EP1771436 - KYNURENIC ACID AMIDE DERIVATIVES AS NR2B RECEPTOR ANTAGONISTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.07.2009 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.08.2009 [2009/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Richter Gedeon Vegy Szeti Gy R Rt. Gyömr i ut 19-21. H-1103 Budapest / HU | [2007/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BORZA, István Marg Tivadar u. 218. H-1186 Budapest / HU | 02 /
HORVÁTH, Csilla Kada u. 139/A H-1104 Budapest / HU | 03 /
FARKAS, Sándor Olajliget u. 42. H-1103 Budapest / HU | 04 /
NAGY, Jozsef Váci út 136/A H-1138 Budapest / HU | 05 /
KOLOK, Sándor Nagysándor J zsef u. 8. H-1195 Budapest / HU | [2007/15] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/15] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05764169.8 | 21.07.2005 | [2007/15] | WO2005HU00080 | Priority number, date | HU20040001525 | 29.07.2004 Original published format: HU 0401525 | [2007/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006010967 | Date: | 02.02.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1771436 | Date: | 11.04.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.02.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.02.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C07D401/06, C07D491/04, A61K31/4709, A61P25/04 | [2007/15] | CPC: |
C07D401/06 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/4709 (KR);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61P21/00 (EP);
A61P21/04 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/04 (EP);
A61P25/06 (EP);
A61P25/08 (EP);
A61P25/14 (EP);
A61P25/16 (EP);
A61P25/18 (EP);
A61P25/22 (EP);
A61P25/24 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P25/32 (EP);
A61P25/36 (EP);
A61P27/00 (EP);
A61P27/06 (EP);
A61P27/16 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/15] | Extension states | AL | 14.12.2006 | BA | 14.12.2006 | HR | 14.12.2006 | MK | 14.12.2006 | YU | 14.12.2006 | Title | German: | KYNURENSÄUREAMIDDERIVATE ALS NR2B-REZEPTORANTAGONISTEN | [2007/15] | English: | KYNURENIC ACID AMIDE DERIVATIVES AS NR2B RECEPTOR ANTAGONISTS | [2007/15] | French: | DERIVES AMIDES D'ACIDE KYNURENIQUE UTILISES EN TANT QU'ANTAGONISTES DE RECEPTEURS DE NR2B | [2007/15] | Entry into regional phase | 14.12.2006 | National basic fee paid | 14.12.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.12.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.12.2006 | Examination requested [2007/15] | 07.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.10.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.09.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.01.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/34] | 11.03.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2009/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO03091241 (PFIZER PHARMA [JP], et al) [A] 1,4,5,9,10* the whole document * |