EP1774428 - METHOD FOR CONTROL OF A DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 07.07.2007 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.10.2009 | Change - applicant | published on 18.11.2009 [2009/47] | Applicant(s) | For:DE
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Steindamm 94 20099 Hamburg / DE | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2009/47] | For:DE
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Steindamm 94 20099 Hamburg / DE | ||
For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | |||
Former [2007/16] | For:DE
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Steindamm 94 20099 Hamburg / DE | ||
For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PETERS, Jochen, c/o Philips I.P. &Standards GmbH Weisshausstr. 2 52066 Aachen / DE | [2007/16] | Representative(s) | Groenendaal, Antonius W. M. Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2007/16] | Groenendaal, Antonius W. M. Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 05759779.1 | 11.07.2005 | [2007/16] | WO2005IB52281 | Priority number, date | EP20040103643 | 28.07.2004 Original published format: EP 04103643 | [2007/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006013479 | Date: | 09.02.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/06] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1774428 | Date: | 18.04.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.02.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.12.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/033 | [2007/16] | CPC: |
G06F3/0386 (EP,US);
G06F3/03 (KR);
G06F3/0304 (EP,US);
G06F3/03545 (EP,US);
G06K11/00 (KR);
G08C17/02 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/16] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG EINER EINRICHTUNG | [2007/16] | English: | METHOD FOR CONTROL OF A DEVICE | [2007/16] | French: | PROCEDE DE COMMANDE DE DISPOSITIF | [2007/16] | Entry into regional phase | 28.02.2007 | National basic fee paid | 08.06.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.06.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.06.2007 | Examination requested [2007/31] | 29.06.2007 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2007/32] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]WO2004047011 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [X] 1-11,13 * the whole document * [Y] 12; | [XY]DE10110979 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1-11,13 * paragraphs [0007] , [0014] , [0015] , [0021] , [0023] , [0029] * * figures 1,2 * [Y] 12; | [Y]FR2731290 (ORIOT JEAN CLAUDE [FR]) [Y] 1-13 * page 1, line 22 - line 37 * * claim 1 * * figures 1,2 *; | [Y]US5719622 (CONWAY LYNN [US]) [Y] 1-13 * abstract * * figures 1,3 * * column 3, line 13 - line 50 * * claims 1,13 *; | [A]EP0656719 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1-13 * abstract * * column 2, line 8 - column 3, line 13 * * column 4, line 38 - line 52 * * claim 1 *; | [A]EP1335338 (MICROSOFT CORP [US]) [A] 1-13 * abstract * * paragraphs [0026] , [0027] * |