15.07.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] |
08.07.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.08.2016 [2016/32] |
13.11.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.12.2015 [2015/51] |
31.07.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.09.2015 [2015/36] |
15.05.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.06.2015 [2015/25] |
08.05.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.06.2015 [2015/24] |
17.04.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] |
10.04.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.05.2015 [2015/20] |
27.03.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.04.2015 [2015/18] |
20.02.2015 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 25.03.2015 [2015/13] |
06.02.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.03.2015 [2015/11] |
30.01.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.03.2015 [2015/10] |
23.01.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.02.2015 [2015/09] |
16.01.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.02.2015 [2015/08] |
05.12.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.01.2015 [2015/02] |
07.11.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.12.2014 [2014/50] |
31.10.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.12.2014 [2014/49] |
24.10.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.11.2014 [2014/48] |
17.10.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.11.2014 [2014/47] |
14.10.2014 |
Change - representative |
|
14.03.2014 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 16.04.2014 [2014/16] |
11.03.2014 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
11.03.2014 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
07.02.2014 |
Change - inventor |
published on 12.03.2014 [2014/11] |
11.12.2013 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
05.07.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.07.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.04.2012 |
New entry: Decision on request for further processing |
|
18.04.2012 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
18.04.2012 |
New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing |
|
17.04.2012 |
New entry: Receipt of request for further processing |
|
31.01.2012 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
19.08.2011 |
Change - representative |
published on 21.09.2011 [2011/38] |
17.08.2011 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
09.08.2011 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
05.07.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
27.05.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.03.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.03.2009 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
28.11.2008 |
First examination report |
|
22.11.2008 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
29.02.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
31.08.2007 |
Change - extension states |
published on 03.10.2007 [2007/40] |
15.06.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.03.2007 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 25.04.2007 [2007/17] |
23.03.2007 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 25.04.2007 [2007/17] |
15.02.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.02.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
30.01.2007 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
31.05.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.02.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
07.02.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.09.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|