EP1766167 - LOCK MECHANISM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.06.2013 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Humphris, Keith 114 Fambridge Road Maldon Essex CM9 6BG / GB | [2010/14] |
Former [2007/13] | For all designated states Sure Locking Systems Limited 114 Fambridge Road Maldon Essex CM9 6BG / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUMPHRIS, Keith 114 Fambridge Road Maldon, Essex CM9 6BG / GB | [2007/13] | Representative(s) | Sanderson, James L.C., et al Sanderson & Co. 34 East Stockwell Street Colchester Essex CO1 1ST / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/33] | Sanderson, James L.C., et al Sanderson & Co., 34 East Stockwell Street Colchester Essex CO1 1ST / GB | ||
Former [2007/13] | Sanderson, James L.C., et al Sanderson & Co., 34, East Stockwell Street Colchester Essex CO1 1ST / GB | Application number, filing date | 05761331.7 | 05.07.2005 | [2007/13] | WO2005GB02616 | Priority number, date | GB20040015105 | 06.07.2004 Original published format: GB 0415105 | [2007/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006003432 | Date: | 12.01.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1766167 | Date: | 28.03.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.01.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1766167 | Date: | 15.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.01.2006 | Classification | IPC: | E05B67/36, E05B63/00, E05C19/18 | [2007/13] | CPC: |
E05C3/048 (EP,US);
E05B17/2038 (EP,US);
E05B63/0004 (EP,US);
Y10T292/31 (EP,US);
Y10T292/34 (EP,US);
Y10T292/391 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/13] | Title | German: | SCHLOSSMECHANISMUS | [2007/13] | English: | LOCK MECHANISM | [2007/13] | French: | MÉCANISME DE VERROUILLAGE | [2007/13] | Entry into regional phase | 06.02.2007 | National basic fee paid | 06.02.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.02.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.01.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.02.2007 | Examination requested [2007/13] | 20.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.10.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.09.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.02.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.05.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 30.05.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.04.2007 | Opposition(s) | 16.05.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 05.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.07.2005 | AT | 15.08.2012 | BE | 15.08.2012 | CY | 15.08.2012 | CZ | 15.08.2012 | DK | 15.08.2012 | EE | 15.08.2012 | FI | 15.08.2012 | IT | 15.08.2012 | LT | 15.08.2012 | LV | 15.08.2012 | MC | 15.08.2012 | NL | 15.08.2012 | PL | 15.08.2012 | RO | 15.08.2012 | SE | 15.08.2012 | SI | 15.08.2012 | SK | 15.08.2012 | TR | 15.08.2012 | BG | 15.11.2012 | GR | 16.11.2012 | ES | 26.11.2012 | IS | 15.12.2012 | PT | 17.12.2012 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
BE | 15.08.2012 | ||
CY | 15.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2012 | ||
DK | 15.08.2012 | ||
EE | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
IT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
MC | 15.08.2012 | ||
NL | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
RO | 15.08.2012 | ||
SE | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
SK | 15.08.2012 | ||
TR | 15.08.2012 | ||
BG | 15.11.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
ES | 26.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
Former [2014/14] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
BE | 15.08.2012 | ||
CY | 15.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2012 | ||
DK | 15.08.2012 | ||
EE | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
IT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
MC | 15.08.2012 | ||
NL | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
RO | 15.08.2012 | ||
SE | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
SK | 15.08.2012 | ||
BG | 15.11.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
ES | 26.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
BE | 15.08.2012 | ||
CY | 15.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2012 | ||
DK | 15.08.2012 | ||
EE | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
IT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
NL | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
RO | 15.08.2012 | ||
SE | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
SK | 15.08.2012 | ||
BG | 15.11.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
ES | 26.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/23] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
BE | 15.08.2012 | ||
CY | 15.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2012 | ||
DK | 15.08.2012 | ||
EE | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
IT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
NL | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
RO | 15.08.2012 | ||
SE | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
SK | 15.08.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
ES | 26.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
BE | 15.08.2012 | ||
CY | 15.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2012 | ||
DK | 15.08.2012 | ||
EE | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
NL | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
SE | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
ES | 26.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
BE | 15.08.2012 | ||
CY | 15.08.2012 | ||
DK | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
NL | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
SE | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/15] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
BE | 15.08.2012 | ||
CY | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
NL | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
SE | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
BE | 15.08.2012 | ||
CY | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
SE | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
BE | 15.08.2012 | ||
CY | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
SE | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
CY | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
CY | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 15.08.2012 | Cited in | International search | [X]US6609739 (AVGANIM MEIR [IL]) [X] 1,2,5-9,12-16,18 * column 4, line 33 - column 5, line 19; figures 14-23 * * column 2, line 59 - column 4, line 20; figures 1-12 *; | [X]US4576021 (HOLDEN KENNETH M [US]) [X] 1,2,4-8,12,13,15,16,18 * column 3, line 30 - column 4, line 2; figures 6-10 *; | [X]EP0953703 (C O A M S A S DI CANELLI IVANA [IT], et al) [X] 1-4,7,8,12,15,16,18 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0632179 (MELCHERT BESCHLAEGE [DE]) [X] 1-3,12,15-18 * column 4, line 7 - column 7, line 9; figure - *; | [A]EP0405252 (MELCHERT BESCHLAEGE [DE]) [A] 1-3,5-9,12-15,18 * the whole document *; | [A]US3973420 (BRADY STEVEN F, et al) [A] 1,2,10,11 * the whole document * | by applicant | US6609739 | US4576021 | EP0953703 | EP0632179 |