EP1781973 - LOW DISTORTION SEAT RING ASSEMBLIES FOR FLUID VALVES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.03.2015 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.04.2015 [2015/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FISHER CONTROLS INTERNATIONAL LLC 8100 West Florissant Avenue St. Louis, MO 63136 / US | [2007/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALMAN, Paul, Taylor 1906 Bailey Drive Marshalltown, IA 50158 / US | 02 /
BARRON, Kimball, Ralph 2627 160th Street Marshalltown, IA 50158 / US | [2007/19] | Representative(s) | Bohnenberger, Johannes, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/19] | Bohnenberger, Johannes, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/19] | Bohnenberger, Johannes, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR, Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05762478.5 | 23.06.2005 | [2007/19] | WO2005US22392 | Priority number, date | US20040888467 | 09.07.2004 Original published format: US 888467 | [2007/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006016994 | Date: | 16.02.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1781973 | Date: | 09.05.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.02.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1781973 | Date: | 07.05.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.02.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F16K3/24 | [2007/19] | CPC: |
F16K3/243 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | FR, GB [2007/40] |
Former [2007/19] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | SITZRINGANORDNUNGEN MIT GERINGER VERFORMUNG FÜR STRÖMUNGSVENTILE | [2007/19] | English: | LOW DISTORTION SEAT RING ASSEMBLIES FOR FLUID VALVES | [2007/19] | French: | ENSEMBLES A BAGUE DE SIEGE A FAIBLE DISTORSION POUR SOUPAPES A FLUIDE | [2007/19] | Entry into regional phase | 07.02.2007 | National basic fee paid | 07.02.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.02.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.02.2007 | Examination requested [2007/19] | 10.02.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 18.05.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 28.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.09.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.07.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.11.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.06.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.11.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.12.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.03.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 26.03.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.04.2009 | Opposition(s) | 10.02.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2007 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   24.08.2007 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]FR2299572 (M & J DEV CO [US]) [X] 1-4,6-12,14-18,20,21,23-27,29,30 * page 2, line 9 - page 3, line 2; figures 3,4 *; | [X]US2002017327 (KAWAAI SHIGEHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,6,8-12,16-18,20,21,23-27,29,30* page 3, paragraph 51 - page 4, paragraph 53; figure 1 * | Examination | US551011 | US2744539 | US3648718 |