Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8085298 | Global Dossier | 27.12.2011 | B2 | US2008186379 | 07.08.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2004205157 | 12.07.2004 | WO2005JP12466 | 06.07.2005 | JP2005189008 | 28.06.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1768412 | Global Dossier | 28.02.2018 | B1 | EP1768412 | 12.10.2011 | A4 | EP1768412 | 28.03.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2004205157 | 12.07.2004 | WO2005JP12466 | 06.07.2005 | JP2005189008 | 28.06.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN100579210C | 06.01.2010 | C | CN1985519 | 20.06.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2004205157 | 12.07.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2006006465 | Global Dossier | 19.01.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2004205157 | 12.07.2004 | JP2005189008 | 28.06.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4583258B | Global Dossier | 17.11.2010 | B2 | JP2006054854 | 23.02.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2004205157 | 12.07.2004 | JP2005189008 | 28.06.2005 |