Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2006039812 | Global Dossier | 20.04.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US61946104 | 15.10.2004 | US69332805 | 23.06.2005 | US65869605 | 04.03.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2006034577 | Global Dossier | 06.04.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US64269705 | 10.01.2005 | US61462104 | 30.09.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2006002550 | Global Dossier | 12.01.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US60117804 | 13.08.2004 | US58558304 | 07.07.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2006000094 | Global Dossier | 05.01.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US58229804 | 24.06.2004 | US61946104 | 15.10.2004 | WO2005CA00506 | 05.04.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2006000091 | Global Dossier | 12.04.2007 | A8 | WO2006000091 | 05.01.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US58229804 | 24.06.2004 | US59866004 | 04.08.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2005125250 | Global Dossier | 29.12.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US58135604 | 22.06.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2005120117 | Global Dossier | 15.12.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US58229804 | 24.06.2004 | US62294604 | 28.10.2004 | US57736204 | 04.06.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2005099290 | Global Dossier | 20.10.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US56422704 | 22.04.2004 | US56422804 | 22.04.2004 | US55901604 | 05.04.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2005096531 | Global Dossier | 13.10.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US55856604 | 02.04.2004 | US55901604 | 05.04.2004 | US56600904 | 28.04.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2005096519 | Global Dossier | 13.10.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US55856604 | 02.04.2004 | US56380204 | 21.04.2004 | US56600904 | 28.04.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2005096510 | Global Dossier | 13.10.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US56381504 | 21.04.2004 | US55856604 | 02.04.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2005088882 | Global Dossier | 22.09.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US55856604 | 02.04.2004 | US55316104 | 15.03.2004 | US56600904 | 28.04.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9813136 | Global Dossier | 07.11.2017 | B2 | US2017126301 | 04.05.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US60117804 | 13.08.2004 | WO2005CA01057 | 07.07.2005 | US201615357552 | 21.11.2016 | US63184208 | 07.01.2008 | US58558304 | 07.07.2004 | US201314077511 | 12.11.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9954715 | Global Dossier | 24.04.2018 | B2 | US2017005852 | 05.01.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US58229804 | 24.06.2004 | US201615267396 | 16.09.2016 | US201113114579 | 24.05.2011 | WO2005CA00987 | 23.06.2005 | US63047407 | 23.07.2007 | US201213680209 | 19.11.2012 | US59866004 | 04.08.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9832775 | Global Dossier | 28.11.2017 | B2 | US2016205689 | 14.07.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US61946104 | 15.10.2004 | US69332805 | 23.06.2005 | US201414450987 | 04.08.2014 | US201615075474 | 21.03.2016 | WO2005CA01588 | 17.10.2005 | US66531007 | 13.04.2007 | US65869605 | 04.03.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9628153 | Global Dossier | 18.04.2017 | B2 | US2016134339 | 12.05.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US61946104 | 15.10.2004 | US58229804 | 24.06.2004 | WO2005CA00958 | 22.06.2005 | US64269705 | 10.01.2005 | US61462104 | 30.09.2004 | US58135604 | 22.06.2004 | US60117804 | 13.08.2004 | US201615000542 | 19.01.2016 | US63039106 | 22.12.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9742606 | Global Dossier | 22.08.2017 | B2 | US2015270996 | 24.09.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514672529 | 30.03.2015 | US55856604 | 02.04.2004 | US201313855296 | 02.04.2013 | WO2005CA00387 | 15.03.2005 | US55316104 | 15.03.2004 | US56600904 | 28.04.2004 | US59305305 | 15.03.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9294252 | Global Dossier | 22.03.2016 | B2 | US2014341066 | 20.11.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US61946104 | 15.10.2004 | US69332805 | 23.06.2005 | US201414450987 | 04.08.2014 | WO2005CA01588 | 17.10.2005 | US66531007 | 13.04.2007 | US65869605 | 04.03.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9509384 | Global Dossier | 29.11.2016 | B2 | US2014072076 | 13.03.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US60117804 | 13.08.2004 | WO2005CA01057 | 07.07.2005 | US63184208 | 07.01.2008 | US58558304 | 07.07.2004 | US201314077511 | 12.11.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2013322399 | Global Dossier | 05.12.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213673289 | 09.11.2012 | US58135604 | 22.06.2004 | US201113221535 | 30.08.2011 | US63047308 | 23.01.2008 | WO2005CA00970 | 22.06.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8995402 | Global Dossier | 31.03.2015 | B2 | US2013287138 | 31.10.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US55856604 | 02.04.2004 | US201313855296 | 02.04.2013 | WO2005CA00387 | 15.03.2005 | US55316104 | 15.03.2004 | US56600904 | 28.04.2004 | US59305305 | 15.03.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9450801 | Global Dossier | 20.09.2016 | B2 | US2013077469 | 28.03.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US58229804 | 24.06.2004 | WO2005CA00987 | 23.06.2005 | US201113114579 | 24.05.2011 | US63047407 | 23.07.2007 | US201213680209 | 19.11.2012 | US59866004 | 04.08.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9832063 | Global Dossier | 28.11.2017 | B2 | US2013077468 | 28.03.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US58229804 | 24.06.2004 | WO2005CA00987 | 23.06.2005 | US201113114579 | 24.05.2011 | US201213680173 | 19.11.2012 | US63047407 | 23.07.2007 | US59866004 | 04.08.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9282535 | Global Dossier | 08.03.2016 | B2 | US2013064202 | 14.03.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US61946104 | 15.10.2004 | US201213666479 | 01.11.2012 | US201113209019 | 12.08.2011 | WO2005CA00992 | 27.06.2005 | US57109405 | 27.06.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9277570 | Global Dossier | 01.03.2016 | B2 | US2013064154 | 14.03.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US58229804 | 24.06.2004 | US61946104 | 15.10.2004 | US201213666426 | 01.11.2012 | US201113209019 | 12.08.2011 | WO2005CA00992 | 27.06.2005 | US57109405 | 27.06.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8537782 | Global Dossier | 17.09.2013 | B2 | US2012327905 | 27.12.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US58135604 | 22.06.2004 | US201113221621 | 30.08.2011 | US63047308 | 23.01.2008 | WO2005CA00970 | 22.06.2005 | US201213597921 | 29.08.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8446879 | Global Dossier | 21.05.2013 | B2 | US2012281676 | 08.11.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US58135604 | 22.06.2004 | US201113221579 | 30.08.2011 | US63047308 | 23.01.2008 | WO2005CA00970 | 22.06.2005 | US201213551726 | 18.07.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9008013 | Global Dossier | 14.04.2015 | B2 | US2012106483 | 03.05.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US61946104 | 15.10.2004 | US58229804 | 24.06.2004 | US64269705 | 10.01.2005 | US61462104 | 30.09.2004 | US63038506 | 22.12.2006 | US58135604 | 22.06.2004 | US60117804 | 13.08.2004 | US201213342654 | 03.01.2012 | WO2005CA00959 | 22.06.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8165094 | Global Dossier | 24.04.2012 | B2 | US2011310848 | 22.12.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US58135604 | 22.06.2004 | US201113221601 | 30.08.2011 | US63047308 | 23.01.2008 | WO2005CA00970 | 22.06.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8249024 | Global Dossier | 21.08.2012 | B2 | US2011310847 | 22.12.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US58135604 | 22.06.2004 | US201113221579 | 30.08.2011 | US63047308 | 23.01.2008 | WO2005CA00970 | 22.06.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8331324 | Global Dossier | 11.12.2012 | B2 | US2011310846 | 22.12.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US58135604 | 22.06.2004 | US201113221535 | 30.08.2011 | US63047308 | 23.01.2008 | WO2005CA00970 | 22.06.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8279836 | Global Dossier | 02.10.2012 | B2 | US2011310725 | 22.12.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US58135604 | 22.06.2004 | US201113221621 | 30.08.2011 | US63047308 | 23.01.2008 | WO2005CA00970 | 22.06.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8917703 | Global Dossier | 23.12.2014 | B2 | US2011299439 | 08.12.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US58229804 | 24.06.2004 | US61946104 | 15.10.2004 | WO2005CA00506 | 05.04.2005 | US201113209019 | 12.08.2011 | WO2005CA00992 | 27.06.2005 | US57109405 | 27.06.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8340072 | Global Dossier | 25.12.2012 | B2 | US2011222504 | 15.09.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US58229804 | 24.06.2004 | WO2005CA00987 | 23.06.2005 | US201113114579 | 24.05.2011 | US63047407 | 23.07.2007 | US59866004 | 04.08.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8023466 | Global Dossier | 20.09.2011 | B2 | US2009129334 | 21.05.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US63047305 | 22.06.2005 | US58135604 | 22.06.2004 | WO2005CA00970 | 22.06.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7831883 | Global Dossier | 09.11.2010 | B2 | US2009083604 | 26.03.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2005CA00505 | 04.04.2005 | US56381504 | 21.04.2004 | US55856604 | 02.04.2004 | US54707805 | 04.04.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8588326 | Global Dossier | 19.11.2013 | B2 | US2009003466 | 01.01.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US63184205 | 07.07.2005 | US60117804 | 13.08.2004 | WO2005CA01057 | 07.07.2005 | US58558304 | 07.07.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2008268907 | Global Dossier | 30.10.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US58229804 | 24.06.2004 | WO2005IB01567 | 03.06.2005 | US62294604 | 28.10.2004 | US57736204 | 04.06.2004 | US56998805 | 03.06.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8462611 | Global Dossier | 11.06.2013 | B2 | US2008253279 | 16.10.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US55856604 | 02.04.2004 | WO2005CA00387 | 15.03.2005 | US55316104 | 15.03.2004 | US56600904 | 28.04.2004 | US59305305 | 15.03.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9271221 | Global Dossier | 23.02.2016 | B2 | US2008108310 | 08.05.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US61946104 | 15.10.2004 | US58229804 | 24.06.2004 | WO2005CA00958 | 22.06.2005 | US64269705 | 10.01.2005 | US61462104 | 30.09.2004 | US58135604 | 22.06.2004 | US60117804 | 13.08.2004 | US63039105 | 22.06.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7924935 | Global Dossier | 12.04.2011 | B2 | US2008095223 | 24.04.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US66394605 | 29.09.2005 | US64269705 | 10.01.2005 | US61462104 | 30.09.2004 | WO2005CA01474 | 29.09.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8116262 | Global Dossier | 14.02.2012 | B2 | US2008069031 | 20.03.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US61946104 | 15.10.2004 | US58229804 | 24.06.2004 | US63038505 | 22.06.2005 | US64269705 | 10.01.2005 | US61462104 | 30.09.2004 | US58135604 | 22.06.2004 | US60117804 | 13.08.2004 | WO2005CA00959 | 22.06.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7961696 | Global Dossier | 14.06.2011 | B2 | US2008039107 | 14.02.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US58229804 | 24.06.2004 | US63047405 | 23.06.2005 | WO2005CA00987 | 23.06.2005 | US59866004 | 04.08.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8797836 | Global Dossier | 05.08.2014 | B2 | US2007286066 | 13.12.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US61946104 | 15.10.2004 | US69332805 | 23.06.2005 | US66531005 | 17.10.2005 | WO2005CA01588 | 17.10.2005 | US65869605 | 04.03.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7630356 | Global Dossier | 08.12.2009 | B2 | US2007274253 | 29.11.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US54756105 | 05.04.2005 | WO2005CA00506 | 05.04.2005 | US56422704 | 22.04.2004 | US56422804 | 22.04.2004 | US55901604 | 05.04.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2007263735 | Global Dossier | 15.11.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2005CA00507 | 04.04.2005 | US55856604 | 02.04.2004 | US55901604 | 05.04.2004 | US54707705 | 04.04.2005 | US56600904 | 28.04.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8014377 | Global Dossier | 06.09.2011 | B2 | US2007218889 | 20.09.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US58229804 | 24.06.2004 | US61946104 | 15.10.2004 | WO2005CA00506 | 05.04.2005 | WO2005CA00992 | 27.06.2005 | US57109405 | 27.06.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9450664 | Global Dossier | 20.09.2016 | B2 | US2007183527 | 09.08.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2005CA00504 | 04.04.2005 | US55856604 | 02.04.2004 | US56380204 | 21.04.2004 | US56600904 | 28.04.2004 | US54707305 | 04.04.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7876840 | Global Dossier | 25.01.2011 | B2 | US2007105508 | 10.05.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2005CA00507 | 04.04.2005 | US55856604 | 02.04.2004 | US63919106 | 15.12.2006 | US55901604 | 05.04.2004 | US54707705 | 04.04.2005 | US56600904 | 28.04.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11398860 | Global Dossier | 26.07.2022 | B2 | US2020007217 | 02.01.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US60117804 | 13.08.2004 | US201715797138 | 30.10.2017 | US201916560246 | 04.09.2019 | WO2005CA01057 | 07.07.2005 | US201615357552 | 21.11.2016 | US63184208 | 07.01.2008 | US58558304 | 07.07.2004 | US201314077511 | 12.11.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11258489 | Global Dossier | 22.02.2022 | B2 | US2020162138 | 21.05.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US61946104 | 15.10.2004 | US58229804 | 24.06.2004 | US201514685252 | 13.04.2015 | US64269705 | 10.01.2005 | US61462104 | 30.09.2004 | US58135604 | 22.06.2004 | US60117804 | 13.08.2004 | US202016749687 | 22.01.2020 | US201213342654 | 03.01.2012 | US201916373183 | 02.04.2019 | WO2005CA00959 | 22.06.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11201648 | Global Dossier | 14.12.2021 | B2 | US2020228175 | 16.07.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US61946104 | 15.10.2004 | US58229804 | 24.06.2004 | WO2005CA00958 | 22.06.2005 | US64269705 | 10.01.2005 | US61462104 | 30.09.2004 | US58135604 | 22.06.2004 | US60117804 | 13.08.2004 | US202016745516 | 17.01.2020 | US201715486060 | 12.04.2017 | US201615000542 | 19.01.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10973011 | Global Dossier | 06.04.2021 | B2 | US2020329472 | 15.10.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US61946104 | 15.10.2004 | US58229804 | 24.06.2004 | US201213666426 | 01.11.2012 | US202016914718 | 29.06.2020 | US201615056720 | 29.02.2016 | US201113209019 | 12.08.2011 | WO2005CA00992 | 27.06.2005 | US57109405 | 27.06.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10959227 | Global Dossier | 23.03.2021 | B2 | US2018092098 | 29.03.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US61946104 | 15.10.2004 | US69332805 | 23.06.2005 | US201715823120 | 27.11.2017 | US201414450987 | 04.08.2014 | US66531005 | 17.10.2005 | US201615075474 | 21.03.2016 | WO2005CA01588 | 17.10.2005 | US65869605 | 04.03.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10841141 | Global Dossier | 17.11.2020 | B2 | US2019372812 | 05.12.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201916511348 | 15.07.2019 | US201514672529 | 30.03.2015 | US55856604 | 02.04.2004 | US201313855296 | 02.04.2013 | US201715674785 | 11.08.2017 | WO2005CA00387 | 15.03.2005 | US55316104 | 15.03.2004 | US56600904 | 28.04.2004 | US59305305 | 15.03.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10826744 | Global Dossier | 03.11.2020 | B2 | US2019173722 | 06.06.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US58229804 | 24.06.2004 | US201113114579 | 24.05.2011 | WO2005CA00987 | 23.06.2005 | US201715823072 | 27.11.2017 | US201213680173 | 19.11.2012 | US63047407 | 23.07.2007 | US201916249672 | 16.01.2019 | US59866004 | 04.08.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10701672 | Global Dossier | 30.06.2020 | B2 | US2016183245 | 23.06.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US61946104 | 15.10.2004 | US58229804 | 24.06.2004 | US201213666426 | 01.11.2012 | WO2005CA00506 | 05.04.2005 | US201615056720 | 29.02.2016 | US201113209019 | 12.08.2011 | WO2005CA00992 | 27.06.2005 | US57109405 | 27.06.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10581500 | Global Dossier | 03.03.2020 | B2 | US2019229787 | 25.07.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US61946104 | 15.10.2004 | US58229804 | 24.06.2004 | US201514685252 | 13.04.2015 | US64269705 | 10.01.2005 | US61462104 | 30.09.2004 | US63038506 | 22.12.2006 | US58135604 | 22.06.2004 | US60117804 | 13.08.2004 | US201213342654 | 03.01.2012 | US201916373183 | 02.04.2019 | WO2005CA00959 | 22.06.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10554272 | Global Dossier | 04.02.2020 | B2 | US2017222702 | 03.08.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US61946104 | 15.10.2004 | US58229804 | 24.06.2004 | WO2005CA00958 | 22.06.2005 | US64269705 | 10.01.2005 | US61462104 | 30.09.2004 | US58135604 | 22.06.2004 | US60117804 | 13.08.2004 | US201715486060 | 12.04.2017 | US201615000542 | 19.01.2016 | US63039106 | 22.12.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10411783 | Global Dossier | 10.09.2019 | B2 | US2018069614 | 08.03.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US60117804 | 13.08.2004 | US201715797138 | 30.10.2017 | WO2005CA01057 | 07.07.2005 | US201615357552 | 21.11.2016 | US63184208 | 07.01.2008 | US58558304 | 07.07.2004 | US201314077511 | 12.11.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10374856 | Global Dossier | 06.08.2019 | B2 | US2018041367 | 08.02.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514672529 | 30.03.2015 | US55856604 | 02.04.2004 | US201313855296 | 02.04.2013 | US201715674785 | 11.08.2017 | WO2005CA00387 | 15.03.2005 | US55316104 | 15.03.2004 | US56600904 | 28.04.2004 | US59305305 | 15.03.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10263677 | Global Dossier | 16.04.2019 | B2 | US2015215921 | 30.07.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US61946104 | 15.10.2004 | US58229804 | 24.06.2004 | US201514685252 | 13.04.2015 | US64269705 | 10.01.2005 | US61462104 | 30.09.2004 | US63038506 | 22.12.2006 | US58135604 | 22.06.2004 | US60117804 | 13.08.2004 | US201213342654 | 03.01.2012 | WO2005CA00959 | 22.06.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10212017 | Global Dossier | 19.02.2019 | B2 | US2018152331 | 31.05.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US58229804 | 24.06.2004 | US201113114579 | 24.05.2011 | WO2005CA00987 | 23.06.2005 | US201715823072 | 27.11.2017 | US201213680173 | 19.11.2012 | US63047407 | 23.07.2007 | US59866004 | 04.08.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101157291B | Global Dossier | 15.06.2012 | B1 | KR20070018106 | 13.02.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | US58229804 | 24.06.2004 | WO2005IB01567 | 03.06.2005 | US62294604 | 28.10.2004 | US57736204 | 04.06.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3745634 | Global Dossier | 02.12.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US61946104 | 15.10.2004 | US69332805 | 23.06.2005 | EP05797127 | 17.10.2005 | WO2005CA01588 | 17.10.2005 | US65869605 | 04.03.2005 | EP15186434 | 17.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3562058 | Global Dossier | 27.04.2022 | B1 | EP3562058 | 30.10.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US55856604 | 02.04.2004 | EP05714626 | 15.03.2005 | WO2005CA00387 | 15.03.2005 | US55316104 | 15.03.2004 | US56600904 | 28.04.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3537681 | Global Dossier | 07.10.2020 | B1 | EP3537681 | 11.09.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US58229804 | 24.06.2004 | EP15190774 | 23.06.2005 | EP12150556 | 23.06.2005 | WO2005CA00987 | 23.06.2005 | EP05759545 | 23.06.2005 | US59866004 | 04.08.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3528575 | Global Dossier | 16.12.2020 | B1 | EP3528575 | 21.08.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP05759461 | 22.06.2005 | US61946104 | 15.10.2004 | US58229804 | 24.06.2004 | US64269705 | 10.01.2005 | US61462104 | 30.09.2004 | US58135604 | 22.06.2004 | US60117804 | 13.08.2004 | US11780404 | 13.08.2004 | WO2005CA00959 | 22.06.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3447935 | Global Dossier | 26.01.2022 | B1 | EP3447935 | 27.02.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2005CA00507 | 04.04.2005 | US55856604 | 02.04.2004 | EP05732085 | 04.04.2005 | US55901604 | 05.04.2004 | US56600904 | 28.04.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3313001 | Global Dossier | 25.04.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US61946104 | 15.10.2004 | US58229804 | 24.06.2004 | US64269705 | 10.01.2005 | US61462104 | 30.09.2004 | US58135604 | 22.06.2004 | US60117804 | 13.08.2004 | EP05759456 | 22.06.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2993851 | Global Dossier | 24.04.2019 | B1 | EP2993851 | 09.03.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US58229804 | 24.06.2004 | EP12150556 | 23.06.2005 | WO2005CA00987 | 23.06.2005 | EP05759545 | 23.06.2005 | US59866004 | 04.08.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2988563 | Global Dossier | 20.05.2020 | B1 | EP2988563 | 24.02.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US61946104 | 15.10.2004 | US69332805 | 23.06.2005 | EP05797127 | 17.10.2005 | WO2005CA01588 | 17.10.2005 | US65869605 | 04.03.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2442513 | Global Dossier | 18.04.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US58229804 | 24.06.2004 | EP05759545 | 23.06.2005 | US59866004 | 04.08.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2427012 | Global Dossier | 13.01.2016 | B1 | EP2427012 | 18.04.2012 | A3 | EP2427012 | 07.03.2012 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US61946104 | 15.10.2004 | US69332805 | 23.06.2005 | EP05797127 | 17.10.2005 | US65869605 | 04.03.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2427011 | Global Dossier | 27.08.2014 | B1 | EP2427011 | 18.04.2012 | A3 | EP2427011 | 07.03.2012 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US61946104 | 15.10.2004 | US69332805 | 23.06.2005 | EP05797127 | 17.10.2005 | US65869605 | 04.03.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1803314 | Global Dossier | 09.03.2016 | B1 | EP1803314 | 28.10.2009 | A4 | EP1803314 | 04.07.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US61946104 | 15.10.2004 | US69332805 | 23.06.2005 | WO2005CA01588 | 17.10.2005 | US65869605 | 04.03.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1787414 | Global Dossier | 11.01.2012 | B1 | EP1787414 | 10.03.2010 | A4 | EP1787414 | 23.05.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US58229804 | 24.06.2004 | WO2005CA00987 | 23.06.2005 | US59866004 | 04.08.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1766789 | Global Dossier | 27.02.2019 | B1 | EP1766789 | 14.03.2012 | A4 | EP1766789 | 28.03.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US61946104 | 15.10.2004 | US58229804 | 24.06.2004 | US64269705 | 10.01.2005 | US61462104 | 30.09.2004 | US58135604 | 22.06.2004 | US60117804 | 13.08.2004 | WO2005CA00959 | 22.06.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1752009 | Global Dossier | 13.06.2012 | A4 | EP1752009 | 14.02.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US58229804 | 24.06.2004 | WO2005IB01567 | 03.06.2005 | US62294604 | 28.10.2004 | US57736204 | 04.06.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1730864 | Global Dossier | 31.10.2018 | B1 | EP1730864 | 11.07.2012 | A4 | EP1730864 | 13.12.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2005CA00507 | 04.04.2005 | US55856604 | 02.04.2004 | US55901604 | 05.04.2004 | US56600904 | 28.04.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1730856 | Global Dossier | 02.05.2012 | A4 | EP1730856 | 13.12.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2005CA00504 | 04.04.2005 | US55856604 | 02.04.2004 | US56380204 | 21.04.2004 | US56600904 | 28.04.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1726111 | Global Dossier | 29.05.2019 | B1 | EP1726111 | 04.07.2012 | A4 | EP1726111 | 29.11.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US55856604 | 02.04.2004 | WO2005CA00387 | 15.03.2005 | US55316104 | 15.03.2004 | US56600904 | 28.04.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1766806 | Global Dossier | 01.11.2017 | B1 | EP1766806 | 02.01.2013 | A4 | EP1766806 | 28.03.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US61946104 | 15.10.2004 | US58229804 | 24.06.2004 | WO2005CA00958 | 22.06.2005 | US64269705 | 10.01.2005 | US61462104 | 30.09.2004 | US58135604 | 22.06.2004 | US60117804 | 13.08.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN100539462C | 09.09.2009 | C | CN1965597 | 16.05.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | US55901604 | 05.04.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101091408B | 30.01.2013 | B | CN101091408 | 19.12.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | US61946104 | 15.10.2004 | US69332805 | 23.06.2005 | WO2005CA01588 | 17.10.2005 | US65869605 | 04.03.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101156322B | 20.11.2013 | B | CN101156322 | 02.04.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US61946104 | 15.10.2004 | US58229804 | 24.06.2004 | US64269705 | 10.01.2005 | US61462104 | 30.09.2004 | US58135604 | 22.06.2004 | US60117804 | 13.08.2004 | WO2005CA00959 | 22.06.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101808290B | 16.03.2016 | B | CN101808290 | 18.08.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | US61946104 | 15.10.2004 | US69332805 | 23.06.2005 | CN200580041149 | 17.10.2005 | US65869605 | 04.03.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101924565B | 15.10.2014 | B | CN101924565 | 22.12.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | US56381504 | 21.04.2004 | US55856604 | 02.04.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN103036844B | 24.11.2017 | B | CN103036844 | 10.04.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US55856604 | 02.04.2004 | US55316104 | 15.03.2004 | US56600904 | 28.04.2004 | CN200580015041 | 15.03.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN103297204B | 01.03.2017 | B | CN103297204 | 11.09.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US55856604 | 02.04.2004 | US56380204 | 21.04.2004 | US56600904 | 28.04.2004 | CN200580017160 | 04.04.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN103516459B | 21.09.2016 | B | CN103516459 | 15.01.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US55856604 | 02.04.2004 | US55316104 | 15.03.2004 | US56600904 | 28.04.2004 | CN200580015041 | 15.03.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN106160830B | 14.02.2020 | B | CN106160830 | 23.11.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US55856604 | 02.04.2004 | US55316104 | 15.03.2004 | US56600904 | 28.04.2004 | CN200580015041 | 15.03.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN108234099B | 29.12.2020 | B | CN108234099 | 29.06.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | US55856604 | 02.04.2004 | US55316104 | 15.03.2004 | US56600904 | 28.04.2004 | CN200580015041 | 15.03.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1951050B | 30.10.2013 | B | CN1951050 | 18.04.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | US55856604 | 02.04.2004 | WO2005CA00387 | 15.03.2005 | US55316104 | 15.03.2004 | US56600904 | 28.04.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1961499B | 05.06.2013 | B | CN1961499 | 09.05.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2005CA00504 | 04.04.2005 | US55856604 | 02.04.2004 | US56380204 | 21.04.2004 | US56600904 | 28.04.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1973440 | 30.05.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | US55856604 | 02.04.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1115778 | 05.12.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US61946104 | 15.10.2004 | US69332805 | 23.06.2005 | WO2005CA01588 | 17.10.2005 | US65869605 | 04.03.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1118650 | 13.02.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US61946104 | 15.10.2004 | US58229804 | 24.06.2004 | US64269705 | 10.01.2005 | US61462104 | 30.09.2004 | US58135604 | 22.06.2004 | US60117804 | 13.08.2004 | WO2005CA00959 | 22.06.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1193910 | 03.10.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US55856604 | 02.04.2004 | US55316104 | 15.03.2004 | US56600904 | 28.04.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2005125044 | Global Dossier | 29.12.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US58229804 | 24.06.2004 | US61946104 | 15.10.2004 | US64269705 | 10.01.2005 | US61462104 | 30.09.2004 | US58135604 | 22.06.2004 | US60117804 | 13.08.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2005125020 | Global Dossier | 29.12.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US58229804 | 24.06.2004 | US61946104 | 15.10.2004 | US64269705 | 10.01.2005 | US61462104 | 30.09.2004 | US58135604 | 22.06.2004 | US60117804 | 13.08.2004 | Type | Divisional application | EP3313001 |