EP1782455 - IC CHIP AND ITS MANUFACTURING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.07.2014 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.08.2014 [2014/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Semiconductor Energy Laboratory Co., Ltd. 398, Hase Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa 243-0036 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/19] | For all designated states SEMICONDUCTOR ENERGY LABORATORY CO., LTD. 398, Hase Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa 243-0036 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TSURUME, Takuya, SEMICONDUCTOR ENERGY LAB. CO. LTD 398, Hase, Atsugi-shi Kanagawa 2430036 / JP | 02 /
DAIRIKI, Koji, SEMICONDUCTOR ENERGY LAB. CO., LTD. 398, Hase, Atsugi-shi Kanagawa 2430036 / JP | 03 /
KUSUMOTO, Naoto, SEMICONDUCTOR ENERGY LAB. CO. LTD 398, Hase, Atsugi-shi Kanagawa 2430036 / JP | [2007/19] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/19] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05760110.6 | 06.07.2005 | [2007/19] | WO2005JP12875 | Priority number, date | JP20040203906 | 09.07.2004 Original published format: JP 2004203906 | [2007/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006006611 | Date: | 19.01.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1782455 | Date: | 09.05.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.01.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 19.01.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.06.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/02, H01L27/12, H01L21/301, H01L21/822, H01L27/04, H01L21/336, H01L29/786, H01L21/304, G06K19/07, G06K19/077, B32B37/22, B32B38/00, H01L21/67, H01L21/683, H01L23/48, // H01L21/786, H01L27/13 | [2013/28] | CPC: |
H01L21/67132 (EP,US);
H01L21/02 (KR);
B32B37/226 (EP,US);
B32B38/0004 (EP,US);
H01L21/30 (KR);
H01L21/304 (KR);
H01L21/6835 (EP,US);
H01L21/6836 (EP,US);
H01L24/27 (EP,US);
H01L24/29 (EP,US);
H01L24/97 (EP,US);
H01L27/1203 (EP,US);
H01L27/1255 (EP,US);
H01L27/1266 (EP,US);
B32B2305/342 (EP,US);
B32B2457/14 (EP,US);
H01L21/786 (EP,US);
H01L2221/68313 (EP,US);
H01L2221/68327 (EP,US);
H01L2221/68336 (EP,US);
H01L2221/6834 (EP,US);
H01L2221/68354 (EP,US);
H01L2221/68363 (EP,US);
H01L2221/68377 (EP,US);
H01L2221/68381 (EP,US);
H01L2224/83191 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01006 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01015 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01033 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01049 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0105 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01079 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01082 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/15788, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2007/19] | H01L21/02, H01L27/12, H01L21/301, H01L21/822, H01L27/04, H01L21/336, H01L29/786, H01L21/304, G06K19/07, G06K19/077 | Designated contracting states | DE, FI, FR, GB, NL [2007/42] |
Former [2007/19] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | IC-CHIP UND VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG | [2007/19] | English: | IC CHIP AND ITS MANUFACTURING METHOD | [2007/19] | French: | PUCE DE CI ET METHODE DE FABRICATION DE CELLE-CI | [2007/19] | Entry into regional phase | 09.01.2007 | National basic fee paid | 09.01.2007 | Search fee paid | 09.01.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.01.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.01.2007 | Examination requested [2007/19] | 08.01.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/33] | 24.02.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2013 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5972154 (KONYA TOMONORI [JP]) [Y] 1,9-12 * abstract * * figure 2 * * column 1, line 14 - column 2, line 2 *; | [Y]JP2000321601 (SONY CORP) [Y] 1,9-12 * abstract * * figures 1-8 ** paragraphs [0031] - [0049] *; | [X]US2003027369 (YAMAZAKI SHUNPEI [JP]) [X] 13 * figure 5C * * paragraphs [0094] - [0109] *; | [Y]US2003048404 (SOHN SE IL [KR], et al) [Y] 1,9-12 * paragraphs [0006] - [0008] * * figure 4E *; | [E]EP1635391 (SEMICONDUCTOR ENERGY LAB [JP]) [E] 1,9-12 * figure 9 * * paragraphs [0083] - [0098] * | International search | [Y]JPH1120360 (SEIKO EPSON CORP); | [Y]JPH11212116 (HITACHI LTD); | [Y]JP2004094492 (KONICA MINOLTA HOLDINGS INC) |