EP1833317 - SMOKELESS CIGARETTE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.01.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.01.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.02.2009 [2009/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Valadi, Mahmood Box 4047 183 04 Täby / SE | [2008/09] |
Former [2007/38] | For all designated states Mahmood, Valadi Box 4047 183 04 Täby / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2007/38] | Representative(s) | Holmberg-Schwindt, Tor Martin, et al Bergenstrahle & Lindvall AB P.O. Box 17704 118 93 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/38] | Holmberg, Martin Tor, et al Bergenstrahle & Lindvall AB P.O. Box 17704 118 93 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 05760741.8 | 21.06.2005 | [2007/38] | WO2005SE00984 | Priority number, date | SE20040002764 | 11.11.2004 Original published format: SE 0402764 | [2007/38] | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006052177 | Date: | 18.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1833317 | Date: | 19.09.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.05.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1833317 | Date: | 27.02.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 18.05.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A24F47/00, A24B15/18 | [2007/38] | CPC: |
A24B15/16 (EP,US);
A24B15/18 (KR,SE);
A24D3/17 (EP,US);
A24F42/00 (KR);
A24F42/20 (EP,US);
A24F42/60 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/38] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | RAUCHLOSE ZIGARETTE | [2007/38] | English: | SMOKELESS CIGARETTE | [2007/38] | French: | CIGARETTE SANS FUMEE | [2007/38] | Entry into regional phase | 18.05.2006 | Translation filed | 10.05.2007 | National basic fee paid | 10.05.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.05.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.05.2007 | Examination requested [2007/38] | 11.10.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.01.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 14.01.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.11.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 27.05.2008 | [2008/46] | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0321943 (TRIPAR INC [US]); | [A]US5293883 (EDWARDS PATRICA T [US]); | [A]WO0015055 (CHASE GENE [US]); | [A]BE1012837 (CV NOVAVANDA [BE]) |