EP1796086 - DISK DRIVING DEVICE AND METHOD, RECORDING MEDIUM, AND PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.08.2009 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.09.2009 [2009/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/24] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OKAMATSU, Kazuhiko c/o SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo 1410001 / JP | [2007/24] | Representative(s) | Nicholls, Michael John J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/24] | Nicholls, Michael John J.A. KEMP & CO. 14, South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 05757794.2 | 06.07.2005 | [2007/24] | WO2005JP12471 | Priority number, date | JP20040274698 | 22.09.2004 Original published format: JP 2004274698 | [2007/24] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006033195 | Date: | 30.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1796086 | Date: | 13.06.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.03.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 30.03.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.08.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G11B7/09 | [2007/24] | CPC: |
G11B7/0945 (EP,US);
G11B7/09 (KR);
G11B2007/0006 (EP,US);
G11B7/0901 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2007/52] |
Former [2007/24] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PLATTENANTRIEBSEINRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN, AUFZEICHNUNGSMEDIUM UND PROGRAMM | [2007/24] | English: | DISK DRIVING DEVICE AND METHOD, RECORDING MEDIUM, AND PROGRAM | [2007/24] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE D'ENTRAINEMENT DE DISQUE, SUPPORT D'ENREGISTREMENT ET PROGRAMME | [2007/24] | Entry into regional phase | 27.02.2006 | Translation filed | 27.02.2006 | National basic fee paid | 27.02.2006 | Search fee paid | 27.02.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.02.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.02.2006 | Examination requested [2007/24] | 06.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.03.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/37] | 22.04.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2002105865 (KUSUMOTO KUNIMASA [JP], et al) [Y] 1-6 * paragraph [0098] - paragraph [0117]; figures 5-9 *; | [Y]US2002105896 (KUSUMOTO KUNIMASA [JP], et al) [Y] 1-6 * paragraph [0075] - paragraph [0086]; figures 5,6 *; | [A]JP2003317274 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1-6* the whole document * | International search | [A]JPH1166579 (SONY CORP); | [A]JPH10289452 (SONY CORP) |