EP1745181 - MODULAR BUILDING ELEMENTS FOR CONSTRUCTING RETAINING WALL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/04] | MODULAR BUILDING ELEMENTS FOR CONSTRUCTING RETAINING WALL AND THE CONSTRUCTION METHOD THEREOF | ||
[2007/47] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.01.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.12.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 05.01.2011 [2011/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ulguner, Ercument Fevzi Ahmet Celebi Mah. Davutoglu Sok. Gokturk Apt. No:8/3 Daire No:18 Dogancilar Uskudar 34672 Istanbul / TR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/04] | For all designated states Ulgumer, Ercument, Fevzi Ahmet Celebi Mah. Davutoglu Sok. Gokturk Apt. No:8/3 Daire No:18 Dogancilar Uskudar 34672 Istanbul / TR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2007/04] | Representative(s) | Cayli, Hülya, et al Paragon Consultancy Incorporated Koza Sokak No: 63/2 GOP Cankaya 06540 Ankara / TR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/04] | Cayli, Hülya, et al Paragon Consultancy Inc. Koza Sokak No: 60/6 GOP 06700 Ankara / TR | Application number, filing date | 05759986.2 | 09.05.2005 | [2007/04] | WO2005TR00022 | Priority number, date | TR20040001044 | 10.05.2004 Original published format: TR 200401044 | TR20040001694 | 12.07.2004 Original published format: TR 200401694 | TR20050001589 | 29.04.2005 Original published format: TR 200501589 | [2007/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005108682 | Date: | 17.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1745181 | Date: | 24.01.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.11.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1745181 | Date: | 19.03.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.11.2005 | Classification | IPC: | E02D29/02, E04C1/39 | [2007/04] | CPC: |
E04C1/395 (EP,US);
E02D29/0266 (EP,US);
E04B2/16 (EP,US);
E04B2/22 (EP,US);
E04B2002/0217 (EP,US);
E04B2002/0245 (EP,US);
E04B2002/0265 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/04] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MODULARE BAUELEMENTE ZUR KONSTRUKTION EINER STÜTZWAND | [2007/47] | English: | MODULAR BUILDING ELEMENTS FOR CONSTRUCTING RETAINING WALL | [2007/47] | French: | ELEMENTS DE CONSTRUCTION MODULAIRES DESTINES A LA CONSTRUCTION DE MUR DE RETENUE | [2007/47] |
Former [2007/04] | MODULARE BAUELEMENTE ZUR KONSTRUKTION EINER STÜTZWAND UND KONSTRUKTIONSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | ||
Former [2007/04] | MODULAR BUILDING ELEMENTS FOR CONSTRUCTING RETAINING WALL AND THE CONSTRUCTION METHOD THEREOF | ||
Former [2007/04] | ELEMENTS DE CONSTRUCTION MODULAIRES DESTINES A LA CONSTRUCTION DE PAROI DE RETENUE ET PROCEDE DE CONSTRUCTION ASSOCIE | Entry into regional phase | 27.10.2006 | National basic fee paid | 27.10.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.10.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.03.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 13.10.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.10.2006 | Examination requested [2007/04] | 07.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.12.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 14.12.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.12.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 19.03.2008 | CY | 19.03.2008 | CZ | 19.03.2008 | DK | 19.03.2008 | EE | 19.03.2008 | FI | 19.03.2008 | IT | 19.03.2008 | LT | 19.03.2008 | NL | 19.03.2008 | PL | 19.03.2008 | RO | 19.03.2008 | SI | 19.03.2008 | SK | 19.03.2008 | LU | 09.05.2008 | MC | 31.05.2008 | BG | 19.06.2008 | SE | 19.06.2008 | GR | 20.06.2008 | ES | 30.06.2008 | IS | 19.07.2008 | PT | 27.08.2008 | HU | 20.09.2008 | [2011/01] |
Former [2010/39] | BE | 19.03.2008 | |
CY | 19.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2008 | ||
DK | 19.03.2008 | ||
EE | 19.03.2008 | ||
FI | 19.03.2008 | ||
IT | 19.03.2008 | ||
LT | 19.03.2008 | ||
NL | 19.03.2008 | ||
PL | 19.03.2008 | ||
RO | 19.03.2008 | ||
SI | 19.03.2008 | ||
SK | 19.03.2008 | ||
LU | 09.05.2008 | ||
MC | 31.05.2008 | ||
BG | 19.06.2008 | ||
SE | 19.06.2008 | ||
ES | 30.06.2008 | ||
IS | 19.07.2008 | ||
PT | 27.08.2008 | ||
HU | 20.09.2008 | ||
Former [2010/33] | BE | 19.03.2008 | |
CY | 19.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2008 | ||
DK | 19.03.2008 | ||
EE | 19.03.2008 | ||
FI | 19.03.2008 | ||
IT | 19.03.2008 | ||
LT | 19.03.2008 | ||
NL | 19.03.2008 | ||
PL | 19.03.2008 | ||
RO | 19.03.2008 | ||
SI | 19.03.2008 | ||
SK | 19.03.2008 | ||
LU | 09.05.2008 | ||
MC | 31.05.2008 | ||
BG | 19.06.2008 | ||
SE | 19.06.2008 | ||
ES | 30.06.2008 | ||
IS | 19.07.2008 | ||
PT | 27.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/52] | BE | 19.03.2008 | |
CY | 19.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2008 | ||
DK | 19.03.2008 | ||
EE | 19.03.2008 | ||
FI | 19.03.2008 | ||
IT | 19.03.2008 | ||
LT | 19.03.2008 | ||
NL | 19.03.2008 | ||
PL | 19.03.2008 | ||
RO | 19.03.2008 | ||
SI | 19.03.2008 | ||
SK | 19.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.05.2008 | ||
BG | 19.06.2008 | ||
SE | 19.06.2008 | ||
ES | 30.06.2008 | ||
IS | 19.07.2008 | ||
PT | 27.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/27] | BE | 19.03.2008 | |
CZ | 19.03.2008 | ||
DK | 19.03.2008 | ||
EE | 19.03.2008 | ||
FI | 19.03.2008 | ||
LT | 19.03.2008 | ||
NL | 19.03.2008 | ||
PL | 19.03.2008 | ||
RO | 19.03.2008 | ||
SI | 19.03.2008 | ||
SK | 19.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.05.2008 | ||
BG | 19.06.2008 | ||
SE | 19.06.2008 | ||
ES | 30.06.2008 | ||
IS | 19.07.2008 | ||
PT | 27.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/09] | BE | 19.03.2008 | |
CZ | 19.03.2008 | ||
DK | 19.03.2008 | ||
EE | 19.03.2008 | ||
FI | 19.03.2008 | ||
LT | 19.03.2008 | ||
NL | 19.03.2008 | ||
PL | 19.03.2008 | ||
RO | 19.03.2008 | ||
SI | 19.03.2008 | ||
SK | 19.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.05.2008 | ||
SE | 19.06.2008 | ||
ES | 30.06.2008 | ||
IS | 19.07.2008 | ||
PT | 27.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/04] | BE | 19.03.2008 | |
CZ | 19.03.2008 | ||
FI | 19.03.2008 | ||
LT | 19.03.2008 | ||
NL | 19.03.2008 | ||
PL | 19.03.2008 | ||
RO | 19.03.2008 | ||
SI | 19.03.2008 | ||
SK | 19.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.05.2008 | ||
SE | 19.06.2008 | ||
ES | 30.06.2008 | ||
IS | 19.07.2008 | ||
PT | 27.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/01] | BE | 19.03.2008 | |
CZ | 19.03.2008 | ||
FI | 19.03.2008 | ||
LT | 19.03.2008 | ||
NL | 19.03.2008 | ||
PL | 19.03.2008 | ||
RO | 19.03.2008 | ||
SI | 19.03.2008 | ||
SK | 19.03.2008 | ||
SE | 19.06.2008 | ||
ES | 30.06.2008 | ||
PT | 27.08.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | BE | 19.03.2008 | |
CZ | 19.03.2008 | ||
FI | 19.03.2008 | ||
LT | 19.03.2008 | ||
PL | 19.03.2008 | ||
RO | 19.03.2008 | ||
SI | 19.03.2008 | ||
SK | 19.03.2008 | ||
SE | 19.06.2008 | ||
ES | 30.06.2008 | ||
PT | 27.08.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | BE | 19.03.2008 | |
FI | 19.03.2008 | ||
LT | 19.03.2008 | ||
PL | 19.03.2008 | ||
SI | 19.03.2008 | ||
SE | 19.06.2008 | ||
ES | 30.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | BE | 19.03.2008 | |
FI | 19.03.2008 | ||
LT | 19.03.2008 | ||
PL | 19.03.2008 | ||
SI | 19.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/43] | BE | 19.03.2008 | |
FI | 19.03.2008 | ||
LT | 19.03.2008 | ||
PL | 19.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | FI | 19.03.2008 | |
LT | 19.03.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE2817549 (HULAND KARLFRIED ING GRAD) [A] 1* figures *; | [A]US5122015 (SHEN CHEN J [TW]) [A] 1 * figures; abstract *; | [A]US5163261 (O'NEILL RAYMOND J [US]) [A] 1 * figures; abstract *; | [A]DE4306571 (KROCZEK MANFRED DIPL ING [DE]) [A] 1 * figures; abstract * |