EP1771192 - USE OF ASPARTATE FOR REGULATING GLUCOSE LEVELS IN BLOOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 24.11.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.08.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.05.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.11.2023 | Revocation of patent | published on 27.12.2023 [2023/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states N.V. Nutricia Eerste Stationsstraat 186 2712 HM Zoetermeer / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2007/15] | For all designated states N.V. Nutricia Eerste Stationsstraat 186 2712 HM Zoetermeer / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAGEMAN, Robert, Johan, Joseph Hamsterlaan 12 NL-6705 CT Wageningen / NL | [2007/15] | Representative(s) | Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | [2013/28] |
Former [2007/15] | Swinkels, Bart Willem Nederlandsch Octrooibureau, P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | Application number, filing date | 05762926.3 | 18.07.2005 | [2007/15] | WO2005NL00519 | Priority number, date | EP20040077100 | 19.07.2004 Original published format: EP 04077100 | US20040588793P | 19.07.2004 Original published format: US 588793 P | EP20040077359 | 20.08.2004 Original published format: EP 04077359 | [2007/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006009437 | Date: | 26.01.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/04] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1771192 | Date: | 11.04.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.01.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1771192 | Date: | 12.09.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.04.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/4188, A61K31/714, A61K36/81, A61K36/899, A61K38/01, A61K31/198, A61K36/48, A23L33/00, A23L33/17, A23L33/175, A23L33/18, A23L33/185, A23L33/19, A23L13/40, A23L13/60, A23L23/10, A61K38/02 | [2018/21] | CPC: |
A61K31/714 (EP,CN,US);
A61K31/198 (RU,US);
A23L33/18 (EP,CN,US);
A23L13/424 (EP,CN,US);
A23L13/65 (EP,CN,US);
A23L23/10 (EP,CN,US);
A23L33/17 (EP,US);
A23L33/175 (EP,CN,US);
A23L33/185 (EP,CN,US);
A23L33/19 (EP,US);
A23L33/40 (EP,CN,US);
A61K31/4188 (EP,CN,US);
A61K36/48 (EP,CN,US);
A61K36/81 (EP,CN,US);
A61K36/899 (EP,CN,US);
A61K38/01 (EP,CN,US);
A61K38/02 (EP,CN,US);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P15/08 (EP);
A61P19/06 (EP);
A61P27/10 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A61P3/08 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P37/04 (EP);
A61P5/50 (EP);
A61P7/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
A61P9/12 (EP);
A23V2002/00 (EP,CN,US);
| C-Set: |
A61K36/48, A61K2300/00 (US,CN,EP);
A61K36/81, A61K2300/00 (US,CN,EP);
A61K36/899, A61K2300/00 (US,CN,EP);
A23V2002/00, A23V2200/328, A23V2250/0636, A23V2250/061, A23V2250/0628, A23V2250/062, A23V2250/5114, A23V2250/608, A23V2250/61, A23V2250/1882, A23V2250/5106, A23V2250/156, A23V2250/15 (US,CN,EP);
A23V2002/00, A23V2200/332, A23V2250/5488, A23V2250/15, A23V2250/61, A23V2250/612, A23V2250/5114, A23V2250/1842, A23V2250/1882, A23V2250/1614, A23V2250/1618, A23V2250/1582, A23V2250/1592, A23V2250/1588, A23V2250/702, A23V2250/712, A23V2250/7046, A23V2250/7052, A23V2250/0644 (CN);
A23V2002/00, A23V2200/332, A23V2250/5488, A23V2250/15, A23V2250/61, A23V2250/612, A23V2250/5114, A23V2250/1842, A23V2250/1882, A23V2250/1614, A23V2250/1618, A23V2250/1582, A23V2250/1592, A23V2250/1588, A23V2250/702, A23V2250/712, A23V2250/7046, A23V2250/7052, A23V2250/7046, A23V2250/0644 (EP,US);
A23V2002/00, A23V2200/332, A23V2250/61, A23V2250/0618, A23V2250/54252, A23V2250/5488, A23V2250/612, A23V2250/5114, A23V2250/1842, A23V2250/156, A23V2250/702, A23V2250/712, A23V2250/7042, A23V2250/7052, A23V2250/72, A23V2250/7046, A23V2250/0644 (CN,EP,US)
(-) |
Former IPC [2007/15] | A61K38/02, A61K38/16 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/37] |
Former [2007/15] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON ASPARTAT ZUR REGULATION DES GLUKOSESPIEGELS IM BLUT | [2018/21] | English: | USE OF ASPARTATE FOR REGULATING GLUCOSE LEVELS IN BLOOD | [2007/15] | French: | UTILISATION DE L'ASPARTATE POUR LA RÉGULATION DU TAUX SANGUIN DE GLUCOSE | [2007/15] |
Former [2007/15] | VERWENDUNG VON ASPARTAT ZUR REGULIERUNG DER BLUTZUCKERSPIEGEL | Entry into regional phase | 19.02.2007 | National basic fee paid | 19.02.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.02.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.05.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.01.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.02.2007 | Examination requested [2007/15] | 27.01.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.07.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.08.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.03.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.10.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.04.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.03.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.10.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 06.01.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.02.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.05.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.05.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.08.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 01.08.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.08.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP13152810.1 / EP2705849 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.01.2011 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
11.06.2019
ADMISSIBLE Fresenius Kabi Deutschland GmbH Else-Kröner-Str. 1 61352 Bad Homburg / DE Opponent's representative Fresenius Kabi Deutschland GmbH Patent Department Pharmaceuticals Division Borkenberg 14 61440 Oberursel / DE | [2019/29] | 01.07.2019 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 07.11.2019 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 25.08.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 13.10.2020 | 13.10.2020 | Date of oral proceedings | 11.03.2021 | Date of oral proceedings | 07.04.2021 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 07.04.2021 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 08.11.2023 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2023/52] | Appeal following opposition | 03.06.2021 | Appeal received No. T1051/21 | 03.06.2021 | Payment of appeal fee | 17.08.2021 | Statement of grounds filed | 08.11.2023 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor withdrawn | 08.11.2023 | Date of oral proceedings | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 06.01.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 06.01.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 22.01.2016 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 30.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 29.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 04.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.07.2005 | AT | 12.09.2018 | CY | 12.09.2018 | CZ | 12.09.2018 | DK | 12.09.2018 | EE | 12.09.2018 | FI | 12.09.2018 | LT | 12.09.2018 | LV | 12.09.2018 | MC | 12.09.2018 | RO | 12.09.2018 | SI | 12.09.2018 | SK | 12.09.2018 | TR | 12.09.2018 | BG | 12.12.2018 | GR | 13.12.2018 | IS | 12.01.2019 | PT | 12.01.2019 | LU | 18.07.2019 | BE | 31.07.2019 | [2021/32] |
Former [2021/26] | AT | 12.09.2018 | |
CY | 12.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 12.09.2018 | ||
DK | 12.09.2018 | ||
EE | 12.09.2018 | ||
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
MC | 12.09.2018 | ||
RO | 12.09.2018 | ||
SI | 12.09.2018 | ||
SK | 12.09.2018 | ||
TR | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
IS | 12.01.2019 | ||
PT | 12.01.2019 | ||
LU | 18.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/26] | AT | 12.09.2018 | |
CZ | 12.09.2018 | ||
DK | 12.09.2018 | ||
EE | 12.09.2018 | ||
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
MC | 12.09.2018 | ||
RO | 12.09.2018 | ||
SI | 12.09.2018 | ||
SK | 12.09.2018 | ||
TR | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
IS | 12.01.2019 | ||
PT | 12.01.2019 | ||
LU | 18.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AT | 12.09.2018 | |
CZ | 12.09.2018 | ||
DK | 12.09.2018 | ||
EE | 12.09.2018 | ||
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
MC | 12.09.2018 | ||
RO | 12.09.2018 | ||
SI | 12.09.2018 | ||
SK | 12.09.2018 | ||
TR | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
IS | 12.01.2019 | ||
PT | 12.01.2019 | ||
Former [2020/14] | AT | 12.09.2018 | |
CZ | 12.09.2018 | ||
DK | 12.09.2018 | ||
EE | 12.09.2018 | ||
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
MC | 12.09.2018 | ||
RO | 12.09.2018 | ||
SI | 12.09.2018 | ||
SK | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
IS | 12.01.2019 | ||
PT | 12.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AT | 12.09.2018 | |
CZ | 12.09.2018 | ||
DK | 12.09.2018 | ||
EE | 12.09.2018 | ||
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
RO | 12.09.2018 | ||
SI | 12.09.2018 | ||
SK | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
IS | 12.01.2019 | ||
PT | 12.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AT | 12.09.2018 | |
CZ | 12.09.2018 | ||
DK | 12.09.2018 | ||
EE | 12.09.2018 | ||
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
RO | 12.09.2018 | ||
SK | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
IS | 12.01.2019 | ||
PT | 12.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 12.09.2018 | |
CZ | 12.09.2018 | ||
EE | 12.09.2018 | ||
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
RO | 12.09.2018 | ||
SK | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
IS | 12.01.2019 | ||
PT | 12.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AT | 12.09.2018 | |
CZ | 12.09.2018 | ||
EE | 12.09.2018 | ||
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
RO | 12.09.2018 | ||
SK | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
IS | 12.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | CZ | 12.09.2018 | |
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
RO | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
IS | 12.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 12.09.2018 | |
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
IS | 12.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/13] | FI | 12.09.2018 | |
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | FI | 12.09.2018 | |
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 12.09.2018 | |
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 12.09.2018 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0629350 (SANDOZ NUTRITION LTD [CH]) [X] 1,3,5-7,11,12,16,17,21 * page 9, lines 14-30; claim 15 *; | [X]US6042834 (BARAKA MOHAMED WASIF [KW]) [X] 1,3,5-7,11,12,16,17,21 * claim 1 *; | [X]WO0137850 (NESTLE SA [CH], et al) [X] 1,3,5-7,10-12,16,17,21 * page 9, lines 29,30; claims 1,5,6 ** page 10, lines 4-12 *; | [X]US2003118663 (CHANG CHING-MING [TW]) [X] 1,3,5-7,11,12,16,17,21 * claims 1-3 *; | [DX]WO03105882 (NOVARTIS NUTRITION AG [CH], et al) [DX] 1,3,5-7,11,12,16,17,21 * claims 1-3 *; | [DX]US6706697 (MACDONALD BRADLEY T [US]) [DX] 1,3,5-7,11,12,16,17,21 * abstract * | Examination | WO2004056207 | - LAVIGNE C ET AL, "COD AND SOY PROTEINS COMPARED WITH CASEIN IMPROVE GLUCOSE TOLERANCEAND INSULIN SENSITIVITY IN RATS", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF PHYSIOLOGY: ENDOCRINOLOGY AND METABOLISM, AMERICAN PHYSIOLOGICAL SOCIETY, BETHESDA, MD, US, (20000101), vol. 278, no. 3 part 1, ISSN 0193-1849, pages E491 - E500, XP000978740 | - Mikael Nilsson ET AL, "Glycemia and insulinemia in healthy subjects after lactose-equivalent meals of milk and other food proteins: the role of plasma amino acids and incretins.", American Journal of Clinical Nutrition, (20041101), vol. 80, no. 5, ISSN 0002-9165, pages 1246 - 1253, XP055077987 | - HAGEMAN ROBERT ET AL, "A specific blend of intact protein rich in aspartate has strong postprandial glucose attenuating properties in rats", THE JOURNAL OF NUTRITION, AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR NUTRITION, US, (20080901), vol. 138, no. 9, ISSN 0022-3166, pages 1634 - 1640, XP002555472 | Opposition | WO9110441 | WO9742834 | WO0077034 | WO2004056207 | - RALET et al., "Potato proteins: Composition, recovery and functional properties", Sciences des Aliments, (19990000), vol. 19, pages 147 - 165, XP055613445 | - SONG et al., "Evidence of Enhancement of Malate-Aspartate Shuttle Activity in beta Cells of Streptozotocin-Induced Non-Insulin-Dependent Diabetic Rats", Metabolism, (20000100), vol. 49, no. 1, doi:10.1016/S0026-0495(00)90838-2, pages 92 - 96, XP001098549 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0026-0495(00)90838-2 | - FRESENIUS KABI, "Trink- und Sondennahrungen", Produktkatalog, (20001000), pages 1 - 63, XP055613448 | - SATHE et al., "High-Resolution Sodium Dodecyl Sulfate Polyacrylamide Gel Electrophoresis of Soybean (Glycine max L.) Seed Proteins", Cereal Chem., (19870000), vol. 64, no. 6, pages 380 - 384, XP055613452 | - CRESPILLO et al., "Metabolic effects of an enteral nutrition formula for diabetes: comparison with standard formulas in patients with type 1 diabetes", Clinical Nutrition, (20030000), vol. 22, no. 5, doi:10.1016/S0261-5614(03)00047-5, pages 483 - 487, XP055545839 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0261-5614(03)00047-5 | - SOUCI et al., "Potato, Soya Flour", SOUCI et al., S.W. Souci, W. Fachmann, H. Kraut, Food Composition and Nutrition Tables, (20080000), pages 749 - 751, 980-981, XP055613454 | - GRIZARD, "Non-digestible oligosaccharides used as prebiotic agents: mode of production and beneficial effects on animal and human health. Reproduction Nutrition Development", REPRODUCTION, NUTRITION, DEVELOPMENT, (19990000), vol. 39, no. 5-6, pages 563 - 588, XP008056157 | - STEINBERGER et al., "Obesity, Insulin Resistance, Diabetes, and Cardiovascular Risk in Children", Circulation, (20030000), vol. 107, pages 1448 - 1453, XP055613455 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1161/01.CIR.0000060923.07573.F2 | - MARIOTTI et al., "Nutritional Value of [15N]-Soy Protein Isolate Assessed from Ileal Digestibility and Postprandial Protein Utilization in Humans", J. Nutr., (19990000), vol. 129, pages 1992 - 1997, XP055613457 |