EP1778910 - METHOD FOR IMPREGNATING CHIPS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/18] | METHOD AND ARRANGEMENT FOR IMPREGNATING CHIPS | ||
[2014/30] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.10.2015 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 29.11.2017 [2017/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Valmet Aktiebolag 851 94 Sundsvall / SE | [2014/25] |
Former [2011/23] | For all designated states Metso Paper Sweden AB 851 94 Sundsvall / SE | ||
Former [2007/27] | For all designated states Metso Fiber Karlstad AB Box 1033 651 15 Karlstad / SE | ||
Former [2007/18] | For all designated states Kvaerner Pulping Technologies AB Box 1033 651 15 Karlstad / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SNEKKENES, Vidar Herrhagsgatan 62 S-652 19 Karlstad / SE | 02 /
GUSTAVSSON, Lennart Renvallsvägen 38 S-653 60 Karlstad / SE | 03 /
TROLIN, Daniel Ölmegatan 19 A S-652 30 Karlstad / SE | 04 /
NÄSMAN, Mats Ölmegatan 14 B S-652 30 Karlstad / SE | [2007/18] | Application number, filing date | 05760061.1 | 14.07.2005 | [2007/18] | WO2005SE01162 | Priority number, date | SE20040001870 | 15.07.2004 Original published format: SE 0401870 | [2007/18] | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006006934 | Date: | 19.01.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1778910 | Date: | 02.05.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.01.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1778910 | Date: | 26.11.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 19.01.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.07.2010 | Classification | IPC: | D21C1/00, D21C1/02 | [2007/18] | CPC: |
D21C1/00 (EP,US);
D21C3/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/18] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR IMPRÄGNIERUNG VON CHIPS | [2014/30] | English: | METHOD FOR IMPREGNATING CHIPS | [2014/30] | French: | PROCEDE D'IMPREGNATION DE COPEAUX | [2014/30] |
Former [2007/18] | VERFAHREN UND ANORDNUNG ZUR IMPRÄGNIERUNG VON CHIPS | ||
Former [2007/18] | METHOD AND ARRANGEMENT FOR IMPREGNATING CHIPS | ||
Former [2007/18] | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF D'IMPREGNATION DE COPEAUX | Entry into regional phase | 14.07.2005 | Translation filed | 15.02.2007 | National basic fee paid | 15.02.2007 | Search fee paid | 15.02.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.02.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.01.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 15.02.2007 | Examination requested [2007/22] | 28.03.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 13.04.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.10.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.12.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.06.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.10.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 13.10.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.10.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.10.2012 | Opposition(s) | 27.08.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/45] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to indicate the wish to proceed further with the application | 13.04.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 13.04.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 31.05.2011 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 13.04.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 13.04.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 31.05.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.07.2005 | BE | 26.11.2014 | BG | 26.11.2014 | CY | 26.11.2014 | CZ | 26.11.2014 | DK | 26.11.2014 | EE | 26.11.2014 | ES | 26.11.2014 | IT | 26.11.2014 | LT | 26.11.2014 | LV | 26.11.2014 | MC | 26.11.2014 | NL | 26.11.2014 | PL | 26.11.2014 | RO | 26.11.2014 | SI | 26.11.2014 | SK | 26.11.2014 | TR | 26.11.2014 | GR | 27.02.2015 | IS | 26.03.2015 | PT | 26.03.2015 | GB | 14.07.2015 | IE | 14.07.2015 | LU | 14.07.2015 | CH | 31.07.2015 | LI | 31.07.2015 | [2017/46] |
Former [2017/39] | HU | 14.07.2005 | |
BG | 26.11.2014 | ||
CY | 26.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.11.2014 | ||
DK | 26.11.2014 | ||
EE | 26.11.2014 | ||
ES | 26.11.2014 | ||
IT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
MC | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
PL | 26.11.2014 | ||
RO | 26.11.2014 | ||
SI | 26.11.2014 | ||
SK | 26.11.2014 | ||
TR | 26.11.2014 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
GB | 14.07.2015 | ||
IE | 14.07.2015 | ||
LU | 14.07.2015 | ||
CH | 31.07.2015 | ||
LI | 31.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | CY | 26.11.2014 | |
CZ | 26.11.2014 | ||
DK | 26.11.2014 | ||
EE | 26.11.2014 | ||
ES | 26.11.2014 | ||
IT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
MC | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
PL | 26.11.2014 | ||
RO | 26.11.2014 | ||
SI | 26.11.2014 | ||
SK | 26.11.2014 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
GB | 14.07.2015 | ||
IE | 14.07.2015 | ||
LU | 14.07.2015 | ||
CH | 31.07.2015 | ||
LI | 31.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | CY | 26.11.2014 | |
CZ | 26.11.2014 | ||
DK | 26.11.2014 | ||
EE | 26.11.2014 | ||
ES | 26.11.2014 | ||
IT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
MC | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
PL | 26.11.2014 | ||
RO | 26.11.2014 | ||
SI | 26.11.2014 | ||
SK | 26.11.2014 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
GB | 14.07.2015 | ||
LU | 14.07.2015 | ||
CH | 31.07.2015 | ||
LI | 31.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CY | 26.11.2014 | |
CZ | 26.11.2014 | ||
DK | 26.11.2014 | ||
EE | 26.11.2014 | ||
ES | 26.11.2014 | ||
IT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
MC | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
PL | 26.11.2014 | ||
RO | 26.11.2014 | ||
SI | 26.11.2014 | ||
SK | 26.11.2014 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
LU | 14.07.2015 | ||
CH | 31.07.2015 | ||
LI | 31.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/15] | CY | 26.11.2014 | |
CZ | 26.11.2014 | ||
DK | 26.11.2014 | ||
EE | 26.11.2014 | ||
ES | 26.11.2014 | ||
IT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
MC | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
PL | 26.11.2014 | ||
RO | 26.11.2014 | ||
SI | 26.11.2014 | ||
SK | 26.11.2014 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
LU | 14.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/13] | CY | 26.11.2014 | |
CZ | 26.11.2014 | ||
DK | 26.11.2014 | ||
EE | 26.11.2014 | ||
ES | 26.11.2014 | ||
IT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
MC | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
PL | 26.11.2014 | ||
RO | 26.11.2014 | ||
SI | 26.11.2014 | ||
SK | 26.11.2014 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | CY | 26.11.2014 | |
CZ | 26.11.2014 | ||
DK | 26.11.2014 | ||
EE | 26.11.2014 | ||
ES | 26.11.2014 | ||
IT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
PL | 26.11.2014 | ||
RO | 26.11.2014 | ||
SI | 26.11.2014 | ||
SK | 26.11.2014 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/03] | CY | 26.11.2014 | |
CZ | 26.11.2014 | ||
DK | 26.11.2014 | ||
EE | 26.11.2014 | ||
ES | 26.11.2014 | ||
IT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
PL | 26.11.2014 | ||
RO | 26.11.2014 | ||
SK | 26.11.2014 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | CY | 26.11.2014 | |
CZ | 26.11.2014 | ||
DK | 26.11.2014 | ||
EE | 26.11.2014 | ||
ES | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
PL | 26.11.2014 | ||
RO | 26.11.2014 | ||
SK | 26.11.2014 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | CY | 26.11.2014 | |
CZ | 26.11.2014 | ||
DK | 26.11.2014 | ||
EE | 26.11.2014 | ||
ES | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
RO | 26.11.2014 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | CY | 26.11.2014 | |
DK | 26.11.2014 | ||
EE | 26.11.2014 | ||
ES | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/34] | CY | 26.11.2014 | |
DK | 26.11.2014 | ||
ES | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/26] | CY | 26.11.2014 | |
ES | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | ES | 26.11.2014 | |
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | ES | 26.11.2014 | |
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/22] | LT | 26.11.2014 | |
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/20] | LT | 26.11.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9920827 (KVAERNER PULPING TECH [SE], et al) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [A]US6103058 (ENGSTROEM JOHAN [SE]) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [A]US2002017370 (HENRICSON KAJ O [FI], et al) [A] 1-13* the whole document *; | [A]WO03057979 (KVAERNER PULPING TECH [SE], et al) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [A]WO03060229 (KVAERNER PULPING TECH [SE], et al) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [I]WO03106765 (KVAERNER PULPING TECH [SE], et al) [I] 1-13 * page 15, line 13 - line 17; figure 1; claims 1-16 * | International search | [A]US2803540 (DURANT LEONARD G, et al); | [A]DE1261387 (ESCHER WYSS GMBH); | [A]US3532594 (RICHTER JOHAN C F C); | [A]US5635025 (BILODEAU VICTOR L [US]); | [A]US6280567 (GUSTAVSSON LENNART [SE], et al); | [A]WO03106765 (KVAERNER PULPING TECH [SE], et al); | [A]SE523850 (KVAERNER PULPING TECH [SE]) |