03.05.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.06.2019 [2019/23] |
19.04.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.05.2019 [2019/21] |
07.09.2018 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 10.10.2018 [2018/41] |
29.06.2018 |
Change - applicant |
published on 01.08.2018 [2018/31] |
29.09.2017 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 01.11.2017 [2017/44] |
29.09.2017 |
Change - designated states |
published on 01.11.2017 [2017/44] |
22.09.2017 |
Change - designated states |
published on 25.10.2017 [2017/43] |
19.09.2017 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
15.09.2017 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
15.09.2017 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
08.09.2017 |
Change - divisional application(s) |
published on 11.10.2017 [2017/41] |
22.06.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.05.2017 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
28.04.2017 |
Change - inventor |
|
14.06.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.07.2015 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
12.06.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.03.2015 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
03.04.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
27.09.2013 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
15.07.2013 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
12.07.2013 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
12.07.2013 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee |
|
12.07.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.06.2013 |
Change - applicant |
published on 31.07.2013 [2013/31] |
11.03.2013 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
08.03.2013 |
First examination report |
|
30.11.2012 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 02.01.2013 [2013/01] |
30.11.2012 |
Change - classification |
published on 02.01.2013 [2013/01] |
30.11.2012 |
Change - classification |
published on 02.01.2013 [2013/01] |
19.10.2012 |
Change - representative |
published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] |
08.04.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.06.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.06.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.06.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.03.2009 |
Change - representative |
published on 08.04.2009 [2009/15] |
25.07.2008 |
Change - representative |
published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] |
06.06.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.08.2007 |
Change - extension states |
published on 26.09.2007 [2007/39] |
21.06.2007 |
New entry: Loss of particular rights: legal effect |
|
15.06.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.02.2007 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 28.03.2007 [2007/13] |
23.02.2007 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 28.03.2007 [2007/13] |
22.02.2007 |
New entry: Loss of particular rights: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
20.02.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
30.01.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.01.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
07.01.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.01.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.09.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|