|
20.02.2015 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.10.2014 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.04.2014 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.03.2014 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.03.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.03.2014 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
06.03.2014 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.03.2014 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
06.03.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.02.2014 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.01.2014 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.12.2013 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.12.2013 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
12.12.2013 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.12.2013 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
23.01.2013 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.04.2012 |
Decision to allow further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.04.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.04.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.04.2012 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.04.2012 |
Description |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
12.04.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.04.2012 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
12.04.2012 |
Request for further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.02.2012 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.08.2011 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.08.2011 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
19.08.2011 |
Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.08.2011 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.08.2011 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.08.2011 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.08.2011 |
Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.08.2011 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.07.2011 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.03.2009 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.11.2008 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.11.2008 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.03.2007 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.02.2007 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.02.2007 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.02.2007 |
Deficiency in designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.01.2007 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
20.12.2006 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.12.2006 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.12.2006 |
Description |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
20.12.2006 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
20.12.2006 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
10.11.2006 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.05.2006 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.05.2006 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
27.01.2006 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
27.01.2006 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
27.01.2006 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
05.01.2006 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.01.2006 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.01.2006 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
01.08.2005 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
01.08.2005 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
01.08.2005 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
9 |
|
01.08.2005 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
4 |