Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8058790 | Global Dossier | 15.11.2011 | B2 | US2007176147 | 02.08.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2005EP05021 | 10.05.2005 | DE102004023277 | 11.05.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101206316B | Global Dossier | 29.11.2012 | B1 | KR20070010055 | 19.01.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2005EP05021 | 10.05.2005 | DE102004023277 | 11.05.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4988558B | Global Dossier | 01.08.2012 | B2 | JP2007538116 | 27.12.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2005EP05021 | 10.05.2005 | DE102004023277 | 11.05.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1745113 | Global Dossier | 26.10.2016 | B1 | EP1745113 | 24.01.2007 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2005EP05021 | 10.05.2005 | DE102004023277 | 11.05.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1950480B | 28.09.2011 | B | CN1950480 | 18.04.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2005EP05021 | 10.05.2005 | DE102004023277 | 11.05.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2005111172 | Global Dossier | 05.01.2006 | A3 | WO2005111172 | 24.11.2005 | A2 | Priority number | Date | DE102004023277 | 11.05.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102004023277 | 01.12.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102004023277 | 11.05.2004 |