Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2007148338 | Global Dossier | 28.06.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2005EP02260 | 01.03.2005 | EP04075719 | 11.03.2004 | US58990105 | 01.03.2005 | US55492704 | 22.03.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1722947 | Global Dossier | 08.12.2010 | B1 | EP1722947 | 22.11.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2005EP02260 | 01.03.2005 | EP05761254 | 01.03.2005 | EP04075719 | 11.03.2004 | US55492704 | 22.03.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE490856T | 15.12.2010 | T1 | Priority number | Date | WO2005EP02260 | 01.03.2005 | EP04075719 | 11.03.2004 | US55492704 | 22.03.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE602005025195D1 | 20.01.2011 | D1 | Priority number | Date | WO2005EP02260 | 01.03.2005 | EP04075719 | 11.03.2004 | US55492704 | 22.03.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK1722947T | 28.03.2011 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2005EP02260 | 01.03.2005 | EP04075719 | 11.03.2004 | US55492704 | 22.03.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2357656T | 28.04.2011 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP04075719 | 11.03.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL1722947T | 31.05.2011 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2005EP02260 | 01.03.2005 | EP05761254 | 01.03.2005 | EP04075719 | 11.03.2004 | US55492704 | 22.03.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SI1722947T | 29.04.2011 | T1 | Priority number | Date | WO2005EP02260 | 01.03.2005 | EP05761254 | 01.03.2005 | EP04075719 | 11.03.2004 | US55492704 | 22.03.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | UA92457 | 10.11.2010 | C2 | Priority number | Date | EP04075719 | 11.03.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2005090031 | Global Dossier | 29.09.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP04075719 | 11.03.2004 | US55492704 | 22.03.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT1722947E | 07.03.2011 | E | Priority number | Date | EP04075719 | 11.03.2004 | US55492704 | 22.03.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2358860 | 20.06.2009 | C2 | RU2006135931 | 20.04.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | EP04075719 | 11.03.2004 | US55492704 | 22.03.2004 |