EP1899742 - SPREADING CODES FOR A SATELLITE NAVIGATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.07.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 17.10.2012 [2012/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EUROPEAN SPACE AGENCY 8-10, rue Mario-Nikis 75738 Paris Cedex 15 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/35] | For all designated states EUROPEAN SPACE AGENCY 8-10, rue Mario-Nikis 75738 Paris Cédex 15 / FR | ||
Former [2008/12] | For all designated states EUROPEAN SPACE AGENCY 8-10, rue Mario-Nikis F-75738 Paris Cédex 15 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEGATE, Steve Eads Astrium Ltd Anchorage Road Portsmouth Hampshire PO3 5PU / GB | 02 /
BARNES, Brian Eads Astrium Ltd Anchorage Road Portsmouth Hampshire PO3 5PU / GB | [2008/12] | Representative(s) | Davies, Simon Robert D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/12] | Davies, Simon Robert D Young & Co 120 Holborn London, EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 05764218.3 | 01.07.2005 | [2008/12] | WO2005EP07235 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007003213 | Date: | 11.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1899742 | Date: | 19.03.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.01.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1899742 | Date: | 26.08.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.01.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G01S1/00, H04J13/04 | [2008/12] | CPC: |
H04J13/10 (EP,BR,US);
G01S19/02 (EP,BR,US);
H04B2201/70715 (EP,BR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/14] |
Former [2008/12] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SPREIZCODES FÜR EIN SATELLITENNAVIGATIONSSYSTEM | [2008/12] | English: | SPREADING CODES FOR A SATELLITE NAVIGATION SYSTEM | [2008/12] | French: | CODES DE SYNCHRONISATION POUR UN SYSTEME DE NAVIGATION PAR SATELLITE | [2008/12] | Entry into regional phase | 18.12.2007 | National basic fee paid | 18.12.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.12.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.12.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.12.2007 | Examination requested [2008/12] | 17.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.11.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.03.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.07.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 01.07.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.05.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.08.2009 | CY | 26.08.2009 | DK | 26.08.2009 | EE | 26.08.2009 | LT | 26.08.2009 | LV | 26.08.2009 | PL | 26.08.2009 | RO | 26.08.2009 | SI | 26.08.2009 | SK | 26.08.2009 | BG | 26.11.2009 | GR | 27.11.2009 | IS | 26.12.2009 | HU | 27.02.2010 | [2012/42] |
Former [2011/01] | AT | 26.08.2009 | |
CY | 26.08.2009 | ||
DK | 26.08.2009 | ||
EE | 26.08.2009 | ||
LT | 26.08.2009 | ||
LV | 26.08.2009 | ||
PL | 26.08.2009 | ||
RO | 26.08.2009 | ||
SI | 26.08.2009 | ||
SK | 26.08.2009 | ||
BG | 26.11.2009 | ||
GR | 27.11.2009 | ||
IS | 26.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/24] | AT | 26.08.2009 | |
CY | 26.08.2009 | ||
DK | 26.08.2009 | ||
EE | 26.08.2009 | ||
LT | 26.08.2009 | ||
LV | 26.08.2009 | ||
PL | 26.08.2009 | ||
RO | 26.08.2009 | ||
SI | 26.08.2009 | ||
SK | 26.08.2009 | ||
BG | 26.11.2009 | ||
IS | 26.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/20] | AT | 26.08.2009 | |
CY | 26.08.2009 | ||
DK | 26.08.2009 | ||
EE | 26.08.2009 | ||
LT | 26.08.2009 | ||
LV | 26.08.2009 | ||
PL | 26.08.2009 | ||
SI | 26.08.2009 | ||
BG | 26.11.2009 | ||
IS | 26.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/18] | AT | 26.08.2009 | |
CY | 26.08.2009 | ||
LT | 26.08.2009 | ||
LV | 26.08.2009 | ||
PL | 26.08.2009 | ||
SI | 26.08.2009 | ||
BG | 26.11.2009 | ||
IS | 26.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/16] | AT | 26.08.2009 | |
CY | 26.08.2009 | ||
LT | 26.08.2009 | ||
LV | 26.08.2009 | ||
PL | 26.08.2009 | ||
SI | 26.08.2009 | ||
IS | 26.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/12] | AT | 26.08.2009 | |
LT | 26.08.2009 | ||
LV | 26.08.2009 | ||
PL | 26.08.2009 | ||
SI | 26.08.2009 | ||
IS | 26.12.2009 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US5963584 (BOULANGER CHRISTOPHE [FR], et al) [Y] 1,2,5-33 * column 5, line 61 - column 12, line 43; figure 7 *; | [Y]US6091760 (GIALLORENZI THOMAS R [US], et al) [Y] 1-3,7-21,30-32 * column 6, line 27 - column 9, line 63; figures 2-13 *; | [Y] - HEIN G W ET AL, "Status of Galileo frequency and signal design", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INSTITUTE OF NAVIGATION (ION) GPS, (20020924), pages 266 - 277, XP002273300 [Y] 1-33 * Table 2; page 270, column R - page 271, column L * | [Y] - LIN X ET AL, "OPTIMAL PN SEQUENCE DESIGN FOR QUASI-SYNCHRONOUS CDMA COMMUNICATIONSYSTEMS", 1995 IEEE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS (ISCAS). SEATTLE, APR. 30 - MAY 3, 1995, NEW YORK, IEEE, US, (19950430), VOL. 1, ISBN 0-7803-2571-0, pages 81 - 84, XP000583186 [Y] 1-4,7,13,30-32 * the whole document * | [A] - PRATT A R ET AL, "Concatenated Sequential Codes Performance Attributes and Applications for Galileo", PROCEEDINGS OF THE ION NATIONAL TECHNICAL MEETING, THE INSTITUTE OF NAVIGATION, US, (20040126), pages 313 - 322, XP002346068 [A] 1-33 * the whole document * | [A] - PRATT A R, "A New Class of Spreading Codes Exhibiting Low Cross-Correlation Properties", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INSTITUTE OF NAVIGATION (ION) GPS, XX, XX, (20020924), pages 1554 - 1564, XP002346067 [A] 1-33 * the whole document * |