Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1802802 | Global Dossier | 18.01.2012 | B1 | EP1802802 | 04.07.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102004030720 | 25.06.2004 | DE102005020026 | 29.04.2005 | WO2005EP06810 | 23.06.2005 | DE102004060512 | 16.12.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1766123 | Global Dossier | 17.08.2016 | B1 | EP1766123 | 28.03.2007 | A2 | Priority number | Date | DE102004030720 | 25.06.2004 | WO2005EP06811 | 23.06.2005 | DE102005020026 | 29.04.2005 | DE102004060512 | 16.12.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1776499 | Global Dossier | 16.04.2014 | B1 | EP1776499 | 25.04.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102004030720 | 25.06.2004 | WO2005EP06814 | 23.06.2005 | DE102005020026 | 29.04.2005 | DE102004060512 | 16.12.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE541982T | 15.02.2012 | T1 | Priority number | Date | DE102004030720 | 25.06.2004 | DE102005020026 | 29.04.2005 | WO2005EP06810 | 23.06.2005 | DE102004060512 | 16.12.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102004030720 | 08.06.2006 | B4 | DE102004030720 | 23.02.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102004030720 | 25.06.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102004060512 | 18.05.2006 | B3 | Priority number | Date | DE102004060512 | 16.12.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102005020026 | 02.11.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102005020026 | 29.04.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2006000419 | Global Dossier | 05.01.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102004030720 | 25.06.2004 | DE102005020026 | 29.04.2005 | DE102004060512 | 16.12.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2006000417 | Global Dossier | 02.03.2006 | A3 | WO2006000417 | 05.01.2006 | A2 | Priority number | Date | DE102004030720 | 25.06.2004 | DE102005020026 | 29.04.2005 | DE102004060512 | 16.12.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2006000416 | Global Dossier | 05.01.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102004030720 | 25.06.2004 | DE102005020026 | 29.04.2005 | DE102004060512 | 16.12.2004 |