EP1737726 - ATTACHMENT DEVICE RELEASABLE UNDER A LOAD FOR A TRAPEZE HARNESS USED IN SAILING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.10.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.10.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.11.2010 [2010/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WICHARD Z.I. de Felet 63300 Thiers / FR | For all designated states Ecole Nationale de Voile Sis Le Beg Rohu 56510 Saint Pierre Quiberon / FR | [2007/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GARIN, Arnaud 6, rue du Maréchal Foch F-44240 La Chapelle Sur Erdre / FR | 02 /
LEBRUN, Florence 63, rue de Port Haliguen F-56170 Quiberon / FR | 03 /
DELHAYE, Philippe 6, rue Poulpereau F-56510 Saint Pierre Quiberon / FR | [2007/01] | Representative(s) | Maureau, Philippe, et al Cabinet GERMAIN & MAUREAU 12, rue Boileau B.P. 6153 69466 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/31] | Maureau, Philippe, et al Cabinet GERMAIN & MAUREAU 12 Rue Boileau B.P. 6153 69466 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | ||
Former [2007/01] | Maureau, Philippe, et al Cabinet GERMAIN & MAUREAU, BP 6153 69466 Lyon cedex 06 / FR | Application number, filing date | 05757059.0 | 12.04.2005 | [2007/01] | WO2005FR00883 | Priority number, date | FR20040004345 | 23.04.2004 Original published format: FR 0404345 | [2007/01] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005110841 | Date: | 24.11.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1737726 | Date: | 03.01.2007 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.11.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.11.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B63H9/10, B63B35/79 | [2007/01] | CPC: |
B63H9/1007 (EP,US);
B63H8/58 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/01] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | UNTER BELASTUNG LÖSBARE BEFESTIGUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR BEIM SEGELN VERWENDETE TRAPEZGURTE | [2007/01] | English: | ATTACHMENT DEVICE RELEASABLE UNDER A LOAD FOR A TRAPEZE HARNESS USED IN SAILING | [2007/01] | French: | DISPOSITIF D' ACCROCHAGE DEVERROUILLABLE SOUS CHARGE POUR CEINTURE TRAPEZE POUR LA PRATIQUE DE LA VOILE | [2007/01] | Entry into regional phase | 18.10.2006 | National basic fee paid | 18.10.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.10.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.10.2006 | Examination requested [2007/01] | 15.01.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.05.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/47] | 01.07.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2010/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE3316583 (ECKERT EUGEN) [X] 1-5 * page 6, paragraph L - page 8, paragraph L; figures 1-7 *; | [X]US6640397 (GIPSON DALE [US]) [X] 1-5* the whole document * |