EP1772041 - MULTI-PULSE IGNITION CIRCUIT FOR A GAS DISCHARGE LAMP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.06.2013 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.06.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.07.2013 [2013/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2007/15] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SLEGERS, Frans c/o Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
HOOIJER, Christofher, D., C. c/o Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
OOSTERBAAN, Thijs c/o Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 04 /
TOONEN, Johannis, A., A. c/o Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [2007/15] | Representative(s) | Damen, Daniel Martijn, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2012/41] | Damen, Daniel Martijn, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2007/15] | Bosma, Rudolphus Hubertus Antonius Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 05758362.7 | 14.07.2005 | [2007/15] | WO2005IB52347 | Priority number, date | EP20040103475 | 21.07.2004 Original published format: EP 04103475 | [2007/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006011097 | Date: | 02.02.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1772041 | Date: | 11.04.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.02.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.02.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H05B41/282, H05B41/28 | [2007/15] | CPC: |
H05B41/2806 (EP,US);
H05B41/2821 (EP,US);
H05B41/2881 (EP,US);
Y02B20/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/15] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MEHRIMPULS-ZÜNDSCHALTUNG FÜR EINE GASENTLADUNGSLAMPE | [2007/15] | English: | MULTI-PULSE IGNITION CIRCUIT FOR A GAS DISCHARGE LAMP | [2007/15] | French: | CIRCUIT D'ALLUMAGE MULTI-IMPULSIONS POUR LAMPE A DECHARGE GAZEUSE | [2007/15] | Entry into regional phase | 21.02.2007 | National basic fee paid | 21.02.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.02.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.02.2007 | Examination requested [2007/15] | 26.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/31] | 12.03.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/31] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.11.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2012 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US6323600 (STATNIC EUGEN [DE], et al) [X] 1-8 * abstract * * column 1, lines 5-31 * * column 2, line 13 - column 3, line 59 * * column 4, lines 35-43 * * column 5, lines 24-41 * * column 6, line 64 - column 7, line 16 * * figures 1-5 *; | [X]US5561349 (HARTAI JULIUS [NO]) [X] 1-8 * abstract * * column 1, lines 5-59 * * column 2, line 4 - column 3, line 50 * * column 4, line 21 - column 5, line 42 * * column 6, lines 17-21 * * figures 2,3,6 * |