24.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.07.2022 [2022/30] |
03.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.07.2022 [2022/27] |
27.05.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.06.2022 [2022/26] |
14.05.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.06.2021 [2021/24] |
30.04.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.06.2021 [2021/22] |
16.04.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.05.2021 [2021/20] |
12.03.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.04.2021 [2021/15] |
05.03.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.04.2021 [2021/14] |
19.02.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.03.2021 [2021/12] |
12.02.2021 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 17.03.2021 [2021/11] |
05.02.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.03.2021 [2021/10] |
22.01.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.02.2021 [2021/08] |
06.11.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.12.2020 [2020/50] |
30.10.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.12.2020 [2020/49] |
23.10.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.11.2020 [2020/48] |
16.10.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.11.2020 [2020/47] |
09.10.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.11.2020 [2020/46] |
02.10.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.11.2020 [2020/45] |
21.08.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.09.2020 [2020/39] |
14.08.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.09.2020 [2020/38] |
24.07.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.08.2020 [2020/35] |
21.02.2020 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 25.03.2020 [2020/13] |
17.02.2020 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
17.02.2020 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
17.02.2020 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
16.10.2019 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
13.09.2019 |
Change - classification |
published on 16.10.2019 [2019/42] |
13.09.2019 |
Change - classification |
published on 16.10.2019 [2019/42] |
14.06.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.07.2018 |
Change - applicant |
published on 08.08.2018 [2018/32] |
04.07.2018 |
Change - representative |
|
13.06.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.06.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
31.03.2017 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
24.03.2017 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
18.11.2016 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
14.06.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
12.06.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.04.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
14.06.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.06.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.06.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.12.2010 |
Change - representative |
published on 05.01.2011 [2011/01] |
16.06.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
12.03.2010 |
Change - representative |
published on 14.04.2010 [2010/15] |
01.07.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.04.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
31.10.2007 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
12.10.2007 |
Change - extension states |
published on 14.11.2007 [2007/46] |
06.07.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.06.2007 |
First examination report |
|
19.06.2007 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
20.04.2007 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 23.05.2007 [2007/21] |
20.04.2007 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 23.05.2007 [2007/21] |
13.04.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
30.03.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.03.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.03.2007 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
22.03.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.03.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.09.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|