|
05.09.2018 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.06.2018 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.11.2017 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.10.2017 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.09.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.09.2017 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.09.2017 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
13.09.2017 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.09.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.05.2017 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.05.2017 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
03.05.2017 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.05.2017 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
143 |
|
03.05.2017 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
143 |
|
14.07.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.07.2015 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.07.2015 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.07.2015 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
05.03.2015 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.03.2015 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.11.2013 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.09.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
23.09.2013 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.09.2013 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.07.2013 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.07.2013 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.07.2013 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.04.2013 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
391 |
|
24.04.2013 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.04.2013 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
56 |
|
24.04.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.04.2013 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.04.2013 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.03.2013 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.03.2013 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.01.2013 |
Maintenance of the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.12.2012 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.12.2012 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.12.2012 |
Supplementary European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.10.2012 |
Enquiry as to when the search report can be expected |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.10.2012 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.10.2012 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.10.2012 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.10.2012 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.03.2009 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.02.2009 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.06.2007 |
Final instructions (loss of partial rights) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.02.2007 |
Designation deemed to be withdrawn (loss of partial rights) |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
28.02.2007 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.02.2007 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.01.2007 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.01.2007 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.01.2007 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
22.01.2007 |
Fax request to enter the European phase |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
15.01.2007 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
06.11.2006 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.01.2006 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
53 |
|
18.01.2006 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
30 |
|
18.01.2006 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
48 |
|
18.01.2006 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
165 |
|
18.01.2006 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
89 |
|
18.01.2006 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
47 |
|
29.12.2005 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.12.2005 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
148 |