Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2006025926 | Global Dossier | 09.03.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US92740204 | 26.08.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8071879 | Global Dossier | 06.12.2011 | B2 | US2007274661 | 29.11.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US83601007 | 08.08.2007 | US91633204 | 11.08.2004 | US92740204 | 26.08.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7598457 | Global Dossier | 06.10.2009 | B2 | US2007256848 | 08.11.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US77896707 | 17.07.2007 | US91633204 | 11.08.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7268299 | Global Dossier | 11.09.2007 | B2 | US2006032659 | 16.02.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US91633204 | 11.08.2004 | US92740204 | 26.08.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2008510179 | Global Dossier | 03.04.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US91633204 | 11.08.2004 | WO2005US22760 | 23.06.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1787152 | Global Dossier | 26.07.2017 | B1 | EP1787152 | 23.05.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2005US22405 | 23.06.2005 | US92740204 | 26.08.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1787153 | Global Dossier | 25.03.2020 | B1 | EP1787153 | 23.05.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US91633204 | 11.08.2004 | WO2005US22760 | 23.06.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2642614T | 17.11.2017 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2005US22405 | 23.06.2005 | US92740204 | 26.08.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2797477T | 02.12.2020 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US91633204 | 11.08.2004 | WO2005US22760 | 23.06.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2006023072 | Global Dossier | 02.03.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US91633204 | 11.08.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7256349 | Global Dossier | 14.08.2007 | B2 | US2006034578 | 16.02.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US91633204 | 11.08.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20070044449 | Global Dossier | 27.04.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | US91633204 | 11.08.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AR050834 | 29.11.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US91633204 | 11.08.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW200628867 | 16.08.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | US91633204 | 11.08.2004 |