EP1779409 - ION MOBILITY SPECTROMETER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.07.2014 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.08.2014 [2014/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Owlstone Ltd Unit 2, St. John's Innovation Centre, Cowley Road Cambridge, Cambridgeshire CB4 0WS / GB | [2007/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOYLE, Paul 92 The Ridgeway, Golders Green London NW11 9RU / GB | 02 /
KOEHL, Andrew 11 John Street Cambridge Cambridgeshire CB1 1DT / GB | 03 /
ALONSO, David Ruiz 29 Petersfield Mansions, Mill Road Cambridge, Cambridgeshire CB1 1BB / GB | [2007/18] | Representative(s) | Friede, Thomas, et al Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Weinstrasse 8 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/11] | Friede, Thomas, et al Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Ottostrasse 4 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/36] | Friede, Thomas Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle - Pagenberg - Dost Altenburg - Geissler Galileiplatz 1 D-80679 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/18] | Williams, Gareth Owen Marks & Clerk 66-68 Hills Road Cambridge CB2 1LA / GB | Application number, filing date | 05764106.0 | 02.08.2005 | [2007/18] | WO2005GB50124 | Priority number, date | GB20040017184 | 02.08.2004 Original published format: GB 0417184 | GB20050000812 | 17.01.2005 Original published format: GB 0500812 | [2007/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006013396 | Date: | 09.02.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/06] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1779409 | Date: | 02.05.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.02.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.12.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H01J49/42, B01D59/44, G01N27/64 | [2007/18] | CPC: |
G01N27/624 (EP,US);
G01J3/02 (KR);
G01N21/25 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/18] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | IONENMOBILITÄTSSPEKTROMETER | [2007/18] | English: | ION MOBILITY SPECTROMETER | [2007/18] | French: | SPECTROMETRE DE MOBILITE IONIQUE | [2007/18] | Entry into regional phase | 02.03.2007 | National basic fee paid | 02.03.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.03.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.03.2007 | Examination requested [2007/18] | 07.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.07.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/32] | 27.03.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/32] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.03.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2007 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   07.02.2008 | 31.08.2013 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP0692712 (ION TRACK INSTR [US]) [Y] 13,14 * claim 8 * * claim 9 * * page 4, column 6, line 3 - line 9 *; | [A]US5789745 (MARTIN STEPHEN J [US], et al) [A] 1-41 * figure 1 ** figure 3 *; | [A]US6051832 (BRADSHAW ROBERT FAGAN DONAT [GB]) [A] 1-41 * column 2, line 61 - line 67 * * column 3, line 1 - line 6 *; | [XY]US6107624 (DOERING HANS-RUEDIGER [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,5,6,16-18,21,22,27-32,34,35,39,40 * claim 1 * * column 1, line 43 - line 47 * * column 2, line 8 - line 10 * * column 3, line 39 - line 63 * * column 4, line 3 - line 8 * * column 4, line 20 - line 24 * * figure 1 * [Y] 3,4,7,10,11,13,14,19,20,24,26,33,36,37; | [Y]WO0164320 (IONWERKS INC [US], et al) [Y] 7,36,37 * page 6, line 3 - line 5 *; | [A]US2002070338 (LOBODA ALEXANDER V [CA]) [A] 1-41 * figure 1 * * figure 2 *; | [Y]US2003089849 (GUEVREMONT ROGER [CA], et al) [Y] 26 * figure 3 *; | [YA] - MILLER R A ET AL, "A novel micromachined high-field asymmetric waveform-ion mobility spectrometer", SENSORS AND ACTUATORS B, ELSEVIER SEQUOIA S.A., LAUSANNE, CH, (20000901), vol. 67, no. 3, ISSN 0925-4005, pages 300 - 306, XP004229036 [Y] 3,4,10,11,19,20,24,33 * page 301, column 1, line 48 - line 56 * * page 301, column 2, line 38 - line 47 * * figure 2 * * figure 3 * [A] 1-41 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0925-4005(00)00535-9 |