EP1773139 - AERATED FOOD PRODUCTS CONTAINING HYDROPHOBIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 31.07.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.07.2009 | Withdrawal of application | published on 02.09.2009 [2009/36] | Applicant(s) | For:CY
GB
IE
Unilever PLC Unilever House 100 Victoria Embankment London EC4Y 0DY / GB | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CZ
DE
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GR
HU
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
MC
NL
PL
Unilever N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2009/03] | For:CY
GB
IE
Unilever PLC Unilever House 100 Victoria Embankment London EC4Y 0DY / GB | ||
For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CZ
DE
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GR
HU
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
MC
NL
PL
Unilever N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | |||
Former [2008/32] | For:CY
GB
IE
Unilever PLC Unilever House Blackfriars London EC4P 4BQ / GB | ||
For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CZ
DE
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GR
HU
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
MC
NL
PL
Unilever N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | |||
Former [2007/16] | For:CY
GB
IE
UNILEVER PLC Unilever House, Blackfriars London, Greater London EC4P 4BQ / GB | ||
For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CZ
DE
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GR
HU
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
MC
NL
PL
Unilever Naamloze Vennootschap Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALDRED, Deborah, Lynne Unilever R & D Colworth Sharnbrook Bedford Bedfordshire MK44 1LQ / GB | 02 /
BERRY, Mark, John Unilever R & D Colworth Sharnbrook Bedford Bedfordshire MK44 1LQ / GB | 03 /
CEBULA, Deryck, Jozef Unilever R & D Colworth Sharnbrook Bedford Bedfordshire MK44 1LQ / GB | 04 /
COX, Andrew, Richard Unilever R & D Colworth Sharnbrook Bedford Bedfordshire MK44 1LQ / GB | 05 /
GOLDING, Matthew, Duncan Unilever R & D Vlaardingen Olivier van Noortlaan 120 NL-3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL | 06 /
GOLDING, Sarah Unilever R & D Vlaardingen Olivier van Noortlaan 120 NL-3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL | 07 /
KEENAN, Robert, Daniel Unilever R & D Colworth Sharnbrook Bedford Bedfordshire MK44 1LQ / GB | 08 /
MALONE, Mark, Emmett Fonterra Research Centre Pirvate Bag 11-029 Dariy Farm Road Palmerston North / NZ | 09 /
TWIGG, Sarah Unilever R & D Colworth Sharnbrook Bedford Bedfordshire MK44 1LQ / GB | [2007/16] | Representative(s) | Hugot, Alain Unilever Patent Group Colworth House Sharnbrook Bedford, MK44 1LQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/16] | Hugot, Alain Unilever Patent Group Colworth House Sharnbrook Bedford, MK44 1LQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 05759652.0 | 27.06.2005 | [2007/16] | WO2005EP06997 | Priority number, date | EP20040254483 | 27.07.2004 Original published format: EP 04254483 | EP20050251282 | 03.03.2005 Original published format: EP 05251282 | [2007/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006010426 | Date: | 02.02.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1773139 | Date: | 18.04.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.02.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.02.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A23L2/66 | [2007/16] | CPC: |
A23G9/38 (EP,US);
A23C11/065 (EP,US);
A23C13/12 (EP,US);
A23C9/1526 (EP,US);
A23C9/1544 (EP,US);
A23G3/44 (US);
A23G9/46 (EP,US);
A23L2/54 (EP,US);
A23L2/66 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A23V2002/00, A23V2200/226, A23V2200/204, A23V2250/54 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/16] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GESCHÄUMTE HYDROPHOBIN ENTHALTENDE NAHRUNGSMITTELPRODUKTE | [2007/16] | English: | AERATED FOOD PRODUCTS CONTAINING HYDROPHOBIN | [2007/16] | French: | PRODUITS ALIMENTAIRES AÉRÉS, CONTENANT DE L'HYDROPHOBINE | [2007/16] | Entry into regional phase | 09.01.2007 | National basic fee paid | 09.01.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.01.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.12.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.01.2007 | Examination requested [2007/16] | 12.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.07.2009 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]KR20040018844 ; | [A]US5215777 (ASHER YASHAVANTKUMAR J [CA], et al) [A] 1-15 * column 4, line 25 - column 5, line 13 *; | [DA]WO9641882 (PROEFSTATION VOOR DE CHAMPIGNO [NL], et al) [DA] 1-15 * page 9, line 16 - page 10, line 5; claims 1-37 *; | [A]DE29715519U (KETTNER JUERGEN [DE]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US6096867 (BYASS LOUISE JANE [GB], et al) [A] 1-15 * claims 1-9 *; | [A]WO03015530 (NESTLE SA [CH], et al) [A] 1-15 * claims 1-12 *; | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2004, no. 44, Database accession no. 2004-465457, XP002313777 & KR20040018844 A 20040304 (KIM J G) [A] 1-15 * abstract * | [A] - SCHOLMEIJER K ET AL, "FUNGAL HYDROPHOBINS IN MEDICAL AND TECHNICAL APPLICATIONS", APPLIED MICROBIOLOGY AND BIOTECHNOLOGY, SPRINGER VERLAG, BERLIN, DE, (200107), vol. 56, no. 1/2, ISSN 0175-7598, pages 1 - 8, XP001120015 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s002530100632 |