EP1768859 - VEHICLE WHEEL RIM FOR MOUNTING A TYRE AND A SUPPORT ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 30.10.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.10.2009 | Withdrawal of application | published on 02.12.2009 [2009/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Société de Technologie Michelin 23, rue Breschet 63000 Clermont-Ferrand / FR | For all designated states Michelin Recherche et Technique S.A. Route Louis Braille 10 et 12 1763 Granges-Paccot / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2008/08] | For all designated states Société de Technologie Michelin 23, rue Breschet 63000 Clermont-Ferrand / FR | ||
For all designated states MICHELIN Recherche et Technique S.A. Route Louis Braille 10 et 12 1763 Granges-Paccot / CH | |||
Former [2007/14] | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DE
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HU
LI
Société de Technologie Michelin 23, rue Breschet 63000 Clermont-Ferrand / FR | ||
For all designated states MICHELIN Recherche et Technique S.A. Route Louis Braille 10 et 12 1763 Granges-Paccot / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CALVET, Marc 16, rue Cotepet F-63000 Clermont-Ferrand / FR | 02 /
CAGNEAUX, Guy 63160 Egliseneuve-près-Billom / FR | 03 /
JANIN, Nicolas 28, rue du Colombier Lanore F-63200 Riom / FR | 04 /
MALEVERGNE, Michel 4, rue des Côtes F-63118 Cébazat / FR | [2007/14] | Representative(s) | Dequire, Philippe Jean-Marie Denis Manufacture Française des Pneumatiques Michelin CBS/CORP/J/PI - F35 - Ladoux 23, place des Carmes-Déchaux 63040 Clermont-Ferrand Cedex 9 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/14] | Dequire, Philippe Jean-Marie Denis M.F.P. Michelin, SGD/LG/PI-F35-Ladoux, 23, place des Carmes Déchaux 63040 Clermont-Ferrand Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 05756839.6 | 27.06.2005 | [2007/14] | WO2005EP52990 | Priority number, date | FR20040007580 | 08.07.2004 Original published format: FR 0407580 | FR20050001579 | 16.02.2005 Original published format: FR 0501579 | [2007/14] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006010681 | Date: | 02.02.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1768859 | Date: | 04.04.2007 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.02.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.02.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B60B21/10, B60B21/02, B60B21/04 | [2007/14] | CPC: |
B60B21/12 (EP,US);
B60B21/023 (EP,US);
B60B21/026 (EP,US);
B60B21/028 (EP,US);
B60B21/04 (EP,US);
B60B21/102 (EP,US);
B60B21/104 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/14] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FAHRZEUGRADFELGE ZUR MONTAGE EINES REIFENS UND STÜTZELEMENT | [2007/14] | English: | VEHICLE WHEEL RIM FOR MOUNTING A TYRE AND A SUPPORT ELEMENT | [2007/14] | French: | JANTE DE VÉHICULE DESTINÉE AU MONTAGE D'UN PNEUMATIQUE ET D'UN APPUI DE SOUTIEN | [2007/14] | Entry into regional phase | 08.02.2007 | National basic fee paid | 08.02.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.02.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.02.2007 | Examination requested [2007/14] | 23.10.2009 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9515862 (MICHELIN & CIE [FR], et al) [A] 1 * page 1, paragraph 2 * * page 9, paragraph 1 * * figure 1; claim 9 *; | [A]EP0807539 (MICHELIN & CIE [FR]) [A] 1 * column 5, line 1 - line 19; figure 1 *; | [AD]WO0108905 (MICHELIN SOC TECH [FR], et al) [AD] 1 * abstract *; | [A]EP1097823 (MICHELIN SOC TECH [FR], et al) [A] 1* abstract *; | [A]EP1325819 (GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER [US]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0010]; figure 1 * | by applicant | WO0108905 |