EP1749368 - ARRANGEMENT FOR CREATING SERVICE-ORIENTED BILLING DATA IN A COMMUNICATIONS NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.08.2008 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 29.09.2010 [2010/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Siemens Networks GmbH & Co. KG St.-Martin-Strasse 76 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/50] | For all designated states NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS GMBH & CO. KG St. Martin Strasse 76 81541 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/46] | For all designated states NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS S.P.A. St. Martin Strasse 76 81541 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/37] | For all designated states NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS GMBH & CO. KG St. Martin Strasse 76 81541 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/06] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FÖLL, Uwe Kieler Strasse 2 14812 Falkensee / DE | [2007/06] | Application number, filing date | 05756806.5 | 19.05.2005 | [2007/06] | WO2005DE00962 | Priority number, date | DE20041026140 | 26.05.2004 Original published format: DE102004026140 | [2007/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005117341 | Date: | 08.12.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1749368 | Date: | 07.02.2007 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.12.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1749368 | Date: | 26.09.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/14 | [2007/06] | CPC: |
H04L12/1417 (EP,US);
H04L12/14 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/06] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANORDNUNG ZUM ERSTELLEN VON DIENSTORIENTIERTEN GEBÜHRENDATEN IN EINEM KOMMUNIKATIONSNETZ | [2007/06] | English: | ARRANGEMENT FOR CREATING SERVICE-ORIENTED BILLING DATA IN A COMMUNICATIONS NETWORK | [2007/06] | French: | DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT DE CREER DES DONNEES DE TAXATION ORIENTEES SERVICE DANS UN RESEAU DE COMMUNICATION | [2007/06] | Entry into regional phase | 12.01.2006 | National basic fee paid | 12.01.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.01.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.01.2006 | Examination requested [2007/06] | 28.03.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.08.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 07.08.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.06.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 26.09.2007 | CZ | 26.09.2007 | DK | 26.09.2007 | EE | 26.09.2007 | FI | 26.09.2007 | IE | 26.09.2007 | LT | 26.09.2007 | NL | 26.09.2007 | RO | 26.09.2007 | SI | 26.09.2007 | SK | 26.09.2007 | BG | 26.12.2007 | SE | 26.12.2007 | GR | 27.12.2007 | IS | 26.01.2008 | PT | 26.02.2008 | HU | 27.03.2008 | AT | 19.05.2008 | LU | 19.05.2008 | BE | 31.05.2008 | MC | 31.05.2008 | [2010/39] |
Former [2010/33] | CY | 26.09.2007 | |
CZ | 26.09.2007 | ||
DK | 26.09.2007 | ||
EE | 26.09.2007 | ||
FI | 26.09.2007 | ||
IE | 26.09.2007 | ||
LT | 26.09.2007 | ||
NL | 26.09.2007 | ||
RO | 26.09.2007 | ||
SI | 26.09.2007 | ||
SK | 26.09.2007 | ||
BG | 26.12.2007 | ||
SE | 26.12.2007 | ||
GR | 27.12.2007 | ||
IS | 26.01.2008 | ||
PT | 26.02.2008 | ||
AT | 19.05.2008 | ||
LU | 19.05.2008 | ||
BE | 31.05.2008 | ||
MC | 31.05.2008 | ||
Former [2009/52] | CY | 26.09.2007 | |
CZ | 26.09.2007 | ||
DK | 26.09.2007 | ||
EE | 26.09.2007 | ||
FI | 26.09.2007 | ||
IE | 26.09.2007 | ||
LT | 26.09.2007 | ||
NL | 26.09.2007 | ||
RO | 26.09.2007 | ||
SI | 26.09.2007 | ||
SK | 26.09.2007 | ||
BG | 26.12.2007 | ||
SE | 26.12.2007 | ||
GR | 27.12.2007 | ||
IS | 26.01.2008 | ||
PT | 26.02.2008 | ||
AT | 19.05.2008 | ||
BE | 31.05.2008 | ||
MC | 31.05.2008 | ||
Former [2009/29] | CZ | 26.09.2007 | |
DK | 26.09.2007 | ||
EE | 26.09.2007 | ||
FI | 26.09.2007 | ||
IE | 26.09.2007 | ||
LT | 26.09.2007 | ||
NL | 26.09.2007 | ||
RO | 26.09.2007 | ||
SI | 26.09.2007 | ||
SK | 26.09.2007 | ||
SE | 26.12.2007 | ||
GR | 27.12.2007 | ||
IS | 26.01.2008 | ||
PT | 26.02.2008 | ||
BE | 31.05.2008 | ||
MC | 31.05.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | CZ | 26.09.2007 | |
DK | 26.09.2007 | ||
EE | 26.09.2007 | ||
FI | 26.09.2007 | ||
IE | 26.09.2007 | ||
LT | 26.09.2007 | ||
NL | 26.09.2007 | ||
RO | 26.09.2007 | ||
SK | 26.09.2007 | ||
SE | 26.12.2007 | ||
GR | 27.12.2007 | ||
IS | 26.01.2008 | ||
PT | 26.02.2008 | ||
BE | 31.05.2008 | ||
MC | 31.05.2008 | ||
Former [2009/19] | CZ | 26.09.2007 | |
DK | 26.09.2007 | ||
FI | 26.09.2007 | ||
IE | 26.09.2007 | ||
LT | 26.09.2007 | ||
NL | 26.09.2007 | ||
RO | 26.09.2007 | ||
SK | 26.09.2007 | ||
SE | 26.12.2007 | ||
GR | 27.12.2007 | ||
IS | 26.01.2008 | ||
PT | 26.02.2008 | ||
BE | 31.05.2008 | ||
MC | 31.05.2008 | ||
Former [2009/04] | CZ | 26.09.2007 | |
DK | 26.09.2007 | ||
FI | 26.09.2007 | ||
IE | 26.09.2007 | ||
LT | 26.09.2007 | ||
NL | 26.09.2007 | ||
RO | 26.09.2007 | ||
SK | 26.09.2007 | ||
SE | 26.12.2007 | ||
GR | 27.12.2007 | ||
IS | 26.01.2008 | ||
PT | 26.02.2008 | ||
MC | 31.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/45] | CZ | 26.09.2007 | |
DK | 26.09.2007 | ||
FI | 26.09.2007 | ||
IE | 26.09.2007 | ||
LT | 26.09.2007 | ||
NL | 26.09.2007 | ||
RO | 26.09.2007 | ||
SK | 26.09.2007 | ||
SE | 26.12.2007 | ||
GR | 27.12.2007 | ||
IS | 26.01.2008 | ||
PT | 26.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/35] | CZ | 26.09.2007 | |
DK | 26.09.2007 | ||
FI | 26.09.2007 | ||
LT | 26.09.2007 | ||
NL | 26.09.2007 | ||
RO | 26.09.2007 | ||
SK | 26.09.2007 | ||
SE | 26.12.2007 | ||
GR | 27.12.2007 | ||
IS | 26.01.2008 | ||
PT | 26.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/28] | CZ | 26.09.2007 | |
FI | 26.09.2007 | ||
LT | 26.09.2007 | ||
NL | 26.09.2007 | ||
RO | 26.09.2007 | ||
SK | 26.09.2007 | ||
SE | 26.12.2007 | ||
GR | 27.12.2007 | ||
IS | 26.01.2008 | ||
PT | 26.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/25] | CZ | 26.09.2007 | |
FI | 26.09.2007 | ||
LT | 26.09.2007 | ||
NL | 26.09.2007 | ||
SK | 26.09.2007 | ||
GR | 27.12.2007 | ||
IS | 26.01.2008 | ||
PT | 26.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/22] | FI | 26.09.2007 | |
LT | 26.09.2007 | ||
GR | 27.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/12] | FI | 26.09.2007 | |
LT | 26.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/07] | LT | 26.09.2007 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2004036890 (NOKIA CORP [FI], et al) [A] 1-9 * page 16, line 7 - page 18, line 26; figure 3 *; | [A]WO2004036825 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al) [A] 1-9 * page 8, line 19 - page 9, line 29; figure 2 *; | [PX] - ANONYMOUS, "AP 6.2 Service oriented and Convergent Charging - Analysis Paper", 3GET: 3G EVOLVING TECHNOLOGIES, (200406), URL: http://www.mobile-accounting.org/documents/index.php, (20051024), XP002350904 [PX] 1-9 * the whole document * | [A] - VAN LE M ET AL, "A service component-based accounting and charging architecture to support interim mechanisms across multiple domains", NETWORK OPERATIONS AND MANAGEMENT SYMPOSIUM, 2004. NOMS 2004. IEEE/IFIP SEOUL, KOREA APRIL 19-23, 2004, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20040419), vol. 1, ISBN 0-7803-8230-7, pages 555 - 568, XP010712703 [A] 1-9 * Sections 5, 6 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/NOMS.2004.1317742 | [A] - CHEN C-Y ET AL, "Billing service based on TINA concepts for the next generation network", INTELLIGENT NETWORK WORKSHOP, 2001 IEEE 6-9 MAY 2001, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20010506), ISBN 0-7803-7047-3, pages 320 - 324, XP010538428 [A] 1-9 * Section III * | [A] - ARTIGES D ET AL, "TMN based accounting management architecture", IEE, (19961112), pages 11 - 1, XP006509511 [A] 1-9 * the whole document * | [A] - ZSEBY S ZANDER G CARLE FRAUNHOFER FOKUS T, "Policy-based Accounting", IETF STANDARD-WORKING-DRAFT, INTERNET ENGINEERING TASK FORCE, IETF, CH, (200208), no. 5, ISSN 0000-0004, XP015030177 [A] * page 11 - page 17 * |