Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2008264881 | Global Dossier | 30.10.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB0418746 | 21.08.2004 | WO2005GB02721 | 11.07.2005 | GB0425723 | 23.11.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1793900 | Global Dossier | 13.06.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB0418746 | 21.08.2004 | WO2005GB02721 | 11.07.2005 | GB0425723 | 23.11.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101048207 | 03.10.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | GB0418746 | 21.08.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB0418746D0 | 22.09.2004 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB0418746 | 21.08.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB2412071 | 01.03.2006 | B | GB2412071 | 21.09.2005 | A | GB0425723D0 | 22.12.2004 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB0418746 | 21.08.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2006021738 | Global Dossier | 02.03.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB0418746 | 21.08.2004 | GB0425723 | 23.11.2004 |