EP1769005 - MEASURING DEGREE OF POLYMERISATION FOR CAPSULAR SACCHARIDES THAT CONTAIN SIALIC ACID [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.10.2014 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.10.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.12.2014 [2014/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Novartis AG Lichtstrasse 35 4056 Basel / CH | [2011/27] |
Former [2007/14] | For all designated states Novartis Vaccines and Diagnostics S.r.l. Via Fiorentina 1 53100 Siena SI / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BARDOTTI, Angela Chiron Vaccines Via Fiorentina, 1 I-53100 Siena / IT | [2007/14] | Representative(s) | Marshall, Cameron John, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/14] | Marshall, Cameron John, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 05760345.8 | 23.05.2005 | [2007/14] | WO2005IB02264 | Priority number, date | GB20040011387 | 21.05.2004 Original published format: GB 0411387 | [2007/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005113607 | Date: | 01.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/48] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1769005 | Date: | 04.04.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.12.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.04.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C08B37/00 | [2007/14] | CPC: |
A61K39/095 (EP,US);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P37/04 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C08B37/00 (EP,US);
Y10T436/143333 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/14] | Extension states | AL | 04.12.2006 | BA | 04.12.2006 | HR | 04.12.2006 | LV | 04.12.2006 | MK | 04.12.2006 | YU | 04.12.2006 | Title | German: | BESTIMMUNG DES POLYMERISATIONSGRADS VON SIALINSÄURE ENTHALTENDEN KAPSELSACCHARIDEN | [2007/14] | English: | MEASURING DEGREE OF POLYMERISATION FOR CAPSULAR SACCHARIDES THAT CONTAIN SIALIC ACID | [2007/14] | French: | MESURE DU DEGRE DE POLYMERISATION POUR SACCHARIDES CAPSULAIRES MENINGOCOCCIQUES CONTENANT DE L'ACIDE SIALIQUE | [2007/14] | Entry into regional phase | 04.12.2006 | National basic fee paid | 04.12.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.12.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.12.2006 | Examination requested [2007/14] | 04.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.04.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.01.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.05.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.11.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.09.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.12.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.06.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/49] | 24.07.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/49] | Divisional application(s) | EP10179767.8 / EP2267035 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.02.2008 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 06.09.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 06.09.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 17.10.2012 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP0462794 (OXFORD GLYCOSYSTEMS LTD [GB]) [Y] 14 * claims 1,2,23 *; | [XY]WO03007985 (CHIRON SPA [IT], et al) [X] 1,4-6,10,16 * page 16, lines 20-25 * [Y] 14; | [X]WO03080678 (CHIRON SRL [IT], et al) [X] 15* page 28, lines 14-19; claims 41-51 *; | [X] - RAVENSCROFT N ET AL, "Size determination of bacterial capsular oligosaccharides used to prepare conjugate vaccines", VACCINE, BUTTERWORTH SCIENTIFIC. GUILDFORD, GB, (19990716), vol. 17, no. 22, ISSN 0264-410X, pages 2802 - 2816, XP004171712 [X] 7-9 * page 2803 - page 2804 * * page 2815, column L * * page 2802, column R * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0264-410X(99)00092-4 | [XY] - E. R. VIMR ET AL., "USE OF PROKARYOTIC DERIVED PROBES TO IDENTIFY POLY SIALIC-ACID IN NEO NATAL NEURONAL MEMBRANES", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, USA, (1984), vol. 81, no. 7, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 1971 - 1975, XP002354865 [X] 1-3,7,8 * page 1973, column R * [Y] 14 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.81.7.1971 | [PX] - BARDOTTI A ET AL, "Size determination of bacterial capsular oligosaccharides used to prepare conjugate vaccines against Neisseria meningitidis groups Y and W135", VACCINE, BUTTERWORTH SCIENTIFIC. GUILDFORD, GB, (20050314), vol. 23, no. 16, ISSN 0264-410X, pages 1887 - 1899, XP004768030 [PX] 1-16 *The whole document* DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.vaccine.2004.10.021 |