Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7501986 | Global Dossier | 10.03.2009 | B2 | US2008094291 | 24.04.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | SE0401993 | 09.08.2004 | WO2005SE01183 | 26.07.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20070033465 | Global Dossier | 26.03.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | SE0401993 | 09.08.2004 | WO2005SE01183 | 26.07.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4663722B | Global Dossier | 06.04.2011 | B2 | JP2008509632 | 27.03.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | SE0401993 | 09.08.2004 | WO2005SE01183 | 26.07.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1792362 | Global Dossier | 06.06.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | SE0401993 | 09.08.2004 | WO2005SE01183 | 26.07.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1993859B | 21.11.2012 | B | CN1993859 | 04.07.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | SE0401993 | 09.08.2004 | WO2005SE01183 | 26.07.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2006016843 | Global Dossier | 16.02.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | SE0401993 | 09.08.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | SE527554 | 11.04.2006 | C2 | SE0401993L | 10.02.2006 | L | SE0401993D0 | 09.08.2004 | D0 | Priority number | Date | SE0401993 | 09.08.2004 |