|
12.10.2011 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.11.2010 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.10.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.10.2010 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.10.2010 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.10.2010 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.07.2010 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.07.2010 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
08.07.2010 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.07.2010 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
34 |
|
21.06.2010 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.06.2010 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.06.2010 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.04.2010 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.04.2010 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.04.2010 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.03.2010 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.03.2010 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.03.2010 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.03.2010 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.03.2010 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.03.2010 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.12.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.12.2009 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.12.2009 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.12.2009 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
03.12.2009 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.12.2007 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.12.2007 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.12.2007 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.09.2007 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.09.2007 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.10.2006 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.10.2006 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.09.2006 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
09.08.2006 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.08.2006 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
02.08.2006 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.05.2006 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
18.05.2006 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
18.05.2006 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
18.05.2006 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
18.05.2006 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
18.05.2006 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
18.05.2006 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
18.05.2006 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
11.04.2006 |
Notification of election of EPO |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.01.2006 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
23.01.2006 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
12.01.2006 |
Document concerning fees and payments |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
12.01.2006 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
10.01.2006 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
10.01.2006 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
10.01.2006 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
17.10.2005 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
33 |
|
17.10.2005 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
31 |
|
29.09.2005 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
29.09.2005 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
34 |
|
15.04.2005 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
10.03.2005 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
10.03.2005 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
10.03.2005 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
28 |
|
10.03.2005 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
3 |