EP1793145 - SEALING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 10.12.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.12.2010 | Withdrawal of application | published on 12.01.2011 [2011/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NOK Corporation 12-15 Shiba Daimon 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8585 / JP | [2007/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TSUKAMOTO, Koji, NOK CORPORATION Jitohgata, Sagara-cho Haibara-gun, Shizuoka 4210532 / JP | [2007/23] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/27] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/23] | Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner GbR, TBK-Patent, Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05759944.1 | 14.07.2005 | [2007/23] | WO2005JP12987 | Priority number, date | JP20040277116 | 24.09.2004 Original published format: JP 2004277116 | [2007/23] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006033197 | Date: | 30.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1793145 | Date: | 06.06.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.03.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 30.03.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F16J15/10 | [2007/23] | CPC: |
F16L5/10 (EP,US);
F16L5/14 (EP,US);
H02G15/013 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE [2008/01] |
Former [2007/23] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DICHTUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2007/23] | English: | SEALING DEVICE | [2007/23] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE SCELLAGE | [2007/23] | Entry into regional phase | 09.01.2007 | Translation filed | 09.01.2007 | National basic fee paid | 09.01.2007 | Search fee paid | 09.01.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.01.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.01.2007 | Examination requested [2007/23] | 08.12.2010 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2011/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JPH11288630 (NOK CORP); | [X]JPH07105775 (SUMITOMO WIRING SYSTEMS); | [Y]JPH11173423 (NOK CORP) | by applicant | JPH11173423 |