville, KY 40299 / US | [2007/38] |
Former [2007/29] | 01 /
YOUNG, Kimbolt 330 Newtonville Avenue Newtonville, MA 02460 / US | ||
02 /
HUBBS, Gerald M. 4094 West Ardsley Lane Bloomington, IN 47404 / US | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/27] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/29] | Bergmann, Jürgen Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Joachimstaler Strasse 10-12 10719 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 05756560.8 | 26.05.2005 | [2007/29] | WO2005US18470 | Priority number, date | US20040929298 | 30.08.2004 Original published format: US 929298 | [2007/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006025894 | Date: | 09.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1807013 | Date: | 18.07.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.03.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1807013 | Date: | 24.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.03.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61B18/14 | [2007/29] | CPC: |
A61B18/1477 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00083 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00107 (EP,US);
A61B2018/126 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IE, NL [2007/49] |
Former [2007/29] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | GEFLOCHTENER ISOLATOR AUS VERBUNDMATERIAL | [2007/29] | English: | COMPOSITE MATERIAL BRAIDED INSULATOR | [2007/29] | French: | MATERIAU COMPOSITE TRESSE A PROPRIETES D'ISOLATION | [2007/29] | Entry into regional phase | 17.01.2007 | National basic fee paid | 17.01.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.01.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.01.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.01.2007 | Examination requested [2007/29] | 29.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.05.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.09.2014 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 29.09.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 29.09.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.10.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.11.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.01.2009 | Opposition(s) | 25.09.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 26.05.2015 | IE | 26.05.2015 | FR | 01.06.2015 | NL | 01.06.2015 | [2016/25] |
Former [2016/23] | GB | 26.05.2015 | |
IE | 26.05.2015 | ||
NL | 01.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | IE | 26.05.2015 | |
NL | 01.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | IE | 26.05.2015 | Cited in | International search | [XY]US6017338 (BRUCKER GREGORY G [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5,7,8,10-12 * abstract * * column 2, line 56 - column 3, line 35 * * column 4, line 9 - column 9, line 29 * [Y] 4,6,9,13,14; | [Y]US6723094 (DESINGER KAI [DE]) [Y] 4,6 * the whole document *; | [Y]US6602242 (FUNG MICHELE M [US], et al) [Y] 9 * abstract * * column 4, line 22 - line 34 * * column 10, lines 1-4 *; | [Y]US6572613 (ELLMAN ALAN G [US], et al) [Y] 13,14 * abstract * * column 5, line 1 - line 2 * * column 5, lines 27-29 *; | [A]US5531677 (LUNDQUIST INGEMAR H [US], et al) [A] 6 * the whole document * |